Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1917111

EP1917111 - PROCESS FOR PRODUCING ARTICLES HAVING AN ELECTRICALLY CONDUCTIVE COATING [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  27.11.2015
Database last updated on 18.02.2020
Most recent event   Tooltip01.09.2017Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): CY, HU
published on 04.10.2017  [2017/40]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
A.M. Ramp & Co. GmbH
Lorsbacher Strasse 28
65817 Eppstein / DE
[2008/19]
Inventor(s)01 / GELLRICH, Andreas
Tannenblick 10
65510 Bechtheim / DE
 [2008/19]
Representative(s)Reitstötter Kinzebach
Patentanwälte
Sternwartstrasse 4
81679 München / DE
[2015/04]
Former [2008/19]Reitstötter - Kinzebach
Patentanwälte, Sternwartstrasse 4
81679 München / DE
Application number, filing date06742922.515.05.2006
[2008/19]
WO2006EP04572
Priority number, dateEP2005001839924.08.2005         Original published format: EP 05018399
[2008/19]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2007022810
Date:01.03.2007
Language:EN
[2007/09]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1917111
Date:07.05.2008
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 01.03.2007
[2008/19]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1917111
Date:21.01.2015
Language:EN
[2015/04]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP01.03.2007
ClassificationInternational:B05D7/04, B05D5/12, B05D3/02
[2008/19]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   NL,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2008/19]
Extension statesAL21.02.2008
BA21.02.2008
HR21.02.2008
MK21.02.2008
YU21.02.2008
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG VON ARTIKELN MIT EINER ELEKTRISCH LEITENDEN BESCHICHTUNG[2008/19]
English:PROCESS FOR PRODUCING ARTICLES HAVING AN ELECTRICALLY CONDUCTIVE COATING[2008/19]
French:PROCESSUS DE PRODUCTION D'ARTICLES POSSEDANT UN REVETEMENT CONDUCTEUR D'ELECTRICITE[2008/19]
Entry into regional phase21.02.2008National basic fee paid 
21.02.2008Designation fee(s) paid 
21.02.2008Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure23.11.2006Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
21.02.2008Examination requested  [2008/19]
29.03.2010Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
30.06.2010Reply to a communication from the examining division
23.01.2012Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
31.05.2012Reply to a communication from the examining division
06.08.2014Communication of intention to grant the patent
15.12.2014Fee for grant paid
15.12.2014Fee for publishing/printing paid
15.12.2014Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  29.03.2010
Opposition(s)22.10.2015No opposition filed within time limit [2015/53]
Fees paidRenewal fee
27.05.2008Renewal fee patent year 03
29.05.2009Renewal fee patent year 04
31.05.2010Renewal fee patent year 05
31.05.2011Renewal fee patent year 06
31.05.2012Renewal fee patent year 07
31.05.2013Renewal fee patent year 08
28.05.2014Renewal fee patent year 09
Lapses during opposition  TooltipHU15.05.2006
CY21.01.2015
EE21.01.2015
LV21.01.2015
RO21.01.2015
SI21.01.2015
SK21.01.2015
BG21.04.2015
GR22.04.2015
IS21.05.2015
[2017/39]
Former [2016/12]EE21.01.2015
LV21.01.2015
RO21.01.2015
SI21.01.2015
SK21.01.2015
BG21.04.2015
GR22.04.2015
IS21.05.2015
Former [2015/49]EE21.01.2015
LV21.01.2015
RO21.01.2015
SK21.01.2015
BG21.04.2015
GR22.04.2015
IS21.05.2015
Former [2015/39]LV21.01.2015
BG21.04.2015
GR22.04.2015
IS21.05.2015
Former [2015/38]BG21.04.2015
GR22.04.2015
IS21.05.2015
Former [2015/37]BG21.04.2015
GR22.04.2015
Former [2015/36]BG21.04.2015
Cited inInternational search[X]WO2004048463  (PARODI FABRIZIO [IT], et al) [X] 1-19 * page 14, line 25 - line 29 * * page 15, line 23 - line 25 * * page 16, line 23 - line 31 * * claims 11,18,23. *;
 [A]GB1268100  (NAT STARCH CHEM CORP [US]) [A] 1,17,19 * column 4, line 72 - line 74 *;
 [A]GB1589390  (HAJTOMUEVEK ES FESTOBERENDEZE) [A] 1,17,19 * page 2, line 93 - line 96 * * claim 1 *;
 [A]DE2114934  (REMAG AG ZWEIGNIEDERLASSUNG MU) [A] 1,17,19 * claim 1 *;
 [A]US4921755  (CARROLL JR JOHN F [US], et al) [A] 1,17,19 * the whole document *
by applicantWO9837133
 WO03003381
 WO2004048463