Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1874108

EP1874108 - THREE-POINT LINKAGE FOR AN AGRICULTURAL OR INDUSTRIAL UTILITY VEHICLE [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  22.12.2017
Database last updated on 21.09.2019
FormerExamination is in progress
Status updated on  18.04.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip22.12.2017Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 24.01.2018  [2018/04]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Deere & Company
One John Deere Place
Moline, IL 61265 / US
[N/P]
Former [2008/02]For all designated states
Deere & Company
One John Deere Place
Moline, IL 61265-8098 / US
Inventor(s)01 / TARASINSKI, Nicolai
Gotthilf-Salzmann-Str. 60
67227 Frankenthal / DE
02 / REINARDS, Marco
Poststrasse 15
54608 Bleialf / DE
 [2008/02]
Representative(s)Magin, Ludwig Bernhard , et al
John Deere GmbH & Co. KG
Global Intellectual Property Services
John-Deere-Strasse 70
68163 Mannheim / DE
[N/P]
Former [2008/12]Magin, Ludwig Bernhard , et al
Deere & Company European Office Global Intellectual Property Services John-Deere-Strasse 70
68163 Mannheim / DE
Former [2008/02]Bradl, Joachim , et al
Deere & Company European Office Global Intellectual Property Services John-Deere-Strasse 70
68163 Mannheim / DE
Application number, filing date06743301.113.04.2006
[2008/02]
WO2006EP61590
Priority number, dateDE2005101757816.04.2005         Original published format: DE102005017578
[2008/02]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2006111505
Date:26.10.2006
Language:DE
[2006/43]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1874108
Date:09.01.2008
Language:DE
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 26.10.2006
[2008/02]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP26.10.2006
ClassificationInternational:A01B59/06
[2008/02]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   NL,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2008/02]
Extension statesALNot yet paid
BANot yet paid
HRNot yet paid
MKNot yet paid
YUNot yet paid
TitleGerman:DREIPUNKT-GERÄTEANBAU FÜR EIN LANDWIRTSCHAFTLICHES ODER INDUSTRIELLES NUTZFAHRZEUG[2008/02]
English:THREE-POINT LINKAGE FOR AN AGRICULTURAL OR INDUSTRIAL UTILITY VEHICLE[2008/02]
French:INSTALLATION D'APPAREIL A TROIS POINTS POUR UN VEHICULE UTILITAIRE INDUSTRIEL OU AGRICOLE[2008/02]
Entry into regional phase16.11.2007National basic fee paid 
16.11.2007Designation fee(s) paid 
16.11.2007Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure16.11.2007Examination requested  [2008/02]
09.12.2008Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
25.03.2009Reply to a communication from the examining division
07.04.2017Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
18.08.2017Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2018/04]
20.09.2017Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time  [2018/04]
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  09.12.2008
Fees paidRenewal fee
18.03.2008Renewal fee patent year 03
19.03.2009Renewal fee patent year 04
18.03.2010Renewal fee patent year 05
18.03.2011Renewal fee patent year 06
19.03.2012Renewal fee patent year 07
19.03.2013Renewal fee patent year 08
17.03.2014Renewal fee patent year 09
17.03.2015Renewal fee patent year 10
17.03.2016Renewal fee patent year 11
17.03.2017Renewal fee patent year 12
Cited inInternational search[X]US5975216  (GIBBONS ET AL) [X] 1-3,5-18 * abstract * * column 3, line 7 - line 37 * * figure -; claim - *;
 [X]US6796384  (POTTER TODD K) [X] 1-6,9-18 * abstract * * column 2, line 1 - line 64 * * figure -; claim - *;
 [X]US6257347  (CAMPISI ROBERT M) [X] 1-6,9-18 * abstract * * column 3, line 21 - line 54 * * column 4, line 8 - line 47 * * column 5, line 2 - line 12 * * figure -; claim - *;
 [X]US6230817  (HAUGEN LARRY R) [X] 1,7-18 * abstract * * column 3, line 17 - line 44 * * figure -; claim - *
ExaminationUS5657825
 WO9002481