Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2024057

EP2024057 - PROCEDURE AND APPARATUS FOR CLEANING OF GAS, LIKE AIR FROM UNWANTED GASEOUS COMPOUNDS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  14.06.2013
Database last updated on 12.12.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip14.06.2013Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 17.07.2013  [2013/29]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Odoroff Oy
Jousitie 2 C
2070 Piispanristi / FI
[2009/08]
Inventor(s)01 / SAVIKKO, Heikki
Tuureporinkatu 19 A 4
FI-20100 Turku / FI
 [2009/08]
Representative(s)Salomäki, Juha Kari Ensio
Salomaki Oy
Kankurinkatu 4-6
05800 Hyvinkää / FI
[N/P]
Former [2009/08]Salomäki, Juha Kari Ensio
Salomaki Oy Kankurinkatu 4-6
05800 Hyvinkää / FI
Application number, filing date06743570.102.06.2006
[2009/08]
WO2006FI50228
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2007141366
Date:13.12.2007
Language:EN
[2007/50]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2024057
Date:18.02.2009
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 13.12.2007
[2009/08]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:FI13.12.2007
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP29.07.2011
ClassificationInternational:B01D53/14, B01D53/34, B01D53/48, B01D53/52
[2009/08]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   NL,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2009/08]
TitleGerman:VERFAHRENSWEISE UND VORRICHTUNG ZUR BEFREIUNG VON GAS WIE LUFT VON UNERWÜNSCHTEN GASFÖRMIGEN VERBINDUNGEN[2009/08]
English:PROCEDURE AND APPARATUS FOR CLEANING OF GAS, LIKE AIR FROM UNWANTED GASEOUS COMPOUNDS[2009/08]
French:PROCÉDÉ ET APPAREIL POUR LA PURIFICATION DE GAZ, TELS QUE L'AIR, DE COMPOSÉS GAZEUX INDÉSIRABLES[2009/08]
Entry into regional phase09.12.2008National basic fee paid 
09.12.2008Search fee paid 
09.12.2008Designation fee(s) paid 
09.12.2008Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure02.04.2008Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: FI
09.12.2008Examination requested  [2009/08]
16.02.2012Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
09.07.2012Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
22.01.2013Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2013/29]
27.02.2013Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time  [2013/29]
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  09.07.2012
Fees paidRenewal fee
09.12.2008Renewal fee patent year 03
30.06.2009Renewal fee patent year 04
30.06.2010Renewal fee patent year 05
28.06.2011Renewal fee patent year 06
29.06.2012Renewal fee patent year 07
Documents cited:Search[XY]WO03078028  (KIM BUM-HONG [KR]) [X] 1,4-7,10,12 * page 2, line 1 - page 4, line 5 * * page 6, lines 10-22; figure 1 * [Y] 2,3,8,9,11;
 [Y]US5667558  (BRYAN AVRON [US], et al) [Y] 11 * column 5, line 52 - column 7, line 22; figure 1 *;
 [Y]WO0213949  (SAVIKKO SAKARI [FI]) [Y] 2,8 * page 7, lines 14-34; claim 12 *;
 [A]US2004250684  (KRUMDIECK SUSAN PRAN [NZ], et al) [A] 1-12 * paragraphs [0010] - [0014] - [0028] , [0035]; figure 1 *;
 [Y]JPS57105227  (MITSUBISHI ELECTRIC CORP) [Y] 3,9 * abstract *
International search[Y]FI20031728
 [Y]US5667558
 [Y]WO0213949
 [Y]US4172880
 [Y]KR20030005586
 [Y]US4435192
 [Y]JPS57105227