Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1891571

EP1891571 - RESISTING THE SPREAD OF UNWANTED CODE AND DATA [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  11.07.2014
Database last updated on 19.08.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip11.07.2014No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 13.08.2014  [2014/33]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Glasswall (IP) Limited
Kensal House
77 Springfield Road
Chelmsford, Essex CM2 6JG / GB
[2013/36]
Former [2008/09]For all designated states
Glasswall (IP) Limited
2 Bramble Cottages Standon Green End, High Cross
Ware, Herts SG11 1BW / GB
Inventor(s)01 / SCALES, Nicholas John Glasswall (IP) Limited
Standon Green End
High Cross
Ware, Herts. SG11 1BW / GB
 [2013/36]
Former [2008/19]01 / SCALES, Nicholas John Glasswall (IP) Limited
Standon Green End High Cross
Ware, Herts. SG11 1BW / GB
Former [2008/09]01 / SCALES, Nicholas John
Sparrows Farm, Sparrows Farm Road
Terling, Essex CM3 2QY / GB
Representative(s)HGF Limited
8th Floor
140 London Wall
London EC2Y 5DN / GB
[N/P]
Former [2013/36]Harrison Goddard Foote LLP
8th Floor
140 London Wall
London EC2Y 5DN / GB
Former [2011/44]Harrison Goddard Foote
40-43 Chancery Lane London
WC2A 1JA / GB
Former [2011/39](deleted)
...
Former [2008/09]Dunlop, Hugh Christopher , et al
R.G.C. Jenkins & Co. 26 Caxton Street
London SW1H 0RJ / GB
Application number, filing date06744158.409.06.2006
[2008/09]
WO2006GB02107
Priority number, dateGB2005001174909.06.2005         Original published format: GB 0511749
[2008/09]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2006131744
Date:14.12.2006
Language:EN
[2006/50]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1891571
Date:27.02.2008
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 14.12.2006
[2008/09]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1891571
Date:04.09.2013
Language:EN
[2013/36]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP14.12.2006
ClassificationInternational:G06F21/56
[2013/18]
Former International [2008/09]G06F21/00
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   NL,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2008/09]
TitleGerman:HEMMUNG DER VERTEILUNG VON UNERWÜNSCHTEM CODE UND UNERWÜNSCHTEN DATEN[2008/09]
English:RESISTING THE SPREAD OF UNWANTED CODE AND DATA[2008/09]
French:SYSTEME POUR RESISTER A L'ETALEMENT DE CODES ET DE DONNEES NON DESIRES[2008/09]
Entry into regional phase03.01.2008National basic fee paid 
03.01.2008Designation fee(s) paid 
03.01.2008Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure19.11.2007Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
03.01.2008Examination requested  [2008/09]
15.02.2011Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
10.10.2011Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time
20.10.2011Reply to a communication from the examining division
16.04.2012Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
23.10.2012Reply to a communication from the examining division
14.03.2013Date of oral proceedings
10.04.2013Minutes of oral proceedings despatched
11.06.2013Communication of intention to grant the patent
26.07.2013Fee for grant paid
26.07.2013Fee for publishing/printing paid
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  15.02.2011
Opposition(s)05.06.2014No opposition filed within time limit [2014/33]
Request for further processing for:The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report
20.10.2011Request for further processing filed
20.10.2011Full payment received (date of receipt of payment)
Request granted
31.10.2011Decision despatched
Fees paidRenewal fee
28.03.2008Renewal fee patent year 03
16.06.2009Renewal fee patent year 04
11.06.2010Renewal fee patent year 05
13.06.2011Renewal fee patent year 06
24.04.2012Renewal fee patent year 07
02.04.2013Renewal fee patent year 08
Cited inInternational search[X]US2003196104  (BABER STEPHEN C [US], et al) [X] 1-25 * page 1, paragraph 10 - page 2, paragraph 14 * * page 2, paragraph 20 - page 3, paragraph 35 * * claims 7,10,11 *;
 [X]US2003145213  (CARBONE KEVIN J [US]) [X] 1,18,19,22-24 * page 2, paragraph 22 - page 3, paragraph 34 *;
 [X]US2003079158  (TOWER JAMES BRIAN [US], et al) [X] 1,18,19,22-24 * page 3, paragraph 44 * * page 5, paragraphs 89,90 * * page 7, paragraph 99 * * page 7, paragraph 103 - page 8, paragraph 108 * * figures 6,7,9,16 *;
 [X]US2004199594  (RADATTI PETER V [US], et al) [X] 23,24 * page 1, paragraph 17 * * page 3, paragraphs 33,34,37 * * page 4, paragraph 55 - paragraph 58 *;
 [A]US6401210  (TEMPLETON RANDALL F [US]) [A] 7-9 * column 1, line 65 - column 2, line 4 *
 [XA]  - MailStreet Features and Benefits, XP002356823 [X] 23,24 * the whole document * [A] 11,12
 [X]  - "Checking of incoming files for macro viruses", ONLINE, (2004), URL: http://www.bsi.de/english/gshb/manual/s/s04044.html, (20061104), XP002376936 [X] 23,24 * the whole document *
ExaminationUS2005081057
 US6336124
by applicantUS2005081057