EP1889293 - ELECTRONIC DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 10.01.2014 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.07.2015 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU, LU | published on 19.08.2015 [2015/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states NXP B.V. High Tech Campus 60 5656 AG Eindhoven / NL | [2008/08] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
VAN DER ZANDEN, Josephus, H., B. C/o Prof. Holstlaan 6 NL-5656 AA Eindhoven / NL | [2008/08] | Representative(s) | Schouten, Marcus Maria, et al NXP B.V. Intellectual Property & Licensing High Tech Campus 60 5656 AG Eindhoven / NL | [N/P] |
Former [2013/10] | Schouten, Marcus Maria, et al NXP B.V. IP & Licensing Department High Tech Campus 60 5656 AG Eindhoven / NL | ||
Former [2009/44] | Schouten, Marcus Maria, et al NXP B.V. IP & L Department High Tech Campus 32 5656 AE Eindhoven / NL | ||
Former [2008/33] | van der Veer, Johannis Leendert, et al NXP Semiconductors B.V. IP&L Department High Tech Campus 32 5656 AE Eindhoven / NL | ||
Former [2008/22] | van der Veer, Johannis Leendert, et al NXP Semiconductors B.V. IP Department High Tech Campus 32 5656 AE Eindhoven / NL | ||
Former [2008/08] | Schneider, Michael NXP Semiconductors IP Department Gutheil-Schoder-Gasse 8-12 1100 Wien / AT | Application number, filing date | 06744913.2 | 11.05.2006 | [2008/08] | WO2006IB51484 | Priority number, date | EP20050104508 | 26.05.2005 Original published format: EP 05104508 | [2008/08] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2006126125 | Date: | 30.11.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/48] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1889293 | Date: | 20.02.2008 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 30.11.2006 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2008/08] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1889293 | Date: | 06.03.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/10] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 30.11.2006 | Classification | IPC: | H01L27/02, G06F17/50 | [2008/08] | CPC: |
H01L27/0211 (EP,US);
H03F3/04 (KR);
H01L27/0203 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2008/08] | Extension states | AL | 27.12.2007 | BA | 27.12.2007 | HR | 27.12.2007 | MK | 27.12.2007 | YU | 27.12.2007 | Title | German: | ELEKTRONISCHE EINRICHTUNG | [2008/08] | English: | ELECTRONIC DEVICE | [2008/08] | French: | DISPOSITIF ELECTRONIQUE | [2008/08] | Entry into regional phase | 27.12.2007 | National basic fee paid | 27.12.2007 | Designation fee(s) paid | 27.12.2007 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 27.12.2007 | Examination requested [2008/08] | 08.04.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 08.04.2010 | Invitation to provide information on prior art | 29.04.2010 | Reply to the invitation to provide information on prior art | 04.08.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.09.2012 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 11.01.2013 | Fee for grant paid | 11.01.2013 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 08.04.2010 | Opposition(s) | 09.12.2013 | No opposition filed within time limit [2014/07] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.06.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 02.06.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.05.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.05.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 31.05.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 11.05.2006 | AT | 06.03.2013 | BE | 06.03.2013 | CY | 06.03.2013 | CZ | 06.03.2013 | DK | 06.03.2013 | EE | 06.03.2013 | FI | 06.03.2013 | IT | 06.03.2013 | LT | 06.03.2013 | LV | 06.03.2013 | MC | 06.03.2013 | NL | 06.03.2013 | PL | 06.03.2013 | RO | 06.03.2013 | SE | 06.03.2013 | SI | 06.03.2013 | SK | 06.03.2013 | TR | 06.03.2013 | IE | 11.05.2013 | LU | 11.05.2013 | CH | 31.05.2013 | FR | 31.05.2013 | LI | 31.05.2013 | BG | 06.06.2013 | GB | 06.06.2013 | GR | 07.06.2013 | ES | 17.06.2013 | IS | 06.07.2013 | PT | 08.07.2013 | [2015/34] |
Former [2015/32] | AT | 06.03.2013 | |
BE | 06.03.2013 | ||
CY | 06.03.2013 | ||
CZ | 06.03.2013 | ||
DK | 06.03.2013 | ||
EE | 06.03.2013 | ||
FI | 06.03.2013 | ||
IT | 06.03.2013 | ||
LT | 06.03.2013 | ||
LV | 06.03.2013 | ||
MC | 06.03.2013 | ||
NL | 06.03.2013 | ||
PL | 06.03.2013 | ||
RO | 06.03.2013 | ||
SE | 06.03.2013 | ||
SI | 06.03.2013 | ||
SK | 06.03.2013 | ||
TR | 06.03.2013 | ||
IE | 11.05.2013 | ||
CH | 31.05.2013 | ||
FR | 31.05.2013 | ||
LI | 31.05.2013 | ||
BG | 06.06.2013 | ||
GB | 06.06.2013 | ||
GR | 07.06.2013 | ||
ES | 17.06.2013 | ||
IS | 06.07.2013 | ||
PT | 08.07.2013 | ||
Former [2014/24] | AT | 06.03.2013 | |
BE | 06.03.2013 | ||
CY | 06.03.2013 | ||
CZ | 06.03.2013 | ||
DK | 06.03.2013 | ||
EE | 06.03.2013 | ||
FI | 06.03.2013 | ||
IT | 06.03.2013 | ||
LT | 06.03.2013 | ||
LV | 06.03.2013 | ||
MC | 06.03.2013 | ||
NL | 06.03.2013 | ||
PL | 06.03.2013 | ||
RO | 06.03.2013 | ||
SE | 06.03.2013 | ||
SI | 06.03.2013 | ||
SK | 06.03.2013 | ||
IE | 11.05.2013 | ||
CH | 31.05.2013 | ||
FR | 31.05.2013 | ||
LI | 31.05.2013 | ||
BG | 06.06.2013 | ||
GB | 06.06.2013 | ||
GR | 07.06.2013 | ||
ES | 17.06.2013 | ||
IS | 06.07.2013 | ||
PT | 08.07.2013 | ||
Former [2014/21] | AT | 06.03.2013 | |
BE | 06.03.2013 | ||
CY | 06.03.2013 | ||
CZ | 06.03.2013 | ||
DK | 06.03.2013 | ||
EE | 06.03.2013 | ||
FI | 06.03.2013 | ||
IT | 06.03.2013 | ||
LT | 06.03.2013 | ||
LV | 06.03.2013 | ||
MC | 06.03.2013 | ||
NL | 06.03.2013 | ||
PL | 06.03.2013 | ||
RO | 06.03.2013 | ||
SE | 06.03.2013 | ||
SI | 06.03.2013 | ||
SK | 06.03.2013 | ||
IE | 11.05.2013 | ||
CH | 31.05.2013 | ||
LI | 31.05.2013 | ||
BG | 06.06.2013 | ||
GB | 06.06.2013 | ||
GR | 07.06.2013 | ||
ES | 17.06.2013 | ||
IS | 06.07.2013 | ||
PT | 08.07.2013 | ||
Former [2014/20] | AT | 06.03.2013 | |
BE | 06.03.2013 | ||
CY | 06.03.2013 | ||
CZ | 06.03.2013 | ||
DK | 06.03.2013 | ||
EE | 06.03.2013 | ||
FI | 06.03.2013 | ||
IT | 06.03.2013 | ||
LT | 06.03.2013 | ||
LV | 06.03.2013 | ||
MC | 06.03.2013 | ||
NL | 06.03.2013 | ||
PL | 06.03.2013 | ||
RO | 06.03.2013 | ||
SE | 06.03.2013 | ||
SI | 06.03.2013 | ||
SK | 06.03.2013 | ||
IE | 11.05.2013 | ||
CH | 31.05.2013 | ||
LI | 31.05.2013 | ||
BG | 06.06.2013 | ||
GR | 07.06.2013 | ||
ES | 17.06.2013 | ||
IS | 06.07.2013 | ||
PT | 08.07.2013 | ||
Former [2014/11] | AT | 06.03.2013 | |
BE | 06.03.2013 | ||
CY | 06.03.2013 | ||
CZ | 06.03.2013 | ||
DK | 06.03.2013 | ||
EE | 06.03.2013 | ||
FI | 06.03.2013 | ||
IT | 06.03.2013 | ||
LT | 06.03.2013 | ||
LV | 06.03.2013 | ||
MC | 06.03.2013 | ||
NL | 06.03.2013 | ||
PL | 06.03.2013 | ||
RO | 06.03.2013 | ||
SE | 06.03.2013 | ||
SI | 06.03.2013 | ||
SK | 06.03.2013 | ||
CH | 31.05.2013 | ||
LI | 31.05.2013 | ||
BG | 06.06.2013 | ||
GR | 07.06.2013 | ||
ES | 17.06.2013 | ||
IS | 06.07.2013 | ||
PT | 08.07.2013 | ||
Former [2014/09] | AT | 06.03.2013 | |
BE | 06.03.2013 | ||
CY | 06.03.2013 | ||
CZ | 06.03.2013 | ||
DK | 06.03.2013 | ||
EE | 06.03.2013 | ||
FI | 06.03.2013 | ||
LT | 06.03.2013 | ||
LV | 06.03.2013 | ||
MC | 06.03.2013 | ||
NL | 06.03.2013 | ||
PL | 06.03.2013 | ||
RO | 06.03.2013 | ||
SE | 06.03.2013 | ||
SI | 06.03.2013 | ||
SK | 06.03.2013 | ||
CH | 31.05.2013 | ||
LI | 31.05.2013 | ||
BG | 06.06.2013 | ||
GR | 07.06.2013 | ||
ES | 17.06.2013 | ||
IS | 06.07.2013 | ||
PT | 08.07.2013 | ||
Former [2014/08] | AT | 06.03.2013 | |
BE | 06.03.2013 | ||
CY | 06.03.2013 | ||
CZ | 06.03.2013 | ||
EE | 06.03.2013 | ||
FI | 06.03.2013 | ||
LT | 06.03.2013 | ||
LV | 06.03.2013 | ||
MC | 06.03.2013 | ||
NL | 06.03.2013 | ||
PL | 06.03.2013 | ||
RO | 06.03.2013 | ||
SE | 06.03.2013 | ||
SI | 06.03.2013 | ||
SK | 06.03.2013 | ||
CH | 31.05.2013 | ||
LI | 31.05.2013 | ||
BG | 06.06.2013 | ||
GR | 07.06.2013 | ||
ES | 17.06.2013 | ||
IS | 06.07.2013 | ||
PT | 08.07.2013 | ||
Former [2014/03] | AT | 06.03.2013 | |
BE | 06.03.2013 | ||
CY | 06.03.2013 | ||
CZ | 06.03.2013 | ||
EE | 06.03.2013 | ||
FI | 06.03.2013 | ||
LT | 06.03.2013 | ||
LV | 06.03.2013 | ||
MC | 06.03.2013 | ||
NL | 06.03.2013 | ||
PL | 06.03.2013 | ||
RO | 06.03.2013 | ||
SE | 06.03.2013 | ||
SI | 06.03.2013 | ||
SK | 06.03.2013 | ||
BG | 06.06.2013 | ||
GR | 07.06.2013 | ||
ES | 17.06.2013 | ||
IS | 06.07.2013 | ||
PT | 08.07.2013 | ||
Former [2013/52] | AT | 06.03.2013 | |
BE | 06.03.2013 | ||
CY | 06.03.2013 | ||
CZ | 06.03.2013 | ||
EE | 06.03.2013 | ||
FI | 06.03.2013 | ||
LT | 06.03.2013 | ||
LV | 06.03.2013 | ||
NL | 06.03.2013 | ||
PL | 06.03.2013 | ||
RO | 06.03.2013 | ||
SE | 06.03.2013 | ||
SI | 06.03.2013 | ||
SK | 06.03.2013 | ||
BG | 06.06.2013 | ||
GR | 07.06.2013 | ||
ES | 17.06.2013 | ||
IS | 06.07.2013 | ||
PT | 08.07.2013 | ||
Former [2013/50] | AT | 06.03.2013 | |
BE | 06.03.2013 | ||
CZ | 06.03.2013 | ||
EE | 06.03.2013 | ||
FI | 06.03.2013 | ||
LT | 06.03.2013 | ||
LV | 06.03.2013 | ||
NL | 06.03.2013 | ||
PL | 06.03.2013 | ||
RO | 06.03.2013 | ||
SE | 06.03.2013 | ||
SI | 06.03.2013 | ||
SK | 06.03.2013 | ||
BG | 06.06.2013 | ||
GR | 07.06.2013 | ||
ES | 17.06.2013 | ||
IS | 06.07.2013 | ||
PT | 08.07.2013 | ||
Former [2013/49] | AT | 06.03.2013 | |
BE | 06.03.2013 | ||
CZ | 06.03.2013 | ||
EE | 06.03.2013 | ||
FI | 06.03.2013 | ||
LT | 06.03.2013 | ||
LV | 06.03.2013 | ||
NL | 06.03.2013 | ||
RO | 06.03.2013 | ||
SE | 06.03.2013 | ||
SI | 06.03.2013 | ||
SK | 06.03.2013 | ||
BG | 06.06.2013 | ||
GR | 07.06.2013 | ||
ES | 17.06.2013 | ||
IS | 06.07.2013 | ||
PT | 08.07.2013 | ||
Former [2013/48] | AT | 06.03.2013 | |
BE | 06.03.2013 | ||
EE | 06.03.2013 | ||
FI | 06.03.2013 | ||
LT | 06.03.2013 | ||
LV | 06.03.2013 | ||
NL | 06.03.2013 | ||
SE | 06.03.2013 | ||
SI | 06.03.2013 | ||
BG | 06.06.2013 | ||
GR | 07.06.2013 | ||
ES | 17.06.2013 | ||
IS | 06.07.2013 | ||
PT | 08.07.2013 | ||
Former [2013/47] | AT | 06.03.2013 | |
BE | 06.03.2013 | ||
FI | 06.03.2013 | ||
LT | 06.03.2013 | ||
LV | 06.03.2013 | ||
SE | 06.03.2013 | ||
SI | 06.03.2013 | ||
BG | 06.06.2013 | ||
GR | 07.06.2013 | ||
ES | 17.06.2013 | ||
PT | 08.07.2013 | ||
Former [2013/44] | AT | 06.03.2013 | |
BE | 06.03.2013 | ||
FI | 06.03.2013 | ||
LT | 06.03.2013 | ||
LV | 06.03.2013 | ||
SE | 06.03.2013 | ||
SI | 06.03.2013 | ||
BG | 06.06.2013 | ||
GR | 07.06.2013 | ||
ES | 17.06.2013 | ||
Former [2013/38] | AT | 06.03.2013 | |
FI | 06.03.2013 | ||
LT | 06.03.2013 | ||
LV | 06.03.2013 | ||
SE | 06.03.2013 | ||
SI | 06.03.2013 | ||
BG | 06.06.2013 | ||
GR | 07.06.2013 | ||
ES | 17.06.2013 | ||
Former [2013/37] | AT | 06.03.2013 | |
FI | 06.03.2013 | ||
LT | 06.03.2013 | ||
SE | 06.03.2013 | ||
SI | 06.03.2013 | ||
BG | 06.06.2013 | ||
GR | 07.06.2013 | ||
ES | 17.06.2013 | ||
Former [2013/36] | AT | 06.03.2013 | |
LT | 06.03.2013 | ||
SE | 06.03.2013 | ||
BG | 06.06.2013 | ||
ES | 17.06.2013 | ||
Former [2013/34] | LT | 06.03.2013 | |
SE | 06.03.2013 | ||
BG | 06.06.2013 | ||
Former [2013/33] | LT | 06.03.2013 | Cited in | International search | [XI]GB2213320 (MITSUBISHI ELECTRIC CORP [JP]) [X] 1-3 * page 7, line 16 - page 11, line 34; figures 5-9 * [I] 4-12; | [A]US5021853 (MISTRY KAIZAD R [US]) [A] 1-12* column 2, line 59 - column 6, line 7; figures 1-8 *; | [DA]US5623232 (HALBERT JOEL M [US], et al) [DA] 1-12 * column 2, line 26 - line 49; figures 1,2 * * column 4, line 3 - column 8, line 7 *; | [DA]US2002097097 (SUGIURA MASAYUKI [JP]) [DA] 1-12 * paragraph [0033] - paragraph [0061]; figures 1-14 *; | [A] - SU J -G ET AL H ET AL, "New insights on RF CMOS stability related to bias, scaling, and temperature", PROCEEDINGS 2000 IEEE HONG KONG ELECTRON DEVICES MEETING (CAT. NO.00TH8503) IEEE PISCATAWAY, NJ, USA, (2000), ISBN 0-7803-6304-3, pages 40 - 43, XP002403034 [A] 1-12 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/HKEDM.2000.904211 | by applicant | GB2213320 |