Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1889083

EP1889083 - DEVICE, SYSTEM AND METHOD FOR TESTING AND ANALYSING INTEGRATED CIRCUITS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  17.09.2010
Database last updated on 18.06.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip19.10.2012Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): TR
published on 21.11.2012  [2012/47]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
NXP B.V.
High Tech Campus 60
5656 AG Eindhoven / NL
[2008/08]
Inventor(s)01 / GUMMER, Anthony, S., J.
C/o Prof. Holstlaan 6
NL-5656 AA Eindhoven / NL
 [2008/08]
Representative(s)Schouten, Marcus Maria , et al
NXP B.V.
Intellectual Property & Licensing
High Tech Campus 60
5656 AG Eindhoven / NL
[N/P]
Former [2009/44]Schouten, Marcus Maria , et al
NXP B.V. IP & L Department High Tech Campus 32
5656 AE Eindhoven / NL
Former [2008/14]van der Veer, Johannis Leendert , et al
NXP Semiconductors Intellectual Property Department High Tech Campus 60
5656 AG Eindhoven / NL
Former [2008/08]Pennings, Johannes
NXP Semiconductors Intellectual Property Department High Tech Campus 60
5656 AG Eindhoven / NL
Application number, filing date06744921.512.05.2006
[2008/08]
WO2006IB51493
Priority number, dateEP2005010455627.05.2005         Original published format: EP 05104556
[2008/08]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2  Application without search report
No.:WO2006126130
Date:30.11.2006
Language:EN
[2006/48]
Type: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1889083
Date:20.02.2008
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 30.11.2006
[2008/08]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1889083
Date:11.11.2009
Language:EN
[2009/46]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP08.03.2007
ClassificationInternational:G01R31/28
[2008/08]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   NL,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2008/08]
Extension statesALNot yet paid
BANot yet paid
HRNot yet paid
MKNot yet paid
YUNot yet paid
TitleGerman:EINRICHTUNG, SYSTEM UND VERFAHREN ZUM PRÜFEN UND ANALYSIEREN INTEGRIERTER SCHALTUNGEN.[2009/26]
English:DEVICE, SYSTEM AND METHOD FOR TESTING AND ANALYSING INTEGRATED CIRCUITS[2008/08]
French:DISPOSITIF, SYSTEME ET PROCEDE POUR TESTER ET ANALYSER DES CIRCUITS INTEGRES[2008/08]
Former [2008/08]EINRICHTUNG, SYSTEM UND VERFAHREN ZUM PRÜFEN UND ANALYSIEREN INTEGRIERTER SCHALTUNGEN
Entry into regional phase27.12.2007National basic fee paid 
27.12.2007Designation fee(s) paid 
27.12.2007Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure27.12.2007Examination requested  [2008/08]
05.08.2008Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
01.12.2008Reply to a communication from the examining division
27.05.2009Communication of intention to grant the patent
25.09.2009Fee for grant paid
25.09.2009Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)12.08.2010No opposition filed within time limit [2010/42]
Fees paidRenewal fee
02.06.2008Renewal fee patent year 03
02.06.2009Renewal fee patent year 04
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT11.11.2009
BE11.11.2009
CY11.11.2009
CZ11.11.2009
DK11.11.2009
EE11.11.2009
FI11.11.2009
IT11.11.2009
LT11.11.2009
LV11.11.2009
NL11.11.2009
PL11.11.2009
RO11.11.2009
SE11.11.2009
SI11.11.2009
SK11.11.2009
TR11.11.2009
BG11.02.2010
GR12.02.2010
ES22.02.2010
IS11.03.2010
PT11.03.2010
HU12.05.2010
IE12.05.2010
LU12.05.2010
CH31.05.2010
LI31.05.2010
MC31.05.2010
[2012/47]
Former [2012/44]AT11.11.2009
BE11.11.2009
CY11.11.2009
CZ11.11.2009
DK11.11.2009
EE11.11.2009
FI11.11.2009
IT11.11.2009
LT11.11.2009
LV11.11.2009
NL11.11.2009
PL11.11.2009
RO11.11.2009
SE11.11.2009
SI11.11.2009
SK11.11.2009
BG11.02.2010
GR12.02.2010
ES22.02.2010
IS11.03.2010
PT11.03.2010
HU12.05.2010
IE12.05.2010
LU12.05.2010
CH31.05.2010
LI31.05.2010
MC31.05.2010
Former [2012/43]AT11.11.2009
BE11.11.2009
CY11.11.2009
CZ11.11.2009
DK11.11.2009
EE11.11.2009
FI11.11.2009
IT11.11.2009
LT11.11.2009
LV11.11.2009
PL11.11.2009
RO11.11.2009
SE11.11.2009
SI11.11.2009
SK11.11.2009
BG11.02.2010
GR12.02.2010
ES22.02.2010
IS11.03.2010
PT11.03.2010
HU12.05.2010
IE12.05.2010
LU12.05.2010
CH31.05.2010
LI31.05.2010
MC31.05.2010
Former [2012/42]AT11.11.2009
BE11.11.2009
CY11.11.2009
CZ11.11.2009
DK11.11.2009
EE11.11.2009
FI11.11.2009
IT11.11.2009
LT11.11.2009
LV11.11.2009
PL11.11.2009
RO11.11.2009
SE11.11.2009
SI11.11.2009
SK11.11.2009
BG11.02.2010
GR12.02.2010
ES22.02.2010
IS11.03.2010
PT11.03.2010
HU12.05.2010
IE12.05.2010
CH31.05.2010
LI31.05.2010
MC31.05.2010
Former [2011/19]AT11.11.2009
BE11.11.2009
CY11.11.2009
CZ11.11.2009
DK11.11.2009
EE11.11.2009
FI11.11.2009
IT11.11.2009
LT11.11.2009
LV11.11.2009
PL11.11.2009
RO11.11.2009
SE11.11.2009
SI11.11.2009
SK11.11.2009
BG11.02.2010
GR12.02.2010
ES22.02.2010
IS11.03.2010
PT11.03.2010
IE12.05.2010
CH31.05.2010
LI31.05.2010
MC31.05.2010
Former [2011/17]AT11.11.2009
BE11.11.2009
CY11.11.2009
CZ11.11.2009
DK11.11.2009
EE11.11.2009
FI11.11.2009
IT11.11.2009
LT11.11.2009
LV11.11.2009
PL11.11.2009
RO11.11.2009
SE11.11.2009
SI11.11.2009
SK11.11.2009
BG11.02.2010
GR12.02.2010
ES22.02.2010
IS11.03.2010
PT11.03.2010
CH31.05.2010
LI31.05.2010
MC31.05.2010
Former [2011/04]AT11.11.2009
BE11.11.2009
CY11.11.2009
CZ11.11.2009
DK11.11.2009
EE11.11.2009
FI11.11.2009
LT11.11.2009
LV11.11.2009
PL11.11.2009
RO11.11.2009
SE11.11.2009
SI11.11.2009
SK11.11.2009
BG11.02.2010
GR12.02.2010
ES22.02.2010
IS11.03.2010
PT11.03.2010
MC31.05.2010
Former [2010/41]AT11.11.2009
BE11.11.2009
CY11.11.2009
CZ11.11.2009
DK11.11.2009
EE11.11.2009
FI11.11.2009
LT11.11.2009
LV11.11.2009
PL11.11.2009
RO11.11.2009
SE11.11.2009
SI11.11.2009
SK11.11.2009
BG11.02.2010
ES22.02.2010
IS11.03.2010
PT11.03.2010
Former [2010/31]AT11.11.2009
BE11.11.2009
CY11.11.2009
FI11.11.2009
LT11.11.2009
LV11.11.2009
PL11.11.2009
SE11.11.2009
SI11.11.2009
ES22.02.2010
IS11.03.2010
PT11.03.2010
Former [2010/30]AT11.11.2009
CY11.11.2009
FI11.11.2009
LT11.11.2009
LV11.11.2009
PL11.11.2009
SE11.11.2009
SI11.11.2009
ES22.02.2010
IS11.03.2010
PT11.03.2010
Former [2010/26]CY11.11.2009
FI11.11.2009
LT11.11.2009
LV11.11.2009
PL11.11.2009
SE11.11.2009
SI11.11.2009
ES22.02.2010
IS11.03.2010
PT11.03.2010
Former [2010/19]ES22.02.2010
Cited inInternational search[X]US6292006
 [X]US5656943
 [AD]US6127833
 [A]US5489852
 [A]US2004056675