Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1894510

EP1894510 - ENDOSCOPE [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  10.02.2012
Database last updated on 15.02.2020
Most recent event   Tooltip22.06.2012Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): GB
published on 25.07.2012  [2012/30]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
OLYMPUS MEDICAL SYSTEMS CORP.
43-2, Hatagaya 2-chome Shibuya-ku
Tokyo 151-0072 / JP
[2008/10]
Inventor(s)01 / DOGUCHI, Nobuyuki c/o OLYMPUS MEDICAL SYSTEMS CORP.
43-2, Hatagaya 2-chome, Shibuya-ku
Tokyo 151-0072 / JP
02 / ICHIMURA, Hironobu c/oOLYMPUS MEDICAL SYSTEMS CORP.
43-2, Hatagaya 2-chome, Shibuya-ku
Tokyo 151-0072 / JP
 [2010/48]
Former [2008/10]01 / DOGUCHI, Nobuyuki c/o OLYMPUS MEDICAL SYSTEMS CORP.
43-2, Hatagaya 2-chome, Shibuya-ku
Tokyo 151-0072 / JP
02 / ICHIMURA, Hironobu c/oOLYMPUS MEDICAL SYSTEMS CORP.
43-2, Hatagaya 2-chome, Shibuya-ku
Tokyo 151-0072 / JP
Representative(s)von Hellfeld, Axel
Wuesthoff & Wuesthoff
Patentanwälte PartG mbB
Schweigerstrasse 2
81541 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2009/51]von Hellfeld, Axel
Wuesthoff & Wuesthoff Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Schweigerstrasse 2
81541 München / DE
Former [2008/10]von Hellfeld, Axel
Wuesthoff & Wuesthoff Schweigerstrasse 2
81541 München / DE
Application number, filing date06745714.326.04.2006
[2008/10]
WO2006JP308736
Priority number, dateJP2005017972420.06.2005         Original published format: JP 2005179724
[2008/10]
Filing languageJA
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2006137217
Date:28.12.2006
Language:JA
[2006/52]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1894510
Date:05.03.2008
Language:EN
[2008/10]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1894510
Date:06.04.2011
Language:EN
[2011/14]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:JP28.12.2006
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP19.02.2010
ClassificationInternational:A61B1/00
[2008/10]
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB [2008/30]
Former [2008/10]AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  NL,  PL,  PT,  RO,  SE,  SI,  SK,  TR 
Extension statesALNot yet paid
BANot yet paid
HRNot yet paid
MKNot yet paid
YUNot yet paid
TitleGerman:ENDOSKOP[2008/10]
English:ENDOSCOPE[2008/10]
French:ENDOSCOPE[2008/10]
Entry into regional phase14.12.2007Translation filed 
14.12.2007National basic fee paid 
14.12.2007Search fee paid 
14.12.2007Designation fee(s) paid 
14.12.2007Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure14.12.2007Examination requested  [2008/10]
22.01.2008Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s)
26.02.2008Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR
10.06.2010Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
31.08.2010Reply to a communication from the examining division
09.11.2010Communication of intention to grant the patent
16.02.2011Fee for grant paid
16.02.2011Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)10.01.2012No opposition filed within time limit [2012/11]
Fees paidRenewal fee
17.04.2008Renewal fee patent year 03
16.04.2009Renewal fee patent year 04
18.03.2010Renewal fee patent year 05
Lapses during opposition  TooltipFR06.06.2011
GB06.07.2011
[2012/30]
Former [2012/23]FR06.06.2011
Documents cited:Search[XY]EP0228493  (WARNER LAMBERT TECH [US]) [X] 1,8 * column 2, lines 12-26 * * column 3, line 46 - column 4, line 6; claims 1,12 * [Y] 9;
 [Y]US2003120129  (NAKAMURA TETSUYA [JP]) [Y] 9 * paragraphs [0035] , [0036]; figure 2A *;
 [A]US2004156124  (OKADA SHINSUKE [JP]) [A] 1 * paragraphs [0027] , [0034] - [0036] - [0040] - [0042]; figures 1-3 *