Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1880842

EP1880842 - ABSORBENT COMPOSITE MATERIAL AND METHOD FOR MANUFACTURING THE SAME [Right-click to bookmark this link]
Former [2008/04]ABSORBENT COMPOSITE MATERIAL AND METHOD FOR PRODUCING SAME
[2011/11]
StatusPatent maintained as amended
Status updated on  16.09.2016
Database last updated on 26.02.2020
Most recent event   Tooltip23.03.2018Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
State(s) deleted from list of lapses: LV
published on 25.04.2018  [2018/17]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Asahi Kasei Chemicals Corporation
1-2, Yuraku-cho 1-chome, Chiyoda-ku
Tokyo 100-8440 / JP
[2016/42]
Former [2008/04]For all designated states
Asahi Kasei Chemicals Corporation
1-2, Yuraku-cho 1-chome, Chiyoda-ku
Tokyo 100-8440 / JP
Inventor(s)01 / AKIYAMA, Tsutomu
1-2, Yuraku-cho 1-chome, Chiyoda-ku
Tokyo 1008440 / JP
02 / KODAMA, Tamotsu
1-2, Yuraku-cho 1-chome, Chiyoda-ku
Tokyo 1008440 / JP
03 / NISHI, Masataka
1-2, Yuraku-cho 1-chome, Chiyoda-ku
Tokyo 1008440 / JP
04 / OKAMOTO, Hiroshige
1-2, Yuraku-cho 1-chome, Chiyoda-ku
Tokyo 1008440 / JP
 [2008/04]
Representative(s)D Young & Co LLP
120 Holborn
London EC1N 2DY / GB
[2016/42]
Former [2013/23]O'Brien, Simon Warwick , et al
D Young & Co LLP 120 Holborn
London EC1N 2DY / GB
Former [2013/12]McConchie, Connor Fraser , et al
D Young & Co LLP 120 Holborn
London EC1N 2DY / GB
Former [2008/04]Bradley, Josephine Mary , et al
D Young & Co 120 Holborn
London EC1N 2DY / GB
Application number, filing date06746333.112.05.2006
[2008/04]
WO2006JP309536
Priority number, dateJP2005014137113.05.2005         Original published format: JP 2005141371
JP2005014483718.05.2005         Original published format: JP 2005144837
JP2005027997627.09.2005         Original published format: JP 2005279976
[2008/04]
Filing languageJA
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2006121148
Date:16.11.2006
Language:JA
[2006/46]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1880842
Date:23.01.2008
Language:EN
[2008/04]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1880842
Date:30.03.2011
Language:EN
[2011/13]
Type: B2 New European patent specification 
No.:EP1880842
Date:19.10.2016
Language:EN
[2016/42]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:JP16.11.2006
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP03.04.2009
ClassificationInternational:B32B7/04, B32B27/10, B32B27/12, A61F13/49, A61F13/53
[2008/04]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   NL,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2016/42]
Former [2008/04]AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  NL,  PL,  PT,  RO,  SE,  SI,  SK,  TR 
TitleGerman:ABSORBIERENDES VERBUNDMATERIAL UND HERSTELLUNGSVERFAHREN DAFÜR[2008/04]
English:ABSORBENT COMPOSITE MATERIAL AND METHOD FOR MANUFACTURING THE SAME[2011/11]
French:MATERIAU COMPOSITE ABSORBANT ET SON PROCEDE DE FABRICATION[2008/04]
Former [2008/04]ABSORBENT COMPOSITE MATERIAL AND METHOD FOR PRODUCING SAME
Entry into regional phase13.11.2007Translation filed 
13.11.2007National basic fee paid 
13.11.2007Search fee paid 
13.11.2007Designation fee(s) paid 
13.11.2007Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure13.11.2007Examination requested  [2008/04]
02.06.2009Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
09.10.2009Reply to a communication from the examining division
27.09.2010Communication of intention to grant the patent
14.01.2011Fee for grant paid
14.01.2011Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  23.12.2011  03.02.2012  ADMISSIBLE
Kimberly-Clark Worldwide, Inc.
401 North Lake Street
Neenah, Wisconsin 54956 / US
Opponent's representative
Beacham, Annabel Rose, et al
Dehns
St Bride's House
10 Salisbury Square
London EC4Y 8JD / GB
 02  30.12.2011  12.01.2012  ADMISSIBLE
SCA Hygiene Products AB
405 03 Göteborg / SE
Opponent's representative
Valea AB
Box 1098
405 23 Göteborg / SE
 [N/P]
Former [2012/06]
Opponent(s)01  23.12.2011    ADMISSIBLE
Kimberly-Clark Worldwide, Inc.
401 North Lake Street
Neenah, Wisconsin 54956 / US
Opponent's representative
Beacham, Annabel Rose
Dehns St Bride's House 10 Salisbury Square London
EC4Y 8JD / GB
 02  30.12.2011   
SCA Hygiene Products AB
405 03 Göteborg / SE
Opponent's representative
VALEA AB
Lindholmspiren 5
417 56 Göteborg / SE
Former [2012/05]
Opponent(s)01  23.12.2011    ADMISSIBLE
Kimberly-Clark Worldwide, Inc.
401 North Lake Street
Neenah, Wisconsin 54956 / US
Opponent's representative
Beacham, Annabel Rose
Dehns St Bride's House 10 Salisbury Square London
EC4Y 8JD / GB
09.02.2012Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
09.08.2012Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
08.10.2015Legal effect of interlocutory decision in opposition
08.10.2015Date of oral proceedings
28.10.2015Despatch of a communication from the opposition division (Time limit: M02)
28.10.2015Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
22.12.2015Reply to a communication from the opposition division
19.02.2016Despatch of interlocutory decision in opposition
07.06.2016Despatch of communication that the patent will be maintained as amended
06.09.2016Fee for printing new specification paid
Fees paidRenewal fee
13.03.2008Renewal fee patent year 03
19.05.2009Renewal fee patent year 04
17.03.2010Renewal fee patent year 05
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT30.03.2011
BE30.03.2011
CY30.03.2011
CZ30.03.2011
DK30.03.2011
EE30.03.2011
FI30.03.2011
HU30.03.2011
IT30.03.2011
LT30.03.2011
NL30.03.2011
PL30.03.2011
RO30.03.2011
SI30.03.2011
SK30.03.2011
TR30.03.2011
IE12.05.2011
LU12.05.2011
CH31.05.2011
LI31.05.2011
MC31.05.2011
BG30.06.2011
GR01.07.2011
ES11.07.2011
IS30.07.2011
PT01.08.2011
[2017/10]
Former [2013/45]AT30.03.2011
BE30.03.2011
CY30.03.2011
CZ30.03.2011
DK30.03.2011
EE30.03.2011
FI30.03.2011
HU30.03.2011
IT30.03.2011
LT30.03.2011
LV30.03.2011
NL30.03.2011
PL30.03.2011
RO30.03.2011
SI30.03.2011
SK30.03.2011
TR30.03.2011
IE12.05.2011
LU12.05.2011
CH31.05.2011
LI31.05.2011
MC31.05.2011
BG30.06.2011
GR01.07.2011
ES11.07.2011
IS30.07.2011
PT01.08.2011
Former [2013/44]AT30.03.2011
BE30.03.2011
CY30.03.2011
CZ30.03.2011
DK30.03.2011
EE30.03.2011
FI30.03.2011
IT30.03.2011
LT30.03.2011
LV30.03.2011
NL30.03.2011
PL30.03.2011
RO30.03.2011
SI30.03.2011
SK30.03.2011
TR30.03.2011
IE12.05.2011
LU12.05.2011
CH31.05.2011
LI31.05.2011
MC31.05.2011
BG30.06.2011
GR01.07.2011
ES11.07.2011
IS30.07.2011
PT01.08.2011
Former [2013/29]AT30.03.2011
BE30.03.2011
CY30.03.2011
CZ30.03.2011
DK30.03.2011
EE30.03.2011
FI30.03.2011
IT30.03.2011
LT30.03.2011
LV30.03.2011
NL30.03.2011
PL30.03.2011
RO30.03.2011
SI30.03.2011
SK30.03.2011
IE12.05.2011
LU12.05.2011
CH31.05.2011
LI31.05.2011
MC31.05.2011
BG30.06.2011
GR01.07.2011
ES11.07.2011
IS30.07.2011
PT01.08.2011
Former [2012/10]AT30.03.2011
BE30.03.2011
CY30.03.2011
CZ30.03.2011
DK30.03.2011
EE30.03.2011
FI30.03.2011
LT30.03.2011
LV30.03.2011
NL30.03.2011
RO30.03.2011
SI30.03.2011
SK30.03.2011
CH31.05.2011
LI31.05.2011
MC31.05.2011
GR01.07.2011
ES11.07.2011
IS30.07.2011
PT01.08.2011
Former [2012/05]AT30.03.2011
BE30.03.2011
CY30.03.2011
CZ30.03.2011
EE30.03.2011
FI30.03.2011
LT30.03.2011
LV30.03.2011
NL30.03.2011
RO30.03.2011
SI30.03.2011
SK30.03.2011
MC31.05.2011
GR01.07.2011
ES11.07.2011
IS30.07.2011
PT01.08.2011
PL22.08.2011
Former [2012/02]AT30.03.2011
BE30.03.2011
CY30.03.2011
CZ30.03.2011
EE30.03.2011
FI30.03.2011
LT30.03.2011
LV30.03.2011
NL30.03.2011
RO30.03.2011
SI30.03.2011
SK30.03.2011
GR01.07.2011
ES11.07.2011
IS30.07.2011
PT01.08.2011
PL22.08.2011
Former [2011/50]AT30.03.2011
BE30.03.2011
CY30.03.2011
CZ30.03.2011
EE30.03.2011
FI30.03.2011
LT30.03.2011
LV30.03.2011
RO30.03.2011
SI30.03.2011
SK30.03.2011
GR01.07.2011
ES11.07.2011
IS30.07.2011
PT01.08.2011
PL22.08.2011
Former [2011/47]AT30.03.2011
BE30.03.2011
CY30.03.2011
EE30.03.2011
FI30.03.2011
LT30.03.2011
LV30.03.2011
SI30.03.2011
GR01.07.2011
PT01.08.2011
Former [2011/41]AT30.03.2011
BE30.03.2011
CY30.03.2011
FI30.03.2011
LT30.03.2011
LV30.03.2011
SI30.03.2011
GR01.07.2011
Former [2011/37]CY30.03.2011
FI30.03.2011
LT30.03.2011
LV30.03.2011
SI30.03.2011
GR01.07.2011
Former [2011/36]LT30.03.2011
LV30.03.2011
GR01.07.2011
Documents cited:Search[A]US4721647  (NAKANISHI MINORU [JP] ET AL) [A] 1-22,29,30 * the whole document *;
 [A]JP2002370025  (MITSUBISHI CHEM CORP) [A] 1-22,29,30 * the whole document *;
 [A]JP2002361079  (MITSUBISHI CHEM CORP) [A] 1-22,29,30 * the whole document *
OppositionEP0359615
 EP0164743
 US4260443
 US4851069
 US5919178
 EP1621165
 US5061259
 US5977014
 EP1364985
 EP1142696
 US6187872
 WO03030955
 US2004214946
 US2005096623
 WO0134082
 EP0695541
 US5601542
 US5494622
 WO02053605
 US5451613
    - BUCHHOLZ, F. ET AL, Modern superabsorbent polymer technology, NEW YORK, WILEY-VCH, (1998), pages 19,69-74 - 95-103, 158-159
    - BUCHHOLZ, F. L. ET AL, Modern superabsorbent polymer technology, NEW YORK, WILEY-VCH, (1998), pages 12,51-60 - 252