Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2020767

EP2020767 - OPTICAL RELAY DEVICE AND OPTICAL RELAY TRANSMISSION SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  08.06.2018
Database last updated on 19.03.2019
FormerThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  30.06.2017
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  23.06.2017
FormerRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  09.06.2017
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  02.02.2017
FormerRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  16.01.2017
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  14.11.2016
Most recent event   Tooltip08.06.2018No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 11.07.2018  [2018/28]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Mitsubishi Electric Corporation
7-3, Marunouchi 2-chome
Chiyoda-ku
Tokyo 100-8310 / JP
[2017/31]
Former [2009/06]For all designated states
Mitsubishi Electric Corporation
7-3, Marunouchi 2-chome Chiyoda-ku
Tokyo 100-8310 / JP
Inventor(s)01 / TOKURA, Toshiyuki
Mitsubishi Electric Corporation
7-3, Marunouchi 2-chome
Chiyoda-ku
Tokyo 100-8310 / JP
02 / SHIMIZU, Katsuhiro
Mitsubishi Electric Corporation
7-3, Marunouchi 2-chome
Chiyoda-ku
Tokyo 100-8310 / JP
03 / ISHIDA, Kazuyuki
Mitsubishi Electric Corporation
7-3, Marunouchi 2-chome
Chiyoda-ku
Tokyo 100-8310 / JP
04 / MOTOSHIMA, Kuniaki
Mitsubishi Electric Corporation
7-3, Marunouchi 2-chome
Chiyoda-ku
Tokyo 100-8310 / JP
 [2017/31]
Former [2009/06]01 / TOKURA, Toshiyuki
Mitsubishi Electric Corporation 7-3, Marunouchi 2-chome Chiyoda-ku
Tokyo 100-8310 / JP
02 / SHIMIZU, Katsuhiro
Mitsubishi Electric Corporation 7-3, Marunouchi 2-chome Chiyoda-ku
Tokyo 100-8310 / JP
03 / ISHIDA, Kazuyuki
Mitsubishi Electric Corporation 7-3, Marunouchi 2-chome Chiyoda-ku
Tokyo 100-8310 / JP
04 / MOTOSHIMA, Kuniaki
Mitsubishi Electric Corporation 7-3, Marunouchi 2-chome Chiyoda-ku
Tokyo 100-8310 / JP
Representative(s)Zech, Stefan Markus
Meissner Bolte Patentanwälte
Rechtsanwälte Partnerschaft mbB
Postfach 86 06 24
81633 München / DE
[2017/31]
Former [2009/06]Zech, Stefan Markus
Meissner, Bolte & Partner GbR Postfach 86 06 24
81633 München / DE
Application number, filing date06746856.125.05.2006
[2009/06]
WO2006JP310477
Filing languageJA
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2007138649
Date:06.12.2007
Language:JA
[2007/49]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2020767
Date:04.02.2009
Language:EN
[2009/06]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2020767
Date:02.08.2017
Language:EN
[2017/31]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:JP06.12.2007
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP12.09.2012
ClassificationInternational:H04B10/29, H04B10/291, H04J14/02, H04B10/296
[2016/46]
Former International [2009/06]H04B10/16, H04B10/17
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB,   IT [2017/31]
Former [2009/29]DE,  FR,  GB,  IT 
Former [2009/06]AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  NL,  PL,  PT,  RO,  SE,  SI,  SK,  TR 
Extension statesALNot yet paid
BANot yet paid
HRNot yet paid
MKNot yet paid
YUNot yet paid
TitleGerman:OPTISCHE RELAISEINRICHTUNG UND OPTISCHES RELAISÜBERTRAGUNGSSYSTEM[2009/06]
English:OPTICAL RELAY DEVICE AND OPTICAL RELAY TRANSMISSION SYSTEM[2009/06]
French:DISPOSITIF DE RELAIS OPTIQUE ET SYSTEME DE TRANSMISSION À RELAIS OPTIQUE[2009/06]
Entry into regional phase21.11.2008Translation filed 
21.11.2008National basic fee paid 
21.11.2008Search fee paid 
21.11.2008Designation fee(s) paid 
21.11.2008Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure21.11.2008Examination requested  [2009/06]
29.12.2008Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s)
04.02.2009Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, GR, HU, IE, IS, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR
11.04.2013Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
15.11.2016Communication of intention to grant the patent
13.01.2017Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO
03.02.2017Communication of intention to grant the patent
01.06.2017Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO
01.06.2017Fee for grant paid
01.06.2017Fee for publishing/printing paid
23.06.2017Information about intention to grant a patent
23.06.2017Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  15.11.2016
Opposition(s)03.05.2018No opposition filed within time limit [2018/28]
Fees paidRenewal fee
21.11.2008Renewal fee patent year 03
21.11.2008Renewal fee patent year 04
28.05.2010Renewal fee patent year 05
30.05.2011Renewal fee patent year 06
31.05.2012Renewal fee patent year 07
29.05.2013Renewal fee patent year 08
28.03.2014Renewal fee patent year 09
12.05.2015Renewal fee patent year 10
10.05.2016Renewal fee patent year 11
10.05.2017Renewal fee patent year 12
Documents cited:Search[XAYI]JP2004147122  (NIPPON TELEGRAPH & TELEPHONE) [X] 1,2,6,7,13,14 * abstract * * paragraphs [0005] - [0013] - [0019] - [0036]; figures 1,2,7,8 * [A] 3-5,12,15,17 [Y] 10,11,16 [I] 8,9;
 [IAY]US2006087723  (TAKEYAMA TOMOAKI [JP], et al) [I] 1,2,6-9,13,14 * paragraphs [0049] - [0054]; figure 1 * [A] 3-5,12,15,17 [Y] 10,11,16;
 [IAY]JP2001197010  (NIPPON TELEGRAPH & TELEPHONE) [I] 1,2,6-9,13,14 * abstract * [A] 3-5,12,15,17 [Y] 10,11,16;
 [A]EP0944190  (FUJITSU LTD [JP]) [A] 3-5,15-17 * paragraph [0118]; figure 21 *;
 [A]US2002149840  (SO VINCENT [CA], et al) [A] 1-17 * paragraphs [0032] , [0047]; figure 1 *