Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1885947

EP1885947 - ARRANGEMENT FOR THE TREATMENT OF CELLULOSE PULP IN A WASHING APPARATUS ARRANGED WITH A REINFORCING FRAME [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  15.03.2013
Database last updated on 07.12.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip18.11.2019New entry: Decision (+date) in appeal procedure 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Valmet Technologies, Inc.
P.O. Box 11
02151 Espoo / FI
[2014/15]
Former [2008/07]For all designated states
Metso Paper, Inc.
P.O. Box 1220
00101 Helsingfors / FI
Inventor(s)01 / ANDERSSON, Rickard
Skedvik 123
864 92 Matfors / SE
02 / BYLANDER, Johan
Åkersviksgatan 9 B
S-852 37 Sundsvall / SE
03 / HENRIKSSON, Magnus
Norrlidsgatan 8, 7 Tr
S-856 41 Sundsvall / SE
04 / LUNDBERG, Jörgen, T.
Idrottsgatan 21
S-856 43 Sundsvall / SE
 [2008/07]
Representative(s)Maiwald Patent- und Rechtsanwaltsgesellschaft mbH
Elisenhof
Elisenstraße 3
80335 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2014/30]Maiwald Patentanwalts GmbH
Elisenhof
Elisenstrasse 3
80335 München / DE
Former [2013/16]Holmberg, Martin Tor
Bergenstråhle & Lindvall AB P.O. Box 17704
118 93 Stockholm / SE
Former [2008/07]Holmberg, Martin Tor
Bergenstrahle & Lindvall AB P.O. Box 17704
118 93 Stockholm / SE
Application number, filing date06747848.702.06.2006
[2008/07]
WO2006SE00654
Priority number, dateSE2005000127903.06.2005         Original published format: SE 0501279
[2008/07]
Filing languageSV
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2006130089
Date:07.12.2006
Language:SV
[2006/49]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1885947
Date:13.02.2008
Language:EN
[2008/07]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1885947
Date:17.04.2013
Language:EN
[2013/16]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:SE07.12.2006
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP25.10.2011
ClassificationInternational:D21C9/06
[2008/07]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   NL,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2008/07]
TitleGerman:ANORDNUNG ZUR BEHANDLUNG VON ZELLSTOFF IN EINER MIT EINEM STÜTZENDEN RAHMEN VERSEHENEN WASCHAPPARATUR[2008/07]
English:ARRANGEMENT FOR THE TREATMENT OF CELLULOSE PULP IN A WASHING APPARATUS ARRANGED WITH A REINFORCING FRAME[2008/07]
French:DISPOSITIF DE TRAITEMENT DE LA PATE A PAPIER DANS UN APPAREIL DE LAVAGE EQUIPE D'UNE CAGE D'ARMATURE[2008/07]
Entry into regional phase02.06.2006Translation filed 
04.12.2007National basic fee paid 
04.12.2007Search fee paid 
04.12.2007Designation fee(s) paid 
04.12.2007Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure04.12.2007Examination requested  [2008/07]
19.04.2012Observations by third parties
23.11.2012Communication of intention to grant the patent
07.03.2013Fee for grant paid
07.03.2013Fee for publishing/printing paid
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  23.11.2012
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  17.01.2014  28.01.2014  ADMISSIBLE
Andritz Oy
Tammasaarenkatu 1
00180 Helsinki / FI
Opponent's representative
AWA Sweden AB
P.O. Box 45086
104 30 Stockholm / SE
 [N/P]
Former [2016/11]
Opponent(s)01  17.01.2014  28.01.2014  ADMISSIBLE
Andritz Oy
Tammasaarenkatu 1
00180 Helsinki / FI
Opponent's representative
Awapatent AB
P.O. Box 45086
104 30 Stockholm / SE
Former [2016/02]
Opponent(s)01  17.01.2014  28.01.2014  ADMISSIBLE
Andritz Oy
Tammasaarenkatu 1
00180 Helsinki / FI
Opponent's representative
Awapatent AB
P.O. Box 5117
200 71 Malmö / SE
Former [2014/09]
Opponent(s)01  17.01.2014   
Andritz Oy
Tammasaarenkatu 1
00180 Helsinki / FI
Opponent's representative
Presland, Torbjörn
Awapatent AB Drottninggatan 89
104 30 Stockholm / SE
deletedDeletion: Legal effect of rejection of opposition [ N /P ]
21.02.2014Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
29.08.2014Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
02.02.2016Date of oral proceedings
18.03.2016Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
18.03.2016Date of despatch of rejection of opposition
Appeal following opposition16.05.2016Appeal received No.  T1181/16
07.07.2016Statement of grounds filed
11.11.2019Result of appeal procedure: appeal of the opponent was rejected
11.11.2019Date of oral proceedings
18.11.2019Minutes of the oral proceedings despatched
Fees paidRenewal fee
24.06.2008Renewal fee patent year 03
24.06.2009Renewal fee patent year 04
21.06.2010Renewal fee patent year 05
21.06.2011Renewal fee patent year 06
31.03.2012Renewal fee patent year 07
Lapses during opposition  TooltipHU02.06.2006
BE17.04.2013
CY17.04.2013
CZ17.04.2013
DK17.04.2013
EE17.04.2013
IT17.04.2013
LT17.04.2013
LV17.04.2013
MC17.04.2013
NL17.04.2013
PL17.04.2013
RO17.04.2013
SE17.04.2013
SI17.04.2013
SK17.04.2013
TR17.04.2013
IE02.06.2013
LU02.06.2013
CH30.06.2013
LI30.06.2013
FR01.07.2013
BG17.07.2013
GB17.07.2013
GR18.07.2013
ES28.07.2013
IS17.08.2013
PT19.08.2013
DE01.01.2014
[2015/34]
Former [2015/32]BE17.04.2013
CY17.04.2013
CZ17.04.2013
DK17.04.2013
EE17.04.2013
IT17.04.2013
LT17.04.2013
LV17.04.2013
MC17.04.2013
NL17.04.2013
PL17.04.2013
RO17.04.2013
SE17.04.2013
SI17.04.2013
SK17.04.2013
TR17.04.2013
IE02.06.2013
CH30.06.2013
LI30.06.2013
FR01.07.2013
BG17.07.2013
GB17.07.2013
GR18.07.2013
ES28.07.2013
IS17.08.2013
PT19.08.2013
DE01.01.2014
Former [2014/24]BE17.04.2013
CY17.04.2013
CZ17.04.2013
DK17.04.2013
EE17.04.2013
IT17.04.2013
LT17.04.2013
LV17.04.2013
MC17.04.2013
NL17.04.2013
PL17.04.2013
RO17.04.2013
SE17.04.2013
SI17.04.2013
SK17.04.2013
IE02.06.2013
CH30.06.2013
LI30.06.2013
FR01.07.2013
BG17.07.2013
GB17.07.2013
GR18.07.2013
ES28.07.2013
IS17.08.2013
PT19.08.2013
DE01.01.2014
Former [2014/22]BE17.04.2013
CY17.04.2013
CZ17.04.2013
DK17.04.2013
EE17.04.2013
IT17.04.2013
LT17.04.2013
LV17.04.2013
MC17.04.2013
NL17.04.2013
PL17.04.2013
RO17.04.2013
SE17.04.2013
SI17.04.2013
SK17.04.2013
IE02.06.2013
CH30.06.2013
LI30.06.2013
BG17.07.2013
GB17.07.2013
GR18.07.2013
ES28.07.2013
IS17.08.2013
PT19.08.2013
DE01.01.2014
Former [2014/21]BE17.04.2013
CY17.04.2013
CZ17.04.2013
DK17.04.2013
EE17.04.2013
IT17.04.2013
LT17.04.2013
LV17.04.2013
MC17.04.2013
NL17.04.2013
PL17.04.2013
RO17.04.2013
SE17.04.2013
SI17.04.2013
SK17.04.2013
IE02.06.2013
CH30.06.2013
LI30.06.2013
BG17.07.2013
GB17.07.2013
GR18.07.2013
ES28.07.2013
IS17.08.2013
PT19.08.2013
Former [2014/20]BE17.04.2013
CY17.04.2013
CZ17.04.2013
DK17.04.2013
EE17.04.2013
IT17.04.2013
LT17.04.2013
LV17.04.2013
MC17.04.2013
NL17.04.2013
PL17.04.2013
RO17.04.2013
SE17.04.2013
SI17.04.2013
SK17.04.2013
IE02.06.2013
CH30.06.2013
LI30.06.2013
BG17.07.2013
GR18.07.2013
ES28.07.2013
IS17.08.2013
PT19.08.2013
Former [2014/14]BE17.04.2013
CY17.04.2013
CZ17.04.2013
DK17.04.2013
EE17.04.2013
IT17.04.2013
LT17.04.2013
LV17.04.2013
MC17.04.2013
NL17.04.2013
PL17.04.2013
RO17.04.2013
SE17.04.2013
SI17.04.2013
SK17.04.2013
BG17.07.2013
GR18.07.2013
ES28.07.2013
IS17.08.2013
PT19.08.2013
Former [2014/11]BE17.04.2013
CY17.04.2013
CZ17.04.2013
DK17.04.2013
EE17.04.2013
IT17.04.2013
LT17.04.2013
LV17.04.2013
MC17.04.2013
PL17.04.2013
RO17.04.2013
SE17.04.2013
SI17.04.2013
SK17.04.2013
BG17.07.2013
GR18.07.2013
ES28.07.2013
IS17.08.2013
PT19.08.2013
Former [2014/10]BE17.04.2013
CY17.04.2013
CZ17.04.2013
DK17.04.2013
EE17.04.2013
LT17.04.2013
LV17.04.2013
MC17.04.2013
PL17.04.2013
SE17.04.2013
SI17.04.2013
SK17.04.2013
BG17.07.2013
GR18.07.2013
ES28.07.2013
IS17.08.2013
PT19.08.2013
Former [2014/09]BE17.04.2013
CY17.04.2013
DK17.04.2013
EE17.04.2013
LT17.04.2013
LV17.04.2013
MC17.04.2013
PL17.04.2013
SE17.04.2013
SI17.04.2013
BG17.07.2013
GR18.07.2013
ES28.07.2013
IS17.08.2013
PT19.08.2013
Former [2014/08]BE17.04.2013
CY17.04.2013
LT17.04.2013
LV17.04.2013
MC17.04.2013
PL17.04.2013
SE17.04.2013
SI17.04.2013
BG17.07.2013
GR18.07.2013
ES28.07.2013
IS17.08.2013
PT19.08.2013
Former [2013/52]BE17.04.2013
CY17.04.2013
LT17.04.2013
LV17.04.2013
PL17.04.2013
SE17.04.2013
SI17.04.2013
BG17.07.2013
GR18.07.2013
ES28.07.2013
IS17.08.2013
PT19.08.2013
Former [2013/50]BE17.04.2013
LT17.04.2013
LV17.04.2013
PL17.04.2013
SE17.04.2013
SI17.04.2013
BG17.07.2013
GR18.07.2013
ES28.07.2013
IS17.08.2013
PT19.08.2013
Former [2013/49]BE17.04.2013
LT17.04.2013
SE17.04.2013
SI17.04.2013
GR18.07.2013
ES28.07.2013
IS17.08.2013
PT19.08.2013
Former [2013/48]LT17.04.2013
ES28.07.2013
IS17.08.2013
PT19.08.2013
Former [2013/47]LT17.04.2013
PT19.08.2013
Documents cited:Search[A]US3772144  (LUTHI O ET AL) [A] 1-9 * column 6, line 9 - line 14; figures 2,3; claims 1-12 *;
 [A]US5046338  (LUTHI OSCAR [US]) [A] 1-9 * figure 1 *
International search[A]WO9710380  ;
 [A]GB476713  ;
 [A]US4430557  ;
 [A]WO0073579
otherWO9710380
 GB476713
 US2005051473
 DE2645704
 US4919158
 US5116423
 US2280501
    - DD Washers in Chemical Pulping, Ahlstrom Machinery, 1990, XP003030483
    - RAUMA-PEROLA VACUUM WASHER, Rauma-Repola OY, 1978, XP003030484
    - Papermaking Science and Technology, Book 6a, Chemical Pulping, 1999, XP003030485
    - FiberSpectrum, Issue 14 - No.2/2006, Andritz AG, XP003030486