Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1885950

EP1885950 - ARRANGEMENT FOR TREATMENT OF CELLULOSE PULP [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusOpposition rejected
Status updated on  02.12.2016
Database last updated on 22.05.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip02.12.2016Opposition rejectedpublished on 04.01.2017  [2017/01]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Valmet Technologies, Inc.
Keilasatama 5
02150 Espoo / FI
[2014/19]
Former [2008/07]For all designated states
Metso Paper, Inc.
P O Box 1220
00101 Helsinki / FI
Inventor(s)01 / LUNDBERG, Jörgen
Idrottsgatan 21
856 43 Sundsvall / SE
02 / ANDERSSON, Rickard
Skedvik 123
864 92 Matfors / SE
03 / BYLANDER, Johan
Åkersviksgatan 9 B
852 37 Sundsvall / SE
04 / HENRIKSSON, Magnus
Norrlidsgatan 8, 7 Tr
856 41 Sundsvall / SE
 [2008/07]
Representative(s)Zumstein, Angela
Maiwald Patentanwalts- und
Rechtsanwaltsgesellschaft mbH
Elisenhof
Elisenstraße 3
80335 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2012/40]Jansson, Margareta Karin , et al
Metso Paper Sweden AB
Patent Department
851 94 Sundsvall / SE
Former [2008/07]Sundqvist, Hans
Metso Paper Sundsvall AB
851 94 Sundsvall / SE
Application number, filing date06748016.031.05.2006
[2008/07]
WO2006SE50176
Priority number, dateSE2005000129103.06.2005         Original published format: SE 0501291
SE2005000278215.12.2005         Original published format: SE 0502782
[2008/07]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2006130110
Date:07.12.2006
Language:EN
[2006/49]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1885950
Date:13.02.2008
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 07.12.2006
[2008/07]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1885950
Date:07.08.2013
Language:EN
[2013/32]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:SE07.12.2006
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP30.01.2012
ClassificationInternational:D21C9/06
[2008/07]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   NL,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2008/07]
TitleGerman:ANORDNUNG ZUR BEHANDLUNG VON ZELLSTOFF[2008/07]
English:ARRANGEMENT FOR TREATMENT OF CELLULOSE PULP[2008/07]
French:AGENCEMENT POUR LE TRAITEMENT DE LA PATE A PAPIER[2008/07]
Entry into regional phase14.11.2007National basic fee paid 
14.11.2007Search fee paid 
14.11.2007Designation fee(s) paid 
14.11.2007Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure19.12.2006Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: SE
12.11.2007Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
14.11.2007Examination requested  [2008/07]
18.04.2013Communication of intention to grant the patent
27.06.2013Fee for grant paid
27.06.2013Fee for publishing/printing paid
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  18.04.2013
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  06.05.2014  12.05.2014  ADMISSIBLE
Andritz Oy
Tammasaarenkatu 1
00180 Helsinki / FI
Opponent's representative
AWA Sweden AB
P.O. Box 45086
104 30 Stockholm / SE
 [N/P]
Former [2016/11]
Opponent(s)01  06.05.2014  12.05.2014  ADMISSIBLE
Andritz Oy
Tammasaarenkatu 1
00180 Helsinki / FI
Opponent's representative
Awapatent AB
P.O. Box 45086
104 30 Stockholm / SE
Former [2016/01]
Opponent(s)01  06.05.2014  12.05.2014  ADMISSIBLE
Andritz Oy
Tammasaarenkatu 1
00180 Helsinki / FI
Opponent's representative
Awapatent AB
P.O. Box 5117
200 71 Malmö / SE
Former [2014/24]
Opponent(s)01  06.05.2014   
Andritz Oy
Tammasaarenkatu 1
00180 Helsinki / FI
Opponent's representative
Presland, Torbjörn
Awapatent AB Drottninggatan 89
104 30 Stockholm / SE
12.06.2014Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
22.12.2014Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
06.07.2016Date of oral proceedings
27.07.2016Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
27.07.2016Date of despatch of rejection of opposition
21.11.2016Legal effect of rejection of opposition [2017/01]
Appeal following opposition06.10.2016Appeal received No.  T2266/16
25.11.2016Result of appeal procedure: appeal of the opponent withdrawn
Fees paidRenewal fee
18.07.2008Renewal fee patent year 03
26.05.2009Renewal fee patent year 04
24.05.2010Renewal fee patent year 05
20.05.2011Renewal fee patent year 06
29.02.2012Renewal fee patent year 07
15.05.2013Renewal fee patent year 08
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.05.200803   M06   Fee paid on   18.07.2008
Lapses during opposition  TooltipHU31.05.2006
BE07.08.2013
BG07.08.2013
CY07.08.2013
CZ07.08.2013
DK07.08.2013
EE07.08.2013
ES07.08.2013
IT07.08.2013
LT07.08.2013
LV07.08.2013
MC07.08.2013
NL07.08.2013
PL07.08.2013
RO07.08.2013
SE07.08.2013
SI07.08.2013
SK07.08.2013
TR07.08.2013
GR08.11.2013
IS07.12.2013
PT09.12.2013
CH31.05.2014
GB31.05.2014
IE31.05.2014
LI31.05.2014
LU31.05.2014
FR02.06.2014
DE02.12.2014
[2016/33]
Former [2016/32]HU31.05.2006
BE07.08.2013
BG07.08.2013
CY07.08.2013
CZ07.08.2013
DK07.08.2013
EE07.08.2013
ES07.08.2013
IT07.08.2013
LT07.08.2013
LV07.08.2013
MC07.08.2013
NL07.08.2013
PL07.08.2013
RO07.08.2013
SE07.08.2013
SI07.08.2013
SK07.08.2013
GR08.11.2013
IS07.12.2013
PT09.12.2013
CH31.05.2014
GB31.05.2014
IE31.05.2014
LI31.05.2014
LU31.05.2014
FR02.06.2014
DE02.12.2014
Former [2016/25]BE07.08.2013
BG07.08.2013
CY07.08.2013
CZ07.08.2013
DK07.08.2013
EE07.08.2013
ES07.08.2013
IT07.08.2013
LT07.08.2013
LV07.08.2013
MC07.08.2013
NL07.08.2013
PL07.08.2013
RO07.08.2013
SE07.08.2013
SI07.08.2013
SK07.08.2013
GR08.11.2013
IS07.12.2013
PT09.12.2013
CH31.05.2014
GB31.05.2014
IE31.05.2014
LI31.05.2014
LU31.05.2014
FR02.06.2014
DE02.12.2014
Former [2015/24]BE07.08.2013
CY07.08.2013
CZ07.08.2013
DK07.08.2013
EE07.08.2013
ES07.08.2013
IT07.08.2013
LT07.08.2013
LV07.08.2013
MC07.08.2013
NL07.08.2013
PL07.08.2013
RO07.08.2013
SE07.08.2013
SI07.08.2013
SK07.08.2013
GR08.11.2013
IS07.12.2013
PT09.12.2013
CH31.05.2014
GB31.05.2014
IE31.05.2014
LI31.05.2014
LU31.05.2014
FR02.06.2014
DE02.12.2014
Former [2015/22]BE07.08.2013
CY07.08.2013
CZ07.08.2013
DK07.08.2013
EE07.08.2013
ES07.08.2013
IT07.08.2013
LT07.08.2013
LV07.08.2013
MC07.08.2013
NL07.08.2013
PL07.08.2013
RO07.08.2013
SE07.08.2013
SI07.08.2013
SK07.08.2013
GR08.11.2013
IS07.12.2013
PT09.12.2013
CH31.05.2014
IE31.05.2014
LI31.05.2014
LU31.05.2014
DE02.12.2014
Former [2015/21]BE07.08.2013
CY07.08.2013
CZ07.08.2013
DK07.08.2013
EE07.08.2013
ES07.08.2013
IT07.08.2013
LT07.08.2013
LV07.08.2013
MC07.08.2013
NL07.08.2013
PL07.08.2013
RO07.08.2013
SE07.08.2013
SI07.08.2013
SK07.08.2013
GR08.11.2013
IS07.12.2013
PT09.12.2013
CH31.05.2014
IE31.05.2014
LI31.05.2014
LU31.05.2014
Former [2015/09]BE07.08.2013
CY07.08.2013
CZ07.08.2013
DK07.08.2013
EE07.08.2013
ES07.08.2013
IT07.08.2013
LT07.08.2013
LV07.08.2013
MC07.08.2013
NL07.08.2013
PL07.08.2013
RO07.08.2013
SE07.08.2013
SI07.08.2013
SK07.08.2013
GR08.11.2013
IS07.12.2013
PT09.12.2013
CH31.05.2014
LI31.05.2014
LU31.05.2014
Former [2015/08]BE07.08.2013
CY07.08.2013
CZ07.08.2013
DK07.08.2013
EE07.08.2013
ES07.08.2013
IT07.08.2013
LT07.08.2013
LV07.08.2013
NL07.08.2013
PL07.08.2013
RO07.08.2013
SE07.08.2013
SI07.08.2013
SK07.08.2013
GR08.11.2013
IS07.12.2013
PT09.12.2013
CH31.05.2014
LI31.05.2014
LU31.05.2014
Former [2015/04]BE07.08.2013
CY07.08.2013
CZ07.08.2013
DK07.08.2013
EE07.08.2013
ES07.08.2013
IT07.08.2013
LT07.08.2013
LV07.08.2013
NL07.08.2013
PL07.08.2013
RO07.08.2013
SE07.08.2013
SI07.08.2013
SK07.08.2013
GR08.11.2013
IS07.12.2013
PT09.12.2013
LU31.05.2014
Former [2014/24]BE07.08.2013
CY07.08.2013
CZ07.08.2013
DK07.08.2013
EE07.08.2013
ES07.08.2013
IT07.08.2013
LT07.08.2013
LV07.08.2013
NL07.08.2013
PL07.08.2013
RO07.08.2013
SE07.08.2013
SI07.08.2013
SK07.08.2013
GR08.11.2013
IS07.12.2013
PT09.12.2013
Former [2014/23]BE07.08.2013
CY07.08.2013
CZ07.08.2013
DK07.08.2013
EE07.08.2013
LT07.08.2013
LV07.08.2013
NL07.08.2013
PL07.08.2013
RO07.08.2013
SE07.08.2013
SI07.08.2013
SK07.08.2013
GR08.11.2013
IS07.12.2013
PT09.12.2013
Former [2014/22]BE07.08.2013
CY07.08.2013
DK07.08.2013
LT07.08.2013
LV07.08.2013
NL07.08.2013
PL07.08.2013
RO07.08.2013
SE07.08.2013
SI07.08.2013
GR08.11.2013
IS07.12.2013
PT09.12.2013
Former [2014/21]BE07.08.2013
CY07.08.2013
DK07.08.2013
LT07.08.2013
LV07.08.2013
NL07.08.2013
PL07.08.2013
SE07.08.2013
SI07.08.2013
GR08.11.2013
IS07.12.2013
PT09.12.2013
Former [2014/18]BE07.08.2013
CY07.08.2013
LT07.08.2013
LV07.08.2013
NL07.08.2013
PL07.08.2013
SE07.08.2013
SI07.08.2013
GR08.11.2013
IS07.12.2013
PT09.12.2013
Former [2014/14]CY03.07.2013
BE07.08.2013
LT07.08.2013
LV07.08.2013
NL07.08.2013
PL07.08.2013
SE07.08.2013
SI07.08.2013
GR08.11.2013
IS07.12.2013
PT09.12.2013
Former [2014/12]CY03.07.2013
LT07.08.2013
LV07.08.2013
PL07.08.2013
SE07.08.2013
SI07.08.2013
GR08.11.2013
IS07.12.2013
PT09.12.2013
Former [2014/11]CY03.07.2013
LT07.08.2013
PL07.08.2013
SE07.08.2013
IS07.12.2013
PT09.12.2013
Former [2014/10]CY03.07.2013
LT07.08.2013
SE07.08.2013
IS07.12.2013
PT09.12.2013
Former [2014/09]LT07.08.2013
SE07.08.2013
PT09.12.2013
Former [2014/08]LT07.08.2013
PT09.12.2013
Documents cited:Search[A]US4292123  (LINTUNEN TUOMO, et al) [A] 1-6 * column 3, line 26 - line 32; figure 1 *
International search[X]US4769986
 [X]EP0315737
 [X]EP0239312
 [A]WO9710380