Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2024046

EP2024046 - AN AMUSEMENT RIDE [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  24.10.2014
Database last updated on 20.02.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip15.07.2016Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): TR
published on 17.08.2016  [2016/33]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
MacMahon, Patrick Charles David
33E Chancery Lane, No. 01-30 The Chancery Residence
Singapore 309555 / SG
[2011/04]
Former [2009/08]For all designated states
MELCHERS PROJECT MANAGEMENT PTE LTD
101 Thompson Road No 24-01/05 United Square
Singapore 307591 / SG
Inventor(s)01 / MACMAHON, Patrick
36 Jervois Road, Jervois Lodge, 01-05
Singapore 249018 / SG
02 / MADDOX, Philip
36 Jervois Road, Jervois Lodge, 01-05
Singapore 249018 / SG
 [2009/08]
Representative(s)Talbot-Ponsonby, Daniel Frederick
Marks & Clerk LLP
Fletcher House
Heatley Road The Oxford Science Park
Oxford OX4 4GE / GB
[2013/51]
Former [2009/08]Talbot-Ponsonby, Daniel Frederick
Marks & Clerk 4220 Nash Court Oxford Business Park South Oxford
Oxfordshire OX4 2RU / GB
Application number, filing date06748085.526.05.2006
[2009/08]
WO2006SG00132
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2007139508
Date:06.12.2007
Language:EN
[2007/49]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2024046
Date:18.02.2009
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 06.12.2007
[2009/08]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2024046
Date:18.12.2013
Language:EN
[2013/51]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:AU06.12.2007
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP18.11.2010
ClassificationInternational:A63G27/02, A63G31/02
[2009/08]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   NL,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2009/08]
Extension statesALNot yet paid
BANot yet paid
HRNot yet paid
MKNot yet paid
YUNot yet paid
TitleGerman:FAHRGESCHÄFT[2009/08]
English:AN AMUSEMENT RIDE[2009/08]
French:ATTRACTION[2009/08]
Entry into regional phase11.12.2008National basic fee paid 
11.12.2008Search fee paid 
11.12.2008Designation fee(s) paid 
11.12.2008Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure25.03.2008Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: AU
11.12.2008Examination requested  [2009/08]
29.07.2011Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time
26.09.2011Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
03.04.2012Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
12.10.2012Reply to a communication from the examining division
22.02.2013Communication of intention to grant the patent
27.06.2013Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO
16.09.2013Communication of intention to grant the patent
04.11.2013Fee for grant paid
04.11.2013Fee for publishing/printing paid
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  03.04.2012
Opposition(s)19.09.2014No opposition filed within time limit [2014/48]
Request for further processing for:The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to indicate the wish to proceed further with the application
23.09.2011Request for further processing filed
23.09.2011Full payment received (date of receipt of payment)
Request granted
12.10.2011Decision despatched
The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the Extended European Search Report/Written Opinion of the International Searching Authority/International Preliminary Examination Report/Supplementary international search report/Supplementary European search report
23.09.2011Request for further processing filed
23.09.2011Full payment received (date of receipt of payment)
Request granted
12.10.2011Decision despatched
Fees paidRenewal fee
11.12.2008Renewal fee patent year 03
12.05.2009Renewal fee patent year 04
02.06.2010Renewal fee patent year 05
29.09.2011Renewal fee patent year 06
30.05.2012Renewal fee patent year 07
31.05.2013Renewal fee patent year 08
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.05.201005   M06   Fee paid on   02.06.2010
31.05.201106   M06   Fee paid on   29.09.2011
Lapses during opposition  TooltipHU26.05.2006
AT18.12.2013
BE18.12.2013
BG18.12.2013
CY18.12.2013
CZ18.12.2013
DK18.12.2013
EE18.12.2013
ES18.12.2013
FI18.12.2013
LT18.12.2013
LV18.12.2013
MC18.12.2013
PL18.12.2013
RO18.12.2013
SE18.12.2013
SI18.12.2013
SK18.12.2013
TR18.12.2013
GR19.03.2014
IS18.04.2014
PT18.04.2014
IE26.05.2014
IT26.05.2014
LU26.05.2014
FR02.06.2014
[2016/33]
Former [2016/32]HU26.05.2006
AT18.12.2013
BE18.12.2013
BG18.12.2013
CY18.12.2013
CZ18.12.2013
DK18.12.2013
EE18.12.2013
ES18.12.2013
FI18.12.2013
LT18.12.2013
LV18.12.2013
MC18.12.2013
PL18.12.2013
RO18.12.2013
SE18.12.2013
SI18.12.2013
SK18.12.2013
GR19.03.2014
IS18.04.2014
PT18.04.2014
IE26.05.2014
IT26.05.2014
LU26.05.2014
FR02.06.2014
Former [2016/28]AT18.12.2013
BE18.12.2013
BG18.12.2013
CY18.12.2013
CZ18.12.2013
DK18.12.2013
EE18.12.2013
ES18.12.2013
FI18.12.2013
LT18.12.2013
LV18.12.2013
MC18.12.2013
PL18.12.2013
RO18.12.2013
SE18.12.2013
SI18.12.2013
SK18.12.2013
GR19.03.2014
IS18.04.2014
PT18.04.2014
IE26.05.2014
IT26.05.2014
LU26.05.2014
FR02.06.2014
Former [2016/25]AT18.12.2013
BE18.12.2013
BG18.12.2013
CY18.12.2013
CZ18.12.2013
DK18.12.2013
EE18.12.2013
ES18.12.2013
FI18.12.2013
LT18.12.2013
LV18.12.2013
MC18.12.2013
PL18.12.2013
RO18.12.2013
SE18.12.2013
SI18.12.2013
SK18.12.2013
IS18.04.2014
PT18.04.2014
IE26.05.2014
IT26.05.2014
LU26.05.2014
FR02.06.2014
Former [2015/24]AT18.12.2013
BE18.12.2013
CY18.12.2013
CZ18.12.2013
DK18.12.2013
EE18.12.2013
ES18.12.2013
FI18.12.2013
LT18.12.2013
LV18.12.2013
MC18.12.2013
PL18.12.2013
RO18.12.2013
SE18.12.2013
SI18.12.2013
SK18.12.2013
IS18.04.2014
PT18.04.2014
IE26.05.2014
IT26.05.2014
LU26.05.2014
FR02.06.2014
Former [2015/23]AT18.12.2013
BE18.12.2013
CY18.12.2013
CZ18.12.2013
DK18.12.2013
EE18.12.2013
ES18.12.2013
FI18.12.2013
LT18.12.2013
LV18.12.2013
MC18.12.2013
PL18.12.2013
RO18.12.2013
SE18.12.2013
SK18.12.2013
IS18.04.2014
PT18.04.2014
IE26.05.2014
IT26.05.2014
LU26.05.2014
Former [2015/21]AT18.12.2013
BE18.12.2013
CY18.12.2013
CZ18.12.2013
DK18.12.2013
EE18.12.2013
ES18.12.2013
FI18.12.2013
LT18.12.2013
LV18.12.2013
MC18.12.2013
PL18.12.2013
RO18.12.2013
SE18.12.2013
SK18.12.2013
IS18.04.2014
PT18.04.2014
IE26.05.2014
LU26.05.2014
Former [2015/09]AT18.12.2013
BE18.12.2013
CY18.12.2013
CZ18.12.2013
DK18.12.2013
EE18.12.2013
ES18.12.2013
FI18.12.2013
LT18.12.2013
LV18.12.2013
MC18.12.2013
PL18.12.2013
RO18.12.2013
SE18.12.2013
SK18.12.2013
IS18.04.2014
PT18.04.2014
LU26.05.2014
Former [2015/04]AT18.12.2013
BE18.12.2013
CY18.12.2013
CZ18.12.2013
DK18.12.2013
EE18.12.2013
ES18.12.2013
FI18.12.2013
LT18.12.2013
LV18.12.2013
PL18.12.2013
RO18.12.2013
SE18.12.2013
SK18.12.2013
IS18.04.2014
PT18.04.2014
LU26.05.2014
Former [2014/48]AT18.12.2013
BE18.12.2013
CY18.12.2013
CZ18.12.2013
DK18.12.2013
EE18.12.2013
ES18.12.2013
FI18.12.2013
LT18.12.2013
LV18.12.2013
PL18.12.2013
RO18.12.2013
SE18.12.2013
SK18.12.2013
IS18.04.2014
PT18.04.2014
Former [2014/37]AT18.12.2013
BE18.12.2013
CY18.12.2013
CZ18.12.2013
EE18.12.2013
ES18.12.2013
FI18.12.2013
LT18.12.2013
LV18.12.2013
PL18.12.2013
RO18.12.2013
SE18.12.2013
SK18.12.2013
IS18.04.2014
PT18.04.2014
Former [2014/36]BE18.12.2013
EE18.12.2013
FI18.12.2013
LT18.12.2013
LV18.12.2013
SE18.12.2013
IS18.04.2014
Former [2014/34]BE18.12.2013
FI18.12.2013
LT18.12.2013
LV18.12.2013
SE18.12.2013
Former [2014/25]FI18.12.2013
LT18.12.2013
LV18.12.2013
SE18.12.2013
Former [2014/22]FI18.12.2013
LT18.12.2013
SE18.12.2013
Former [2014/20]LT18.12.2013
Documents cited:Search[X]US4491073  (DOZER CHARLES S [US]) [X] 1-17,19,20 * column 2, line 19 - column 3, line 56; figures 1-8 *;
 [X]US5527221  (BROWN RONALD L [US], et al) [X] 1-6,13-20 * column 2, line 29 - column 4, line 59; figures 1-6c *;
 [X]US2003172834  (DE-GOL GINO [GB]) [X] 1-5,13-20 * paragraph [0010] - paragraph [0020]; figures 1-4 *;
 [I]WO03082421  (THRELKEL DAVID V [US]) [I] 1-20 * figures 1-19; claims 1-20 *
International search[X]US6098549
 [X]RU2214851
 [X]RU2142841
by applicant US4170943