Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1854014

EP1854014 - SYSTEMS AND METHODS FOR AN AUGMENTED INTERRUPT CONTROLLER AND SYNTHETIC INTERRUPT SOURCES [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusExamination is in progress
Status updated on  08.04.2015
Database last updated on 07.12.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip15.03.2019New entry: Renewal fee paid 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Microsoft Technology Licensing, LLC
One Microsoft Way
Redmond, WA 98052 / US
[2015/12]
Former [2007/46]For all designated states
MICROSOFT CORPORATION
One Microsoft Way
Redmond, Washington 98052-6399 / US
Inventor(s)01 / VEGA, Rene Antonio
One Microsoft Way
Redmond, Washington 98052-6399 / US
02 / LEWIS, Nathan T.
One Microsoft Way
Redmond, Washington 98052-6399 / US
 [2007/46]
Representative(s)Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB
Leopoldstraße 4
80802 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2007/46]Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät
Maximilianstrasse 58
80538 München / DE
Application number, filing date06748881.728.03.2006
[2007/46]
WO2006US11487
Priority number, dateUS2005009201228.03.2005         Original published format: US 92012
[2007/46]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2  Application without search report
No.:WO2006105208
Date:05.10.2006
Language:EN
[2006/40]
Type: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1854014
Date:14.11.2007
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 05.10.2006
[2007/46]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:US07.06.2007
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP01.03.2010
ClassificationInternational:G06F13/24, // G06F13/00
[2010/13]
Former International [2007/46]G06F13/24
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   NL,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2007/46]
Extension statesALNot yet paid
BANot yet paid
HRNot yet paid
MKNot yet paid
YUNot yet paid
TitleGerman:SYSTEME UND VERFAHREN FÜR EINE ERWEITERTE UNTERBRECHUNGSSTEUERUNG UND SYNTHETISCHE UNTERBRECHUNGSQUELLEN[2007/46]
English:SYSTEMS AND METHODS FOR AN AUGMENTED INTERRUPT CONTROLLER AND SYNTHETIC INTERRUPT SOURCES[2007/46]
French:SYSTEMES ET PROCEDES PERMETTANT D'OBTENIR UN CONTROLEUR D'INTERRUPTIONS AVANCE ET DES SOURCES D'INTERRUPTIONS SYNTHETIQUES[2007/46]
Entry into regional phase01.08.2007National basic fee paid 
01.08.2007Search fee paid 
01.08.2007Designation fee(s) paid 
01.08.2007Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure01.08.2007Examination requested  [2007/46]
12.05.2010Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
22.09.2010Reply to a communication from the examining division
10.02.2015Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
01.04.2015Reply to a communication from the examining division
27.10.2015Date of oral proceedings
20.11.2015Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination {1}
20.11.2015Minutes of oral proceedings despatched
Appeal following examination28.01.2016Appeal received No.  T0940/16
24.03.2016Statement of grounds filed
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  12.05.2010
Fees paidRenewal fee
31.03.2008Renewal fee patent year 03
13.03.2009Renewal fee patent year 04
15.03.2010Renewal fee patent year 05
15.03.2011Renewal fee patent year 06
14.03.2012Renewal fee patent year 07
08.03.2013Renewal fee patent year 08
10.03.2014Renewal fee patent year 09
06.03.2015Renewal fee patent year 10
10.03.2016Renewal fee patent year 11
10.03.2017Renewal fee patent year 12
13.03.2018Renewal fee patent year 13
13.03.2019Renewal fee patent year 14
Documents cited:Search[A]FR2672708  (NIPPON ELECTRIC CO [JP]) [A] 1-20 * page 4, line 10 - line 18 *;
 [A]DE3607889  (HITACHI LTD [JP]) [A] 1-20 * page 11, line 2 - line 18 *
International search[XP]US2006020731  (SASAGE KOUTAROU [JP]);
 [YP]US2006036791  (JEYASINGH STALINSELVARAJ [US], et al);
 [A]US5418968  (GOBELI GREGG P [US]);
 [A]US6240483  (GUTTA SRINIVASA [US], et al);
 [AE]US7139857  (WAHLER RICHARD E [US])
by applicantUS6240483