Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2019581

EP2019581 - APPARATUS AND METHOD FOR THE INJECTION OF VISCOUS FERTILIZER BELOW THE SURFACE OF THE SOIL [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  14.03.2014
Database last updated on 20.10.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip14.03.2014Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 16.04.2014  [2014/16]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
American Water Works Company, Inc.
1025 Laurel Oak Road
Voorhees, NJ 08043 / US
[2009/06]
Inventor(s)01 / SIDHWA, Phil
1191 Linbrook Road
Oakville, Ontario L6J 2L5 / CA
02 / GOLDHAWK, Dan
14 Candlewood Drive
Bratford, Ontario N3R 2L5 / CA
03 / GROSE, Walter, Stewart
7432 Wellington Road 17, R.R. 2
Alma, Ontario N0B 1A0 / CA
04 / GROSE, Gordon, Raymond
7432 Wellington Road 17, R.R. 2
Alma, Ontario N0B 1A0 / CA
 [2009/06]
Representative(s)Price, Nigel John King
J A Kemp
14 South Square
Gray's Inn
London WC1R 5JJ / GB
[N/P]
Former [2009/50]Price, Nigel John King
J.A. Kemp & Co. 14 South Square Gray's Inn
London WC1R 5JJ / GB
Former [2009/06]Price, Nigel John King
J.A. Kemp & Co. 14 South Square Gray's Inn
GB-London WC1R 5JJ / GB
Application number, filing date06751366.324.04.2006
[2009/06]
WO2006US15633
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2  Application without search report
No.:WO2007133181
Date:22.11.2007
Language:EN
[2007/47]
Type: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP2019581
Date:04.02.2009
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 22.11.2007
[2009/06]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:US30.04.2009
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP11.09.2012
ClassificationInternational:A01C23/02, A01C23/00, B60P1/00
[2012/41]
Former International [2009/25]A01C23/00
Former International [2009/06]A01C21/00
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   NL,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2009/06]
TitleGerman:VORRICHTUNG UND VERFAHREN ZUM EINSPRITZEN EINES VISKOSEN DÜNGEMITTELS UNTER DIE ERDOBERFLÄCHE[2009/06]
English:APPARATUS AND METHOD FOR THE INJECTION OF VISCOUS FERTILIZER BELOW THE SURFACE OF THE SOIL[2009/06]
French:APPAREIL ET PROCÉDÉ POUR L'INJECTION D'UN FERTILISANT VISQUEUX SOUS LA SURFACE DU SOL[2009/06]
Entry into regional phase24.11.2008National basic fee paid 
24.11.2008Search fee paid 
24.11.2008Designation fee(s) paid 
24.11.2008Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure24.11.2008Examination requested  [2009/06]
26.03.2013Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
27.05.2013Communication of intention to grant the patent
08.10.2013Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2014/16]
20.11.2013Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time  [2014/16]
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  27.05.2013
Fees paidRenewal fee
24.11.2008Renewal fee patent year 03
29.04.2009Renewal fee patent year 04
26.04.2010Renewal fee patent year 05
25.04.2011Renewal fee patent year 06
25.04.2012Renewal fee patent year 07
29.04.2013Renewal fee patent year 08
Documents cited:Search[XY]DE8707467U  (LACKMANN JOHANNES [DE]) [X] 10,15 * figures 2-7; claims 1-2 * * pages 3-6 * [Y] 1,2,4-6,11,12;
 [Y]FR2703208  (DAVIET CLAUDE [FR], et al) [Y] 1,2,5,7,12,13 * abstract * * page 1, lines 1-16 * * page 3, line 25 - page 4, line 16 * * page 5, lines 18-25 * * page 5, line 30 - page 6, line 11 *;
 [XY]NL1001613C  (ZOOMERS PETER LEONARD KORNEL [NL]) [X] 9,14 * abstract * [Y] 1,4,12;
 [Y]DE4001113  (LANGER BSA MASCHF [DE]) [Y] 1,12 * figures 1,7-9 * * column 2, line 38 - column 3, line 10 * * column 3, lines 56-68 * * column 5, line 57 - column 6, line 30 *;
 [Y]GB1512004  (MASSEY FERGUSON PERKINS LTD) [Y] 2,7,13 * page 2, lines 44-54; figure 1 *;
 [XY]EP0438187  (BOMERS BERNARDUS JOHANNES JOSE [NL]) [X] 10,11,15 * abstract * * column 3, lines 7-57 * [Y] 5,6,11;
 [A]FR2851482  (MICHEL PICHON SA ETS [FR]) [A] 4,9,14 * figures 1-4 * * page 1, lines 4-22 * * page 5, lines 21-24 * * page 6, lines 19-34 * * page 7, line 23 - page 8, line 4 * * page 8, line 34 - page 9, line 11 * * page 9, lines 23-24 *
International search[X]US5487346
 [X]US2002117095
 [X]US5190649
 [X]US2004235406
 [X]US3926377