Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1896117

EP1896117 - Power injector system for injecting contrast media into an intravenous line [Right-click to bookmark this link]
Former [2008/11]INFUSION APPARATUSES AND RELATED METHODS
[2010/36]
StatusPatent revoked
Status updated on  08.11.2013
Database last updated on 28.02.2020
Most recent event   Tooltip24.04.2015Change - lapse in a contracting statepublished on 27.05.2015  [2015/22]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
C.R.Bard, Inc.
730 Central Avenue
Murray Hill, NJ 07974 / US
[2008/11]
Inventor(s)01 / EVANS, John, G.
11271 South 600 West
South Jordan, UT 84095 / US
02 / POWERS, Kelly, B.
8 N. Foxhill Road Eaglewood
North Salt Lake, UT 84054 / US
03 / WEIR, Steven, A.
1156 Castlerock Road
Sandy, UT 84094 / US
04 / ROME, Guy, T.
6135 Dunford Court
West Valley City, UT 84128 / US
05 / HAMATAKE, Bret
297 West Clark Street
Grantsville, UT 84029 / US
06 / STATS, Jason, R.
2533 South 1400 West
Woods Cross, UT 84087 / US
07 / BEASLEY, Jim, C.
7684 S. Keswick Road
Sandy, UT 84093 / US
08 / HIBDON, Dwight
4958 East Meadows Drive
Park City, UT 84098 / US
09 / GERONDALE, Jay, D
628 Treven Place
Draper, UT 84020 / US
 [2008/18]
Former [2008/11]01 / EVANS, John, G.
11271 South 600 West
South Jordan, UT 84095 / US
02 / POWERS, Kelly, B.
8 N. Foxhill Road Eaglewood
North Salt Lake, UT 84054 / US
03 / WEIR, Steven, A.
1156 Castlerock Road
Sandy, UT 84094 / US
04 / ROME, Guy, T.
6135 Dunford Court
West Valley City, UT 84128 / US
05 / HAMATAKE, Bret
297 West Clark Street
Grantsville, UT 84029 / US
06 / STATS, Jason, R.
2533 South 1400 West
Woods Cross, UT 84087 / US
07 / BEASLEY, James, C.
7684 S. Keswick Road
Sandy, UT 84093 / US
08 / HIBDON, Dwight
4958 East Meadows Drive
Park City, UT 84098 / US
09 / GERONDALE, Jay, D
628 Treven Place
Draper, UT 84020 / US
Representative(s)Hoffmann Eitle
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB
Arabellastraße 30
81925 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2012/24]HOFFMANN EITLE
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte
Arabellastraße 4
81925 München / DE
Former [2008/47]Marsh, Roy David
Hoffmann Eitle, Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Arabellastrasse 4
81925 München / DE
Former [2008/11]Bertsch, Florian Oliver
Kraus & Weisert Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Thomas-Wimmer-Ring 15
80539 München / DE
Application number, filing date06751411.725.04.2006
[2008/11]
WO2006US15695
Priority number, dateUS20050675309P27.04.2005         Original published format: US 675309 P
US20050737466P15.11.2005         Original published format: US 737466 P
[2008/11]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2  Application without search report
No.:WO2006116438
Date:02.11.2006
Language:EN
[2006/44]
Type: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1896117
Date:12.03.2008
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 02.11.2006
[2008/11]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1896117
Date:12.01.2011
Language:EN
[2011/02]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP08.03.2007
ClassificationInternational:A61M39/02, A61M39/04
[2008/11]
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR [2008/14]
Former [2008/11]AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  NL,  PL,  PT,  RO,  SE,  SI,  SK,  TR 
Extension statesALNot yet paid
BANot yet paid
HRNot yet paid
MKNot yet paid
YUNot yet paid
TitleGerman:Spritzenpumpesystem zur Injektion von Kontrastmittel in einer intravenösen Leitung[2010/36]
English:Power injector system for injecting contrast media into an intravenous line[2010/36]
French:Injecteur de puissance pour l'injection d'agents de contraste dans une ligne intraveineuse[2010/36]
Former [2008/11]INFUSIONSGERÄTE UND RELEVANTE VERFAHREN
Former [2008/11]INFUSION APPARATUSES AND RELATED METHODS
Former [2008/11]APPAREIL DE PERFUSION ET METHODES CONNEXES
Entry into regional phase17.08.2007National basic fee paid 
17.08.2007Designation fee(s) paid 
17.08.2007Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure30.11.2006Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: US
17.08.2007Examination requested  [2008/11]
28.11.2007Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s)
26.02.2008Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
04.03.2008Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR
02.09.2008Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
02.01.2009Reply to a communication from the examining division
10.08.2009Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
10.02.2010Reply to a communication from the examining division
16.08.2010Communication of intention to grant the patent
25.11.2010Fee for grant paid
25.11.2010Fee for publishing/printing paid
Divisional application(s)EP10183380.4  / EP2308547
EP10183382.0  / EP2324878
EP10183394.5  / EP2324879
EP10183398.6  / EP2324880
EP14198524.2  / EP2939703
EP16193913.7
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  06.10.2011  02.11.2011  ADMISSIBLE
AESCULAP AG & Co. KG
Am Aesculap-Platz
78532 Tuttlingen / DE
Opponent's representative
Koller, Tobias Kilian
Aesculap AG
Abteilung Recht, Patente und M&A
Am Aesculap-Platz
78532 Tuttlingen / DE
 02  11.10.2011  17.01.2012  ADMISSIBLE
Fresenius Kabi Deutschland GmbH
Else-Krömer-Strasse 1
61352 Bad Homburg / DE
Opponent's representative
Brandt, Maximilian
Fresenius Kabi Deutschland GmbH
Patentabteilung MD
Else-Kröner-Strasse 1
61352 Bad Homburg / DE
 03  12.10.2011  02.11.2011  ADMISSIBLE
pfm medical ag
Wankelstrasse 60
50966 Köln / DE
Opponent's representative
Ring & Weisbrodt
Patentanwaltsgesellschaft mbH
Hohe Strasse 33
40213 Düsseldorf / DE
 [N/P]
Former [2012/07]
Opponent(s)01  06.10.2011  02.11.2011  ADMISSIBLE
AESCULAP AG & Co. KG
Am Aesculap-Platz
78532 Tuttlingen / DE
Opponent's representative
Koller, Tobias Kilian
Aesculap AG
Abteilung Recht, Patente und M&A
Am Aesculap-Platz
78532 Tuttlingen / DE
 02  11.10.2011   
Fresenius Kabi Deutschland GmbH
Else-Krömer-Strasse 1
61352 Bad Homburg / DE
Opponent's representative
Brandt, Maximilian
Fresenius Kabi Deutschland GmbH Patent Department Else-Kröner-Str. 1
61352 Bad Homburg / DE
 03  12.10.2011  02.11.2011  ADMISSIBLE
pfm medical ag
Wankelstrasse 60
50966 Köln / DE
Opponent's representative
Ring & Weisbrodt
Patentanwaltsgesellschaft mbH Hohe Strasse 33
40213 Düsseldorf / DE
Former [2011/47]
Opponent(s)01  06.10.2011   
AESCULAP AG & Co. KG
Am Aesculap-Platz
78532 Tuttlingen / DE
Opponent's representative
Koller, Tobias Kilian
Aesculap AG
Abteilung Recht, Patente und M&A
Am Aesculap-Platz
DE-78532 Tuttlingen / DE
 02  11.10.2011   
Fresenius Kabi Deutschland GmbH
Else-Krömer-Strasse 1
61352 Bad Homburg / DE
Opponent's representative
Brandt, Maximilian
Fresenius Kabi Deutschland GmbH Patent Department Else-Kröner-Str. 1
61352 Bad Homburg / DE
 03  12.10.2011   
pfm medical ag
Wankelstrasse 60
50966 Köln / DE
Opponent's representative
Polypatent
An den Gärten 7
51491 Overath / DE
19.01.2012Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
27.07.2012Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
01.08.2012Despatch of communication that the patent will be revoked
24.07.2013Legal effect of revocation of patent [2013/50]
Appeal following opposition02.10.2012Appeal received No.  T2177/12
11.12.2012Statement of grounds filed
24.07.2013Result of appeal procedure: appeal of the proprietor inadmissible
24.07.2013Date of oral proceedings
05.08.2013Minutes of the oral proceedings despatched
Fees paidRenewal fee
28.10.2008Renewal fee patent year 03
25.06.2009Renewal fee patent year 04
25.03.2010Renewal fee patent year 05
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
30.04.200803   M06   Fee paid on   28.10.2008
30.04.200904   M06   Fee paid on   25.06.2009
Lapses during opposition  TooltipDE21.09.2012
FR27.12.2012
[2015/22]
Cited inInternational search[X]US6213973  (ELIASEN KENNETH A ET AL) [X] 14-17 * abstract * * column 14, lines 1-67; figures 6-8 * * column 24, lines 4-19 *;
 [X]US5045060  (MELSKY ET AL) [X] 14-17 * abstract * * column 6, lines 4-38; figures 2,3B *;
 [X]WO9942166  (C. R. BARD, INC) [X] 14-17 * page 13, line 29 - page 14, line 4; figure 10 * * page 17, lines 3-11; figure 14 *;
 [X]US4772276  (WIITA ET AL) [X] 14-17 * abstract * * column 5, line 66 - column 6, line 32; figure 3 *;
 [X]US5718682  (TUCKER ET AL) [X] 14-17 * abstract *;
 [A]US6039712  (FOGARTY ET AL) [A] 14-17 * the whole document *;
 [X]US5041098  (LOITERMAN ET AL) [X] 18-20 * abstract * * column 5, lines 48-53; figures 1,3 *;
 [X]US6193684  (BURBANK JEFFREY H [US] ET AL) [X] 18-20 * abstract * * figures 1,5C; claims 13,26,35 *;
 [X]US5931829  (BURBANK JEFFREY H [US] ET AL) [X] 18-20 * abstract * * column 3, lines 14-18; figures 8,9,11B *