Extract from the Register of European Patents

All documents: EP1896117 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP1896117



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 1768
10.02.2014 CDS Clean up - amended data concerning the representative for the opponent Opposition 1
01.11.2013 Termination of the opposition proceedings with revocation of patent Opposition 2
14.10.2013 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
12.10.2013 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
11.10.2013 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
10.10.2013 Advice of delivery Appeal 2
10.10.2013 Advice of delivery Appeal 2
09.10.2013 Advice of delivery Appeal 2
09.10.2013 Advice of delivery Appeal 2
08.10.2013 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
07.10.2013 F3032 Notification(s) of the decision Appeal 26
05.08.2013 F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes Appeal 6
23.07.2013 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 3
18.07.2013 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 6
18.07.2013 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 5
18.07.2013 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 6
08.07.2013 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 3
05.07.2013 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 4
05.07.2013 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 3
02.07.2013 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 3
28.06.2013 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 1
27.06.2013 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 4
26.06.2013 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 5
24.06.2013 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 5
21.06.2013 Request for interpreters during oral proceedings Appeal 1
24.05.2013 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 3
16.05.2013 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 6
06.04.2013 Advice of delivery Appeal 2
21.03.2013 Advice of delivery Appeal 2
20.03.2013 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
20.03.2013 Advice of delivery Appeal 2
19.03.2013 Advice of delivery Appeal 2
19.03.2013 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
18.03.2013 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
15.03.2013 F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons Appeal 11
11.03.2013 F3010 Oral proceedings: order for summons Appeal 1
14.12.2012 F3344 Setting time limit for reply/ file observations to appeal (inter partes) Appeal 3
11.12.2012 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 3
11.12.2012 Statement of grounds of appeal Appeal 8
11.12.2012 Statement of grounds of appeal Appeal 8
06.12.2012 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 2
05.12.2012 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 2
26.11.2012 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 3
23.11.2012 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 3
22.11.2012 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 3
19.11.2012 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 6
14.11.2012 F3303.14 Composition of the Board (T), in case Chairman is a legal member Appeal 1
14.11.2012 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 3
06.11.2012 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 5
15.10.2012 F3204 Communication of the file number to the parties Appeal 4
09.10.2012 Processing of an appeal Appeal 2
02.10.2012 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 1
02.10.2012 Notice of appeal Appeal 2
02.10.2012 Payment of fees and costs Appeal 1
14.08.2012 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
07.08.2012 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
06.08.2012 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
04.08.2012 Advice of delivery Opposition 2
04.08.2012 Advice of delivery Opposition 2
03.08.2012 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
03.08.2012 Advice of delivery Opposition 2
03.08.2012 Advice of delivery Opposition 2
01.08.2012 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
01.08.2012 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
01.08.2012 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
01.08.2012 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
01.08.2012 Decision revoking the European patent Opposition 2
01.08.2012 Decision revoking the European patent Opposition 2
01.08.2012 Decision revoking the European patent Opposition 2
01.08.2012 Decision revoking the European patent Opposition 2
31.07.2012 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
31.07.2012 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
31.07.2012 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
30.07.2012 Request for revocation of patent Opposition 1
27.07.2012 Request for revocation of patent Opposition 1
31.05.2012 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
31.05.2012 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
31.05.2012 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
31.05.2012 Grant of extension of time limit (opposition procedure) Opposition 1
29.05.2012 Request for extension of time limit Opposition 1
16.05.2012 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
14.05.2012 Communication of amended entries concerning the representative Opposition 1
12.05.2012 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 2
09.05.2012 CDS Clean up - amended data concerning the representative of the applicant (Association) Search / examination 1
14.02.2012 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
28.01.2012 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 1
19.01.2012 Communication of a notice of opposition and request to file observations Opposition 1
19.01.2012 Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) Opposition 1
19.01.2012 Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) Opposition 1
19.01.2012 Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) Opposition 1
17.01.2012 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
13.01.2012 Authorisation of representative Opposition 1
13.01.2012 Request for change of opponent's representative Opposition 1
12.01.2012 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
11.01.2012 General authorisation Opposition 1
11.01.2012 Request for change of opponent's representative Opposition 1
04.01.2012 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 1
04.01.2012 Non-scannable object Opposition 3
04.01.2012 Non-scannable object Opposition 5
04.01.2012 Non-scannable object Opposition 2
04.01.2012 Non-scannable object Opposition 8
02.01.2012 Request concerning the applicant/representative Opposition 1
30.12.2011 Request for change of opponent's representative Opposition 1
17.11.2011 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 1
04.11.2011 Request for documents Opposition 1
20.10.2011 Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor Opposition 1
18.10.2011 Citation in opposition procedure Opposition 4
18.10.2011 Citation in opposition procedure Opposition 1
18.10.2011 Notice of opposition Opposition 13
18.10.2011 Notice of opposition Opposition 4
18.10.2011 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 20
18.10.2011 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 34
18.10.2011 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 14
18.10.2011 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 12
18.10.2011 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 26
18.10.2011 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 32
12.10.2011 Citation in opposition procedure Opposition 4
12.10.2011 Citation in opposition procedure Opposition 1
12.10.2011 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Opposition 2
12.10.2011 Notice of opposition Opposition 4
12.10.2011 Notice of opposition Opposition 13
12.10.2011 Payment of fees and costs Opposition 1
11.10.2011 (Electronic) Receipt Opposition 3
11.10.2011 Citation in opposition procedure Opposition 10
11.10.2011 Citation in opposition procedure Opposition 18
11.10.2011 Citation in opposition procedure Opposition 9
11.10.2011 Citation in opposition procedure Opposition 2
11.10.2011 Citation in opposition procedure Opposition 3
11.10.2011 Citation in opposition procedure Opposition 2
11.10.2011 Citation in opposition procedure Opposition 1
11.10.2011 Citation in opposition procedure Opposition 5
11.10.2011 Citation in opposition procedure Opposition 2
11.10.2011 Citation in opposition procedure Opposition 70
11.10.2011 Citation in opposition procedure Opposition 2
11.10.2011 Citation in opposition procedure Opposition 3
11.10.2011 Citation in opposition procedure Opposition 6
11.10.2011 Citation in opposition procedure Opposition 43
11.10.2011 Citation in opposition procedure Opposition 2
11.10.2011 Citation in opposition procedure Opposition 6
11.10.2011 Citation in opposition procedure Opposition 1
11.10.2011 Citation in opposition procedure Opposition 1
11.10.2011 Citation in opposition procedure Opposition 8
11.10.2011 Citation in opposition procedure Opposition 4
11.10.2011 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 2
11.10.2011 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 3
11.10.2011 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 4
11.10.2011 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 7
11.10.2011 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 7
11.10.2011 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 1
11.10.2011 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 4
11.10.2011 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 9
11.10.2011 Notice of opposition Opposition 28
11.10.2011 Notice of opposition Opposition 10
11.10.2011 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 22
11.10.2011 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 6
11.10.2011 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 64
11.10.2011 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 10
11.10.2011 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 12
11.10.2011 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 37
11.10.2011 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 24
11.10.2011 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 13
11.10.2011 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 10
11.10.2011 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 4
11.10.2011 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 7
11.10.2011 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 12
11.10.2011 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 7
11.10.2011 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 34
11.10.2011 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 5
11.10.2011 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 12
11.10.2011 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 10
11.10.2011 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 5
11.10.2011 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 37
06.10.2011 Notice of opposition Opposition 4
06.10.2011 Notice of opposition Opposition 13
06.10.2011 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 13
06.10.2011 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 26
06.10.2011 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 32
06.10.2011 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 19
06.10.2011 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 12
06.10.2011 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 33
06.10.2011 Payment of fees and costs Opposition 1
16.12.2010 Decision to grant a European patent Search / examination 2
25.11.2010 Filing of the translations of the claims Search / examination 1
25.11.2010 French translation of claims Search / examination 4
25.11.2010 German translation of the claims Search / examination 3
16.08.2010 Bibliographic data of the European patent application Search / examination 2
16.08.2010 Communication about intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 4
16.08.2010 Intention to grant (signatures) Search / examination 1
16.08.2010 Text intended for grant Search / examination 90
18.03.2010 Claims Search / examination 3
18.03.2010 Claims Search / examination 3
18.03.2010 Letter filed during examination procedure after communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
10.02.2010 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 3
10.02.2010 Claims Search / examination 3
10.02.2010 Description Search / examination 47
10.02.2010 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
04.01.2010 Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) Search / examination 1
21.12.2009 Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
10.08.2009 Annex to the communication Search / examination 2
10.08.2009 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
04.06.2009 Notice drawing attention to the payment of the renewal fee and additional fee Search / examination 1
02.01.2009 Claims Search / examination 3
02.01.2009 Claims Search / examination 11
02.01.2009 Description Search / examination 2
02.01.2009 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 3
17.10.2008 Communication of amended entries concerning the representative Search / examination 1
26.09.2008 Document concerning representation Search / examination 1
23.09.2008 Document concerning representation Search / examination 1
02.09.2008 Annex to the communication Search / examination 3
02.09.2008 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
13.06.2008 Final instructions (loss of partial rights) Search / examination 2
04.06.2008 Notice drawing attention to the payment of the renewal fee and additional fee Search / examination 1
18.03.2008 Letter concerning the inventor Search / examination 1
04.03.2008 Designation deemed to be withdrawn (loss of partial rights) Search / examination 2
26.02.2008 Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report Search / examination 5
26.02.2008 Amendments received before examination Search / examination 2
13.02.2008 Notification on forthcoming publication of bibliographic data Search / examination 1
16.01.2008 Communication regarding possible amendment of claims/payment of claims fees Search / examination 2
27.10.2007 Copy of the international preliminary report on patentability Search / examination 8
07.09.2007 Information on entry into European phase Search / examination 3
17.08.2007 Request for entry into the European phase Search / examination 8
08.03.2007 Copy of the international search report Search / examination 6
08.03.2007 International publication of the international search report Search / examination 2
19.12.2006 Notification of the recording of a change Search / examination 1
19.12.2006 Notification of the recording of a change Search / examination 1
20.11.2006 Priority document (electronically transmitted) Search / examination 70
20.11.2006 Priority document (electronically transmitted) Search / examination 43
02.11.2006 International publication of the A2 Pamphlet Search / examination 101
07.07.2006 Abstract International Searching Authority 1
07.07.2006 Claims International Searching Authority 11
07.07.2006 Description International Searching Authority 56
07.07.2006 Drawings International Searching Authority 32