Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1880214

EP1880214 - METHOD FOR IDENTIFYING MODULATORS OF NOAH10 USEFUL FOR TREATING ALZHEIMER'S DISEASE [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  05.11.2010
Database last updated on 20.02.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip05.11.2010Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 08.12.2010  [2010/49]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp.
126 East Lincoln Avenue
Rahway, NJ 07065 / US
[2010/10]
Former [2008/04]For all designated states
Merck & Co., Inc.
126 East Lincoln Avenue
Rahway, New Jersey 07065-0907 / US
Inventor(s)01 / STONE, David, J.
126 East Lincoln Avenue
Rahway, New Jersey 07065-0907 / US
02 / RAY, William, J.
126 East Lincoln Avenue
Rahway, New Jersey 07065-0907 / US
03 / MAJERCAK, John, M.
126 East Lincoln Avenue
Rahway, New Jersey 07065-0907 / US
 [2008/04]
Representative(s)Buchan, Gavin MacNicol
Merck Sharp & Dohme Limited
European Patent Department
Hertford Road
Hoddesdon
Hertfordshire EN11 9BU / GB
[N/P]
Former [2009/37]Buchan, Gavin MacNicol
Merck Sharp & Dohme Limited European Patent Department Hertford Road Hoddesdon
Hertfordshire EN11 9BU / GB
Former [2008/04]Buchan, Gavin MacNicol
Merck & Co., Inc. Hertford Road
Hoddesdon, Herts. EN11 9BU / GB
Application number, filing date06751881.128.04.2006
[2008/04]
WO2006US16407
Priority number, dateUS20050677193P03.05.2005         Original published format: US 677193 P
US20050750155P14.12.2005         Original published format: US 750155 P
[2008/04]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2006119095
Date:09.11.2006
Language:EN
[2006/45]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1880214
Date:23.01.2008
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 09.11.2006
[2008/04]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:US09.11.2006
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP23.01.2009
ClassificationInternational:G01N33/50, G01N33/53, G01N33/68, C12Q1/34, C12Q1/37, A01N37/18, A61K39/395
[2009/08]
Former International [2008/04]G01N33/53, G01N33/566, G01N33/567, C12Q1/34, C12Q1/37, A01N37/18, A61K39/395
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   NL,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2008/04]
Extension statesALNot yet paid
BANot yet paid
HRNot yet paid
MKNot yet paid
YUNot yet paid
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN ZUR IDENTIFIZIERUNG VON ZUR BEHANDLUNG VON MORBUS ALZHEIMER GEEIGNETEN MODULATOREN VON NOAH10[2008/04]
English:METHOD FOR IDENTIFYING MODULATORS OF NOAH10 USEFUL FOR TREATING ALZHEIMER'S DISEASE[2008/04]
French:PROCÉDÉ D'IDENTIFICATION DE MODULATEURS DE NOAH10 UTILE POUR LE TRAITEMENT DE LA MALADIE D'ALZHEIMER[2008/04]
Entry into regional phase03.12.2007National basic fee paid 
03.12.2007Search fee paid 
03.12.2007Designation fee(s) paid 
03.12.2007Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure03.12.2007Examination requested  [2008/04]
20.03.2009Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
23.07.2009Reply to a communication from the examining division
02.02.2010Communication of intention to grant the patent
15.06.2010Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2010/49]
21.07.2010Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time  [2010/49]
Fees paidRenewal fee
18.03.2008Renewal fee patent year 03
16.04.2009Renewal fee patent year 04
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
30.04.201005   M06   Not yet paid
Documents cited:Search[A]WO9821589  (UNIV PENNSYLVANIA [US], et al) [A] 1-5,7,9,10 * the whole document *;
 [A]  "Human Anat-4 antigen.", DATABASE Geneseq, Database accession no. ABR82506, URL: EBI, XP002484585 [A] 1-5,7,9,10 * the whole document *
 [T]  MAJERCAK JOHN ET AL, "LRRTM3 promotes processing of amyloid-precursor protein by BACE1 and is a positional candidate gene for late-onset Alzheimer's disease", PROCEEDINGS OF THE NATIONAL ACADEMY OF SCIENCES OF THE UNITED STATES OF AMERICA, (200611), vol. 103, no. 47, ISSN 0027-8424, pages 17967 - 17972, XP002484584 [T] 1-5,7,9,10

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1073/PNAS.0605461103
International search[A]US6787144
 [A]  KIENLEN-CAMPARD ET AL.: 'The processing and biological function of the human amyloid precursor protein (APP): lessons from different cellular models' EXPERIMENTAL GERONTOLOGY vol. 35, 2000, pages 843 - 850, XP008123054
 [A]  STOREY ET AL.: 'The amyloid precursor protein of Alzheimer's disease and the Abeta peptide' NEUROPATHOLOGY AND APPLIED NEUROBIOLOGY vol. 25, 1999, pages 81 - 97, XP008123055
by applicant   - HARLOW; LANE: 'Antibodies: A Laboratory Manual.', 1988, COLD SPRING HARBOR LABORATORY PRESS
    - BAHOUTH ET AL. TRENDS PHARMACOL. SCI. vol. 12, 1991, page 338
    - AUSUBEL ET AL.: 'Current Protocols in Molecular Biology', 1989, JOHN WILEY AND SONS
 US19550032005