Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2022133

EP2022133 - MODULE, FILTER, AND ANTENNA TECHNOLOGY FOR MILLIMETER WAVES MULTI-GIGABITS WIRELESS SYSTEMS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  01.10.2010
Database last updated on 08.12.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip01.10.2010Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 03.11.2010  [2010/44]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
GEORGIA TECH RESEARCH CORPORATION
505 Tenth Street, NW
Atlanta, GA 30332-0415 / US
For all designated states
Pinel, Stephane
482 Deering Road
Atlanta GA 30309 / US
For all designated states
Laskar, Joy
860 Saints Drive
Marietta GA 30068 / US
[2009/07]
Inventor(s)01 / PINEL, Stephane
482 Deering Road
Atlanta, GA 30309 / US
02 / LASKAR, Joy
860 Saints Drive
Marietta, GA 30068 / US
 [2009/07]
Representative(s)Seitz, Holger Fritz Karl
Exter Polak & Charlouis B.V. (EP&C)
P.O. Box 3241
2280 GE Rijswijk / NL
[N/P]
Former [2009/07]Seitz, Holger Fritz Karl
Exter Polak & Charlouis B.V. P.O. Box 3241
2280 GE Rijswijk / NL
Application number, filing date06752085.804.05.2006
[2009/07]
WO2006US16826
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2007130027
Date:15.11.2007
Language:EN
[2007/46]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2022133
Date:11.02.2009
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 15.11.2007
[2009/07]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:US15.11.2007
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP03.07.2009
ClassificationInternational:H05K1/00, H05K1/02, H05K1/18, H05K3/00, H05K3/46, H01Q1/38
[2009/32]
Former International [2009/07]H01Q1/38
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   NL,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2009/07]
Extension statesALNot yet paid
BANot yet paid
HRNot yet paid
MKNot yet paid
YUNot yet paid
TitleGerman:MODUL-, FILTER- UND ANTENNENTECHNOLOGIE FÜR DRAHTLOSE MILLIMETERWELLEN-MULTI-GIGABITS-SYSTEME[2009/07]
English:MODULE, FILTER, AND ANTENNA TECHNOLOGY FOR MILLIMETER WAVES MULTI-GIGABITS WIRELESS SYSTEMS[2009/07]
French:MODULE, FILTRE, ET TECHNOLOGIE D'ANTENNE POUR SYSTÈMES SANS FIL MULTI-GIGABITS, À ONDES MILLIMÉTRIQUES[2009/07]
Entry into regional phase04.12.2008National basic fee paid 
04.12.2008Search fee paid 
04.12.2008Designation fee(s) paid 
04.12.2008Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure04.12.2008Examination requested  [2009/07]
22.01.2009Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
04.01.2010Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
15.05.2010Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2010/44]
18.06.2010Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time  [2010/44]
Fees paidRenewal fee
04.12.2008Renewal fee patent year 03
28.05.2009Renewal fee patent year 04
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.05.201005   M06   Not yet paid
Documents cited:Search[A]US6028489  (JUANG SHING-YEU [TW], et al) [A] 1,11 * column 3, line 5 - line 12 *;
 [A]JP2001260274  (MITSUBISHI GAS CHEMICAL CO) [A] 1,11 * abstract *;
 [A]US5888627  (NAKATANI SEIICHI [JP]) [A] 1,11 * abstract *;
 [A]JPH08181452  (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC WORKS LTD) [A] 1,11 * abstract *
International search[X]US6091364
 [A]US5552798
 [A]US6275191
 [A]US6836247