blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability
Register Forum

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News flashes

New version of the European Patent Register - SPC information for Unitary Patents.

2024-03-06

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP1907623

EP1907623 - LIGNO CELLULOSIC MATERIALS AND THE PRODUCTS MADE THEREFROM [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  01.03.2013
Database last updated on 25.05.2024
Most recent event   Tooltip18.07.2014Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): HU
published on 20.08.2014  [2014/34]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
INTERNATIONAL PAPER COMPANY
400 Atlantic Street
Stamford, CT 06921 / US
[2008/15]
Inventor(s)01 / TAN, Zheng
8308 Cherrydale Court
Mason, Ohio 45040 / US
02 / LORENZONI, Damaris
Rua Tapera S/N
Venda Nova Do Imigrante, ES 29375-000 / BR
03 / GOYAL, Gopal
7838 Plumfield Court
Mason, OH 45040 / US
04 / YANG, Sen
32 Terrace Avenue
Nanuet, New York 10954 / US
 [2008/20]
Former [2008/15]01 / TAN, Zheng
5261 Balsam Place, Apt. 205
Mason, Ohio 45040 / US
02 / LORENZONI, Damaris
Rua Tapera S/N
Venda Nova Do Imigrante, ES 29375-000 / BR
03 / GOYAL, Gopal
7838 Plumfield Court
Mason, OH 45040 / US
04 / YANG, Sen
32 Terrace Avenue
Nanuet, New York 10954 / US
Representative(s)Schneider, Michael, et al
Heisse Kursawe Eversheds
Brienner Strasse 12
80333 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2010/12]Schneider, Michael, et al
Heisse Kursawe Eversheds Rechtsanwälte Partnerschaft Maximiliansplatz 5
80333 München / DE
Former [2008/15]Schneider, Michael, et al
HAMMONDS Karl-Scharnagl-Ring 7
80539 München / DE
Application number, filing date06752181.502.05.2006
[2008/15]
WO2006US17055
Priority number, dateUS20050676828P02.05.2005         Original published format: US 676828 P
US20060760073P19.01.2006         Original published format: US 760073 P
[2008/15]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report
No.:WO2006119392
Date:09.11.2006
Language:EN
[2006/45]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1907623
Date:09.04.2008
Language:EN
The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 09.11.2006 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application.
[2008/15]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1907623
Date:25.04.2012
Language:EN
[2012/17]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP09.11.2006
ClassificationIPC:D21C9/16, D21H11/16, A61F13/15
[2008/15]
CPC:
D21C9/163 (EP,US); A01N25/10 (US); A01N59/00 (US);
A01N59/16 (US); A01N59/20 (US); A61F13/15 (EP);
A61F13/15203 (EP); D21C9/002 (EP,US); D21C9/004 (EP,US);
D21H11/04 (US); D21H11/20 (EP,US); D21H17/65 (US);
D21H17/66 (US); D21H21/32 (US); D21H27/007 (US);
D21H27/30 (US); Y10T428/31971 (EP,US) (-)
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   NL,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2008/15]
TitleGerman:LIGNOCELLULOSISCHE MATERIALIEN UND DARAUS HERGESTELLTE PRODUKTE[2008/15]
English:LIGNO CELLULOSIC MATERIALS AND THE PRODUCTS MADE THEREFROM[2008/15]
French:MATERIAUX LIGNOCELLULOSIQUES ET PRODUITS FABRIQUES A PARTIR DE CES MATERIAUX[2008/15]
Entry into regional phase16.10.2007National basic fee paid 
16.10.2007Designation fee(s) paid 
16.10.2007Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure01.03.2007Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
16.10.2007Examination requested  [2008/15]
25.01.2011Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
28.04.2011Reply to a communication from the examining division
04.07.2011Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
11.07.2011Reply to a communication from the examining division
07.10.2011Communication of intention to grant the patent
06.02.2012Fee for grant paid
06.02.2012Fee for publishing/printing paid
Divisional application(s)EP12002877.4  / EP2527531
EP14002619.6  / EP2840182
EP19183965.3  / EP3575489
EP20215407.6  / EP3862485
The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  25.01.2011
Opposition(s)28.01.2013No opposition filed within time limit [2013/14]
Fees paidRenewal fee
28.05.2008Renewal fee patent year 03
27.05.2009Renewal fee patent year 04
25.05.2010Renewal fee patent year 05
25.05.2011Renewal fee patent year 06
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Lapses during opposition  TooltipHU02.05.2006
BE25.04.2012
CY25.04.2012
CZ25.04.2012
DK25.04.2012
EE25.04.2012
LT25.04.2012
LV25.04.2012
NL25.04.2012
RO25.04.2012
SI25.04.2012
SK25.04.2012
TR25.04.2012
IE02.05.2012
LU02.05.2012
CH31.05.2012
LI31.05.2012
MC31.05.2012
BG25.07.2012
GR26.07.2012
IS25.08.2012
[2014/34]
Former [2014/27]BE25.04.2012
CY25.04.2012
CZ25.04.2012
DK25.04.2012
EE25.04.2012
LT25.04.2012
LV25.04.2012
NL25.04.2012
RO25.04.2012
SI25.04.2012
SK25.04.2012
TR25.04.2012
IE02.05.2012
LU02.05.2012
CH31.05.2012
LI31.05.2012
MC31.05.2012
BG25.07.2012
GR26.07.2012
IS25.08.2012
Former [2014/21]BE25.04.2012
CY25.04.2012
CZ25.04.2012
DK25.04.2012
EE25.04.2012
LT25.04.2012
LV25.04.2012
NL25.04.2012
RO25.04.2012
SI25.04.2012
SK25.04.2012
TR25.04.2012
IE02.05.2012
CH31.05.2012
LI31.05.2012
MC31.05.2012
BG25.07.2012
GR26.07.2012
IS25.08.2012
Former [2013/34]BE25.04.2012
CY25.04.2012
CZ25.04.2012
DK25.04.2012
EE25.04.2012
LT25.04.2012
LV25.04.2012
NL25.04.2012
RO25.04.2012
SI25.04.2012
SK25.04.2012
IE02.05.2012
CH31.05.2012
LI31.05.2012
MC31.05.2012
BG25.07.2012
GR26.07.2012
IS25.08.2012
Former [2013/20]BE25.04.2012
CY25.04.2012
CZ25.04.2012
DK25.04.2012
EE25.04.2012
LT25.04.2012
LV25.04.2012
NL25.04.2012
RO25.04.2012
SI25.04.2012
SK25.04.2012
IE02.05.2012
CH31.05.2012
LI31.05.2012
MC31.05.2012
GR26.07.2012
IS25.08.2012
Former [2013/10]BE25.04.2012
CY25.04.2012
CZ25.04.2012
DK25.04.2012
EE25.04.2012
LT25.04.2012
LV25.04.2012
NL25.04.2012
RO25.04.2012
SI25.04.2012
SK25.04.2012
CH31.05.2012
LI31.05.2012
MC31.05.2012
GR26.07.2012
IS25.08.2012
Former [2013/09]BE25.04.2012
CY25.04.2012
DK25.04.2012
EE25.04.2012
LT25.04.2012
LV25.04.2012
NL25.04.2012
SI25.04.2012
CH31.05.2012
LI31.05.2012
MC31.05.2012
GR26.07.2012
IS25.08.2012
Former [2013/08]BE25.04.2012
CY25.04.2012
DK25.04.2012
LT25.04.2012
LV25.04.2012
NL25.04.2012
SI25.04.2012
CH31.05.2012
LI31.05.2012
MC31.05.2012
GR26.07.2012
IS25.08.2012
Former [2013/07]BE25.04.2012
CY25.04.2012
LT25.04.2012
LV25.04.2012
SI25.04.2012
CH31.05.2012
LI31.05.2012
MC31.05.2012
GR26.07.2012
IS25.08.2012
Former [2013/04]BE25.04.2012
CY25.04.2012
LT25.04.2012
LV25.04.2012
SI25.04.2012
MC31.05.2012
GR26.07.2012
IS25.08.2012
Former [2013/03]CY25.04.2012
LT25.04.2012
LV25.04.2012
SI25.04.2012
MC31.05.2012
GR26.07.2012
IS25.08.2012
Former [2012/51]CY25.04.2012
LT25.04.2012
LV25.04.2012
SI25.04.2012
GR26.07.2012
IS25.08.2012
Former [2012/50]CY25.04.2012
LT25.04.2012
LV25.04.2012
GR26.07.2012
IS25.08.2012
Former [2012/49]CY25.04.2012
LT25.04.2012
IS25.08.2012
Former [2012/47]LT25.04.2012
Cited inInternational search[A]US4889595  (HERRON CARLISLE M [US], et al) [A] 1-30 * column 4, lines 5-19 * * column 17, lines 27-40 * * column 5, lines 16-25 *;
 [A]FR2688787  (ATOCHEM ELF SA [FR]) [A] 1-30 * abstract *;
 [A]WO9535408  (KEMIRA CHEMICALS OY [FI], et al) [A] 1-30 * page 5, lines 14-29 *;
 [A]EP1156065  (NAT STARCH CHEM INVEST [US]) [A] 1-30* paragraphs [0007] , [0011] , [0015] *;
 [A]US2005061455  (TAN ZHENG [US], et al) [A] 1-30 * paragraphs [0014] - [0017] *
by applicantUS5766159
 US6063982
 US6635755
 US2005061455
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.