Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2024555

EP2024555 - Gas-heated laundry dryer with heating device [Right-click to bookmark this link]
Former [2009/08]HEATING DEVICE, IN PARTICULAR FOR A LAUNDRY DRYER
[2010/23]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  12.08.2011
Database last updated on 17.11.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip04.10.2013Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): HU
published on 06.11.2013  [2013/45]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Miele & Cie. KG
Carl-Miele-Straße 29
33332 Gütersloh / DE
[N/P]
Former [2009/08]For all designated states
Miele & Cie. KG
Schutzrechte/Verträge Carl-Miele-Strasse 29
33332 Gütersloh / DE
Inventor(s)01 / FREESE, Heinz
Mariaplaats 52 3511 LM Utrecht
Niederlande / NL
02 / JORDING, Wolfhard
ULmenweg 16
32584 Löhne / DE
03 / RIEDEL, Wiebke
Bergstrasse 12
33829 Borgholzhausen / DE
04 / SCHIWY, Frank
Elsässer Strasse 6
33332 Gütersloh / DE
 [2009/08]
Application number, filing date06753661.517.05.2006
[2009/08]
WO2006EP04636
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2007131531
Date:22.11.2007
Language:DE
[2007/47]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2024555
Date:18.02.2009
Language:DE
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 22.11.2007
[2009/08]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2024555
Date:06.10.2010
Language:DE
[2010/40]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP22.11.2007
ClassificationInternational:D06F58/26, D06F58/28, F26B23/02
[2009/08]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   NL,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2009/08]
Extension statesALNot yet paid
BANot yet paid
HRNot yet paid
MKNot yet paid
YUNot yet paid
TitleGerman:Gasbeheizter Wäschetrockner mit Heizungseinrichtung[2010/23]
English:Gas-heated laundry dryer with heating device[2010/23]
French:Sèche-linge chauffé au gaz avec dispositif de chauffage[2010/23]
Former [2009/08]HEIZUNGSEINRICHTUNG, INSBESONDERE FÜR EINEN WÄSCHETROCKNER
Former [2009/08]HEATING DEVICE, IN PARTICULAR FOR A LAUNDRY DRYER
Former [2009/08]DISPOSITIF DE CHAUFFAGE, NOTAMMENT DANS UN SÈCHE-LINGE
Entry into regional phase11.09.2008National basic fee paid 
11.09.2008Designation fee(s) paid 
11.09.2008Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure11.09.2008Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
11.09.2008Examination requested  [2009/08]
26.01.2010Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
09.02.2010Reply to a communication from the examining division
14.04.2010Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
22.04.2010Reply to a communication from the examining division
31.05.2010Communication of intention to grant the patent
21.08.2010Fee for grant paid
21.08.2010Fee for publishing/printing paid
Divisional application(s)EP10001075.0  / EP2186935
Opposition(s)07.07.2011No opposition filed within time limit [2011/37]
Fees paidRenewal fee
11.09.2008Renewal fee patent year 03
08.05.2009Renewal fee patent year 04
25.03.2010Renewal fee patent year 05
Lapses during opposition  TooltipCY06.10.2010
CZ06.10.2010
DK06.10.2010
EE06.10.2010
FI06.10.2010
HU06.10.2010
IE06.10.2010
LT06.10.2010
LV06.10.2010
NL06.10.2010
PL06.10.2010
RO06.10.2010
SE06.10.2010
SI06.10.2010
SK06.10.2010
TR06.10.2010
BG06.01.2011
GR07.01.2011
IS06.02.2011
PT07.02.2011
AT17.05.2011
LU17.05.2011
BE31.05.2011
CH31.05.2011
LI31.05.2011
MC31.05.2011
[2013/45]
Former [2013/44]CY06.10.2010
CZ06.10.2010
DK06.10.2010
EE06.10.2010
FI06.10.2010
IE06.10.2010
LT06.10.2010
LV06.10.2010
NL06.10.2010
PL06.10.2010
RO06.10.2010
SE06.10.2010
SI06.10.2010
SK06.10.2010
TR06.10.2010
BG06.01.2011
GR07.01.2011
IS06.02.2011
PT07.02.2011
AT17.05.2011
LU17.05.2011
BE31.05.2011
CH31.05.2011
LI31.05.2011
MC31.05.2011
Former [2013/26]CY06.10.2010
CZ06.10.2010
DK06.10.2010
EE06.10.2010
FI06.10.2010
IE06.10.2010
LT06.10.2010
LV06.10.2010
NL06.10.2010
PL06.10.2010
RO06.10.2010
SE06.10.2010
SI06.10.2010
SK06.10.2010
BG06.01.2011
GR07.01.2011
IS06.02.2011
PT07.02.2011
AT17.05.2011
LU17.05.2011
BE31.05.2011
CH31.05.2011
LI31.05.2011
MC31.05.2011
Former [2013/25]CZ06.10.2010
DK06.10.2010
EE06.10.2010
FI06.10.2010
IE06.10.2010
LT06.10.2010
LV06.10.2010
NL06.10.2010
PL06.10.2010
RO06.10.2010
SE06.10.2010
SI06.10.2010
SK06.10.2010
BG06.01.2011
GR07.01.2011
IS06.02.2011
PT07.02.2011
AT17.05.2011
LU17.05.2011
BE31.05.2011
CH31.05.2011
LI31.05.2011
MC31.05.2011
Former [2013/07]CZ06.10.2010
DK06.10.2010
EE06.10.2010
FI06.10.2010
IE06.10.2010
LT06.10.2010
LV06.10.2010
NL06.10.2010
PL06.10.2010
RO06.10.2010
SE06.10.2010
SI06.10.2010
SK06.10.2010
BG06.01.2011
GR07.01.2011
IS06.02.2011
PT07.02.2011
AT17.05.2011
BE31.05.2011
CH31.05.2011
LI31.05.2011
MC31.05.2011
Former [2012/17]CZ06.10.2010
DK06.10.2010
EE06.10.2010
FI06.10.2010
IE06.10.2010
LT06.10.2010
LV06.10.2010
NL06.10.2010
PL06.10.2010
RO06.10.2010
SE06.10.2010
SI06.10.2010
SK06.10.2010
BG06.01.2011
GR07.01.2011
IS06.02.2011
PT07.02.2011
BE31.05.2011
CH31.05.2011
LI31.05.2011
MC31.05.2011
Former [2012/07]CZ06.10.2010
DK06.10.2010
EE06.10.2010
FI06.10.2010
IE06.10.2010
LT06.10.2010
LV06.10.2010
NL06.10.2010
PL06.10.2010
RO06.10.2010
SE06.10.2010
SI06.10.2010
SK06.10.2010
BG06.01.2011
GR07.01.2011
IS06.02.2011
PT07.02.2011
CH31.05.2011
LI31.05.2011
MC31.05.2011
Former [2012/05]CZ06.10.2010
DK06.10.2010
EE06.10.2010
FI06.10.2010
IE06.10.2010
LT06.10.2010
LV06.10.2010
NL06.10.2010
PL06.10.2010
RO06.10.2010
SE06.10.2010
SI06.10.2010
SK06.10.2010
BG06.01.2011
GR07.01.2011
IS06.02.2011
PT07.02.2011
MC31.05.2011
Former [2011/38]CZ06.10.2010
DK06.10.2010
EE06.10.2010
FI06.10.2010
IE06.10.2010
LT06.10.2010
LV06.10.2010
NL06.10.2010
PL06.10.2010
RO06.10.2010
SE06.10.2010
SI06.10.2010
SK06.10.2010
BG06.01.2011
GR07.01.2011
IS06.02.2011
PT07.02.2011
Former [2011/36]CZ06.10.2010
DK06.10.2010
EE06.10.2010
FI06.10.2010
IE06.10.2010
LT06.10.2010
LV06.10.2010
NL06.10.2010
PL06.10.2010
SE06.10.2010
SI06.10.2010
SK06.10.2010
BG06.01.2011
GR07.01.2011
IS06.02.2011
PT07.02.2011
Former [2011/33]FI06.10.2010
IE06.10.2010
LT06.10.2010
LV06.10.2010
NL06.10.2010
SE06.10.2010
SI06.10.2010
BG06.01.2011
GR07.01.2011
IS06.02.2011
PT07.02.2011
Former [2011/30]FI06.10.2010
LT06.10.2010
LV06.10.2010
NL06.10.2010
SE06.10.2010
SI06.10.2010
BG06.01.2011
GR07.01.2011
IS06.02.2011
PT07.02.2011
Former [2011/23]FI06.10.2010
LT06.10.2010
LV06.10.2010
SI06.10.2010
IS06.02.2011
Former [2011/19]LT06.10.2010
SI06.10.2010
Former [2011/18]SI06.10.2010
Cited inInternational search[AD]US3291467
 [X]US3826607
 [A]FR1397357
 [AD]DE10332338
 [AD]DE10332339
 [A]DE19925276
 [A]WO03021029
 [A]US2004123487
 [A]US3325908
 [X]GB712008
 [A]DE1217327
 [A]US3285589
 [A]DE19633505
by applicant US3826607