blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability
Register Forum

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News flashes

New version of the European Patent Register - SPC information for Unitary Patents.

2024-03-06

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP2027340

EP2027340 - FLOOR PROVIDED WITH STRUCTURAL JOINT [Right-click to bookmark this link]
Former [2009/09]STRUCTURAL JOINT
[2015/16]
StatusPatent revoked
Status updated on  03.09.2021
Database last updated on 17.05.2024
FormerThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  16.11.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip03.09.2021Revocation of patentpublished on 06.10.2021  [2021/40]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Hengelhoef Concrete Joints NV
Hengelhoefstraat 158
Zone B1
3600 Genk / BE
[2018/50]
Former [2015/14]For all designated states
Hengelhoef Concrete Joints Manufacturing NV
Hengelhoefstraat 158
Industrieterrein Noord - Zone 1
3600 Genk / NL
Former [2009/09]For all designated states
Hengelhoef Concrete Joints NV
Hengelhoefstraat 162
3600 GENK / BE
Inventor(s)01 / MEUWISSEN, Dirk
Korenstraat 7
3600 Genk / BE
02 / ALEXANDRE, Etienne
Rue du Try 12
5021 Boninne / BE
 [2009/09]
Representative(s)Arnold & Siedsma
Bezuidenhoutseweg 57
2594 AC The Hague / NL
[N/P]
Former [2015/20]Laenen, Bart Roger Albert, et al
LC Patents
Crutzenstraat 24
3500 Hasselt / BE
Former [2011/24]Laenen, Bart Roger Albert, et al
LC Patents Crutzenstraat 24
3500 Hasselt / BE
Former [2009/09]Bleukx, Lucas Lodewijk M.
Bleukx Consultancy BVBA Derde Straat 7
3680 Maaseik / BE
Application number, filing date06754306.612.06.2006
[2009/09]
WO2006EP05618
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report
No.:WO2007144008
Date:21.12.2007
Language:EN
[2007/51]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2027340
Date:25.02.2009
Language:EN
The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 21.12.2007 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application.
[2009/09]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2027340
Date:13.05.2015
Language:EN
[2015/20]
Type: B8 Corrected title page of specification 
No.:EP2027340
Date:15.07.2015
[2015/29]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP21.12.2007
ClassificationIPC:E01C11/14, E01C11/08
[2009/09]
CPC:
E01C11/14 (EP); E01C11/08 (EP)
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   NL,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2015/20]
Former [2009/09]AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  NL,  PL,  PT,  RO,  SE,  SI,  SK,  TR 
Extension statesALNot yet paid
BANot yet paid
HRNot yet paid
MKNot yet paid
RSNot yet paid
TitleGerman:BODENBELAG MIT AUSDEHNUNGSFUGE[2015/16]
English:FLOOR PROVIDED WITH STRUCTURAL JOINT[2015/16]
French:SOL EN BETON AVEC JOINT STRUCTURAL[2015/16]
Former [2009/09]STRUKTURFUGE
Former [2009/09]STRUCTURAL JOINT
Former [2009/09]JOINT STRUCTURAL
Entry into regional phase10.12.2008National basic fee paid 
10.12.2008Designation fee(s) paid 
10.12.2008Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure10.12.2008Examination requested  [2009/09]
04.04.2009Observations by third parties
05.05.2011Observations by third parties
27.12.2011Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
16.04.2012Reply to a communication from the examining division
21.02.2013Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
10.06.2013Reply to a communication from the examining division
25.07.2013Observations by third parties
09.10.2013Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
09.04.2014Reply to a communication from the examining division
04.03.2015Date of oral proceedings
25.03.2015Communication of intention to grant the patent
25.03.2015Minutes of oral proceedings despatched
30.03.2015Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
31.03.2015Fee for grant paid
31.03.2015Fee for publishing/printing paid
Divisional application(s)EP15162038.2  / EP2930269
The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  27.12.2011
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  04.02.2016  30.03.2016  ADMISSIBLE
HSD Industriebeläge GmbH
Klosengartenstrasse 32
50374 Erftstadt / DE
Opponent's representative
btb IP Bungartz Baltzer Partnerschaft mbB Patentanwälte
Im Mediapark 6A
50670 Köln / DE
 02  11.02.2016  30.03.2016  ADMISSIBLE
Peikko Group Corporation
Voimakatu 3
15170 Lahti / FI
Opponent's representative
Boco IP Oy Ab
Kansakoulukatu 3
00100 Helsinki / FI
 [N/P]
Former [2020/21]
Opponent(s)01  04.02.2016  30.03.2016  ADMISSIBLE
HSD Industriebeläge GmbH
Klosengartenstrasse 32
50374 Erftstadt / DE
Opponent's representative
btb IP Bungartz Baltzer Partnerschaft mbB Patentanwälte
Im Mediapark 6A
50670 Köln / DE
 02  11.02.2016  30.03.2016  ADMISSIBLE
Peikko Group Corporation
Voimakatu 3
15170 Lahti / FI
Opponent's representative
Boco IP Oy Ab
Itämerenkatu 5
00180 Helsinki / FI
Former [2016/12]
Opponent(s)01  04.02.2016   
HSD Industriebeläge GmbH
Klosengartenstrasse 32
50374 Erftstadt / DE
Opponent's representative
Bungartz Christophersen Partnerschaft mbB Patentanwälte
Im Mediapark 6A
50670 Köln / DE
 02  11.02.2016    ADMISSIBLE
Peikko Group Corporation
Voimakatu 3
15170 Lahti / FI
Opponent's representative
Boco IP Oy Ab
Itämerenkatu 5
00180 Helsinki / FI
Former [2016/11]
Opponent(s)01  04.02.2016   
HSD Industriebeläge GmbH
Klosengartenstrasse 32
50374 Erftstadt / DE
Opponent's representative
Bungartz Christophersen Partnerschaft mbB Patentanwälte
Im Mediapark 6A
50670 Köln / DE
06.04.2016Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
17.10.2016Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
31.10.2017Date of oral proceedings
17.11.2017Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
17.11.2017Despatch of communication that the patent will be revoked
01.06.2021Legal effect of revocation of patent [2021/40]
Appeal following opposition16.01.2018Appeal received No.  T0179/18
16.03.2018Statement of grounds filed
01.06.2021Result of appeal procedure: appeal of the proprietor was rejected
12.08.2021Despatch of the decision of the Board of Appeal
01.06.2021Date of oral proceedings
Fees paidRenewal fee
10.12.2008Renewal fee patent year 03
16.06.2009Renewal fee patent year 04
29.06.2010Renewal fee patent year 05
09.06.2011Renewal fee patent year 06
05.06.2012Renewal fee patent year 07
05.06.2013Renewal fee patent year 08
04.06.2014Renewal fee patent year 09
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Lapses during opposition  TooltipCY13.05.2015
MC13.05.2015
IS13.09.2015
[2017/40]
Former [2016/13]MC13.05.2015
IS13.09.2015
Former [2015/51]IS13.09.2015
Cited inInternational search[XY]US6558071  (SPROULES JOSEPH [US]) [X] 1 * column 2, line 48 - column 3, line 40; figure - * [Y] 2-5;
 [Y]DE3533077  (CREMER ALFRED) [Y] 2-5 * the whole document *;
 [A]DE19525060  (NIJMEEGSE BETONINDUSTRIE DE HA [NL]) [A] 1-4 * figure - *;
 [A]DE3735687  (ENTWURFS & INGBUERO VEB [DD]) [A] 1-3,5 * the whole document *
ExaminationAT113488B
 US4332504
 JPH08239803
 BE1015453
by applicantBE1015453
otherJPH08239803
 US4332504
 AT113488B
OppositionBE1015453
 AT113488B
 DE1959941U
 US6558071
 DE3533077
 DE19525060
 DE3735687
 US4332504
 JPH08239803
 DE202005008762U
 DE602005001081T
 EP1598479
 FR2785632
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.