Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1901676

EP1901676 - METHOD AND MATERIAL KIT FOR THE PRODUCTION OF TOOTH REPLACEMENT PARTS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  01.02.2017
Database last updated on 10.12.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip25.07.2017Change: Appeal number 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Mühlbauer Technology GmbH
Elbgaustraße 248
22547 Hamburg / DE
[2013/41]
Former [2008/13]For all designated states
Ernst Mühlbauer GmbH & Co.KG
Koogstraat 4
25870 Norderfriedrichskoog / DE
Inventor(s)01 / DETJE, Bernd
Schleswiger Strasse 3
22761 Hamburg / DE
02 / HÖHNK, Hans-Dieter
Lessingstrasse 13
21465 Reinbek / DE
03 / MÜHLBAUER, Wolfgang, Carl, Friedrich
Kronprinzenstrasse 7
22609 Hamburg / DE
 [2008/13]
Representative(s)Glawe, Delfs, Moll
Partnerschaft mbB von
Patent- und Rechtsanwälten
Postfach 13 03 91
20103 Hamburg / DE
[N/P]
Former [2013/48]Glawe, Delfs, Moll
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte
Rothenbaumchaussee 58
20148 Hamburg / DE
Former [2009/26]Glawe, Delfs, Moll
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Rothenbaumchaussee 58
20148 Hamburg / DE
Former [2008/13]Glawe, Delfs, Moll
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte, Rothenbaumchaussee 58
20148 Hamburg / DE
Application number, filing date06754370.214.06.2006
[2008/13]
WO2006EP05736
Priority number, dateDE2005103204408.07.2005         Original published format: DE102005032044
[2008/13]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2007006386
Date:18.01.2007
Language:DE
[2007/03]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1901676
Date:26.03.2008
Language:DE
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 18.01.2007
[2008/13]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1901676
Date:27.11.2013
Language:DE
[2013/48]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP18.01.2007
ClassificationInternational:A61C13/20, A61C5/10
[2008/13]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   NL,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2008/13]
Extension statesRSNot yet paid
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN UND MATERIALSATZ ZUM HERSTELLEN VON ZAHNERSATZTEILEN[2008/13]
English:METHOD AND MATERIAL KIT FOR THE PRODUCTION OF TOOTH REPLACEMENT PARTS[2008/13]
French:PROCÉDÉ ET ENSEMBLE DE SUBSTANCES POUR LA FABRICATION DE PROTHÈSES DENTAIRES[2008/13]
Entry into regional phase04.12.2007National basic fee paid 
04.12.2007Designation fee(s) paid 
04.12.2007Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure31.10.2006Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
04.12.2007Examination requested  [2008/13]
28.06.2013Communication of intention to grant the patent
16.10.2013Fee for grant paid
16.10.2013Fee for publishing/printing paid
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  28.06.2013
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  27.08.2014  13.12.2016  WITHDRAWN
Dentsply DeTrey GmbH
De-Trey-Strasse 1
78467 Konstanz / DE
Opponent's representative
Blodig, Wolfgang
Wächtershäuser & Hartz
Patentanwaltspartnerschaft mbB
Weinstrasse 8
80333 München / DE
 [2017/03]
Former [2014/41]
Opponent(s)01  27.08.2014   
Dentsply DeTrey GmbH
De-Trey-Strasse 1
78467 Konstanz / DE
Opponent's representative
Blodig, Wolfgang
Wächtershäuser & Hartz
Patentanwaltspartnerschaft mbB
Weinstrasse 8
80333 München / DE
06.10.2014Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
16.04.2015Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
14.12.2016Date of oral proceedings
02.02.2017Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
02.02.2017Despatch of communication that the patent will be revoked
Appeal following opposition31.03.2017Appeal received No.  T1631/17
09.06.2017Statement of grounds filed
Fees paidRenewal fee
25.03.2008Renewal fee patent year 03
24.06.2009Renewal fee patent year 04
31.03.2010Renewal fee patent year 05
23.06.2011Renewal fee patent year 06
31.03.2012Renewal fee patent year 07
21.06.2013Renewal fee patent year 08
Lapses during opposition  TooltipHU14.06.2006
BG27.11.2013
CY27.11.2013
CZ27.11.2013
DK27.11.2013
EE27.11.2013
ES27.11.2013
FI27.11.2013
IT27.11.2013
LT27.11.2013
LV27.11.2013
MC27.11.2013
NL27.11.2013
PL27.11.2013
RO27.11.2013
SE27.11.2013
SI27.11.2013
SK27.11.2013
TR27.11.2013
GR28.02.2014
IS27.03.2014
PT27.03.2014
AT14.06.2014
IE14.06.2014
LU14.06.2014
BE30.06.2014
[2016/33]
Former [2016/32]HU14.06.2006
BG27.11.2013
CY27.11.2013
CZ27.11.2013
DK27.11.2013
EE27.11.2013
ES27.11.2013
FI27.11.2013
IT27.11.2013
LT27.11.2013
LV27.11.2013
MC27.11.2013
NL27.11.2013
PL27.11.2013
RO27.11.2013
SE27.11.2013
SI27.11.2013
SK27.11.2013
GR28.02.2014
IS27.03.2014
PT27.03.2014
AT14.06.2014
IE14.06.2014
LU14.06.2014
BE30.06.2014
Former [2016/28]BG27.11.2013
CY27.11.2013
CZ27.11.2013
DK27.11.2013
EE27.11.2013
ES27.11.2013
FI27.11.2013
IT27.11.2013
LT27.11.2013
LV27.11.2013
MC27.11.2013
NL27.11.2013
PL27.11.2013
RO27.11.2013
SE27.11.2013
SI27.11.2013
SK27.11.2013
GR28.02.2014
IS27.03.2014
PT27.03.2014
AT14.06.2014
IE14.06.2014
LU14.06.2014
Former [2016/25]BG27.11.2013
CY27.11.2013
CZ27.11.2013
DK27.11.2013
EE27.11.2013
ES27.11.2013
FI27.11.2013
IT27.11.2013
LT27.11.2013
LV27.11.2013
MC27.11.2013
NL27.11.2013
PL27.11.2013
RO27.11.2013
SE27.11.2013
SI27.11.2013
SK27.11.2013
IS27.03.2014
PT27.03.2014
AT14.06.2014
IE14.06.2014
LU14.06.2014
Former [2015/51]CY27.11.2013
CZ27.11.2013
DK27.11.2013
EE27.11.2013
ES27.11.2013
FI27.11.2013
IT27.11.2013
LT27.11.2013
LV27.11.2013
MC27.11.2013
NL27.11.2013
PL27.11.2013
RO27.11.2013
SE27.11.2013
SI27.11.2013
SK27.11.2013
IS27.03.2014
PT27.03.2014
AT14.06.2014
IE14.06.2014
LU14.06.2014
Former [2015/22]CY27.11.2013
CZ27.11.2013
DK27.11.2013
EE27.11.2013
ES27.11.2013
FI27.11.2013
IT27.11.2013
LT27.11.2013
LV27.11.2013
MC27.11.2013
NL27.11.2013
PL27.11.2013
RO27.11.2013
SE27.11.2013
SI27.11.2013
SK27.11.2013
IS27.03.2014
PT27.03.2014
IE14.06.2014
LU14.06.2014
Former [2015/21]CY27.11.2013
CZ27.11.2013
DK27.11.2013
EE27.11.2013
ES27.11.2013
FI27.11.2013
LT27.11.2013
LV27.11.2013
MC27.11.2013
NL27.11.2013
PL27.11.2013
RO27.11.2013
SE27.11.2013
SI27.11.2013
SK27.11.2013
IS27.03.2014
PT27.03.2014
IE14.06.2014
LU14.06.2014
Former [2015/14]CY27.11.2013
CZ27.11.2013
DK27.11.2013
EE27.11.2013
ES27.11.2013
FI27.11.2013
LT27.11.2013
LV27.11.2013
MC27.11.2013
NL27.11.2013
PL27.11.2013
RO27.11.2013
SE27.11.2013
SI27.11.2013
SK27.11.2013
IS27.03.2014
PT27.03.2014
LU14.06.2014
Former [2015/09]CY27.11.2013
CZ27.11.2013
DK27.11.2013
EE27.11.2013
ES27.11.2013
FI27.11.2013
LT27.11.2013
LV27.11.2013
MC27.11.2013
NL27.11.2013
PL27.11.2013
RO27.11.2013
SE27.11.2013
SK27.11.2013
IS27.03.2014
PT27.03.2014
LU14.06.2014
Former [2014/41]CY27.11.2013
CZ27.11.2013
DK27.11.2013
EE27.11.2013
ES27.11.2013
FI27.11.2013
LT27.11.2013
LV27.11.2013
NL27.11.2013
PL27.11.2013
RO27.11.2013
SE27.11.2013
SK27.11.2013
IS27.03.2014
PT27.03.2014
Former [2014/37]CY27.11.2013
CZ27.11.2013
EE27.11.2013
ES27.11.2013
FI27.11.2013
LT27.11.2013
LV27.11.2013
NL27.11.2013
PL27.11.2013
RO27.11.2013
SE27.11.2013
SK27.11.2013
IS27.03.2014
PT27.03.2014
Former [2014/36]CY27.11.2013
EE27.11.2013
ES27.11.2013
FI27.11.2013
LT27.11.2013
LV27.11.2013
NL27.11.2013
SE27.11.2013
IS27.03.2014
PT27.03.2014
Former [2014/28]CY27.11.2013
ES27.11.2013
FI27.11.2013
LT27.11.2013
LV27.11.2013
NL27.11.2013
SE27.11.2013
IS27.03.2014
PT27.03.2014
Former [2014/26]CY27.11.2013
ES27.11.2013
FI27.11.2013
LT27.11.2013
LV27.11.2013
NL27.11.2013
SE27.11.2013
IS27.03.2014
Former [2014/25]ES27.11.2013
FI27.11.2013
LT27.11.2013
LV27.11.2013
NL27.11.2013
SE27.11.2013
IS27.03.2014
Former [2014/24]ES27.11.2013
FI27.11.2013
LT27.11.2013
NL27.11.2013
SE27.11.2013
IS27.03.2014
Former [2014/23]FI27.11.2013
LT27.11.2013
NL27.11.2013
SE27.11.2013
IS27.03.2014
Former [2014/22]FI27.11.2013
LT27.11.2013
NL27.11.2013
SE27.11.2013
Former [2014/20]LT27.11.2013
Cited inInternational search[XA]WO9835630  (BISCO INC [US], et al) [X] 1,3-6 * page 8, line 15 - page 9, line 15 * * page 13, line 1 - page 15, line 19 * * page 15, line 20 - page 25, line 24 * [A] 7-10;
 [X]US5971760  (LETCHER WILLIAM F [US]) [X] 1,5,6 * column 2, line 15 - column 3, line 33 *;
 [A]DE2646364  (IPCO HOSPITAL SUPPLY) [A] * the whole document *;
 [AD]US5911580  (SHARP MICHAEL C [US], et al) [AD] * the whole document *
by applicantUS5911580