Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1929767

EP1929767 - DEVICE AND METHOD FOR VISUALLY RECORDING TWO-DIMENSIONAL OR THREE-DIMENSIONAL OBJECTS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusExamination is in progress
Status updated on  28.01.2011
Database last updated on 09.12.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip17.06.2019New entry: Renewal fee paid 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Modi Modular Digits GmbH
An der Höhe 20
51674 Wiehl / DE
[2018/46]
Former [2015/19]For all designated states
Modi Modular Digits GmbH
Vollmerhauser Str. 34
51645 Gummersbach / DE
Former [2008/24]For all designated states
Modi Modular Digits GmbH
Kapellenweg 21
51580 Reichshof / DE
Inventor(s)01 / KLAWUNDER, Dieter
Zimmerseiferweg 7
51580 Reichshof / DE
 [2008/24]
Representative(s)Rebbereh, Cornelia , et al
Kamper Strasse 1
51789 Lindlar / DE
[N/P]
Former [2008/24]Rebbereh, Cornelia , et al
Kölner Strasse 16
51789 Lindlar / DE
Application number, filing date06754562.426.06.2006
[2008/24]
WO2006EP06125
Priority number, dateDE2005102990125.06.2005         Original published format: DE102005029901
[2008/24]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A2  Application without search report
No.:WO2007000293
Date:04.01.2007
Language:DE
[2007/01]
Type: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1929767
Date:11.06.2008
Language:DE
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 04.01.2007
[2008/24]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP18.05.2007
ClassificationInternational:H04N5/225
[2008/24]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   NL,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2008/24]
Extension statesALNot yet paid
BANot yet paid
HRNot yet paid
MKNot yet paid
RSNot yet paid
TitleGerman:VORRICHTUNG UND VERFAHREN ZUM VISUELLEN ERFASSEN VON FLÄCHIGEN ODER RÄUMLICHEN OBJEKTEN[2008/24]
English:DEVICE AND METHOD FOR VISUALLY RECORDING TWO-DIMENSIONAL OR THREE-DIMENSIONAL OBJECTS[2008/24]
French:DISPOSITIF ET PROCEDE DE DETECTION VISUELLE D'OBJETS PLATS OU SPATIAUX[2008/24]
Entry into regional phase24.01.2008National basic fee paid 
24.01.2008Designation fee(s) paid 
24.01.2008Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure24.01.2008Examination requested  [2008/28]
05.09.2008Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
14.03.2009Reply to a communication from the examining division
15.07.2010Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
25.01.2011Reply to a communication from the examining division
09.12.2014Date of oral proceedings
22.12.2014Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination {1}
22.12.2014Minutes of oral proceedings despatched
Appeal following examination26.02.2015Appeal received No.  T1664/15
04.05.2015Statement of grounds filed
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  05.09.2008
Fees paidRenewal fee
20.06.2008Renewal fee patent year 03
30.06.2009Renewal fee patent year 04
29.06.2010Renewal fee patent year 05
30.06.2011Renewal fee patent year 06
31.03.2012Renewal fee patent year 07
20.06.2013Renewal fee patent year 08
13.06.2014Renewal fee patent year 09
30.06.2015Renewal fee patent year 10
30.06.2016Renewal fee patent year 11
30.06.2017Renewal fee patent year 12
07.06.2018Renewal fee patent year 13
13.06.2019Renewal fee patent year 14
Cited inInternational search[X]US4963962  (KRUEGLE HERMAN A [US] ET AL) [X] 1-23 * column 2, lines 2,12,28,38-57 * * column 2, line 68 - column 3, line 1 * * column 3, lines 4,18,37-41 * * column 3, line 64 - column 4, line 3 * * column 4, line 68 - column 5, line 1 * * column 5, lines 31,32,41-44,47-49,52-54,57-59 * * column 6, lines 35-37,41-50,53-57 * * column 8, lines 27-29 * * column 8, line 67 - column 9, line 24 *;
 [X]JPS63129473  (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD) [X] 1-23 * abstract *;
 [A]DE10146158  (VIF VIDEOTECHNIK FUER IND & FO [DE]) [A] 10,11 * figure 1 *