Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1879781

EP1879781 - STEERING MECHANISM, ESPECIALLY FOR A REAR WHEEL STEERING MECHANISM [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  09.10.2017
Database last updated on 09.12.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip16.10.2019Change: Date of oral proceedings 
16.10.2019Deletion: Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Continental Teves AG & Co. OHG
Guerickestr. 7
60488 Frankfurt am Main / DE
[2018/41]
Former [2010/52]For all designated states
Continental Teves AG & Co. oHG
Guerickestraße 7
60488 Frankfurt am Main / DE
Former [2008/04]For all designated states
Continental Teves AG & Co. oHG
Guerickestrasse 7
60488 Frankfurt am Main / DE
Inventor(s)01 / JUNGBECKER, Johann
Hauptstrasse 60
555761 Badenheim / DE
02 / LINKENBACH, Steffen
Lahnweg 14
65760 Eschborn / DE
03 / MUTH, Norman
Am Dornbusch 37
35066 Frankenberg / DE
 [2008/04]
Representative(s)Schlosser, Martin , et al
Patentanwalt
Hofleitenstraße 37
86356 Neusäß / DE
[N/P]
Application number, filing date06754924.628.04.2006
[2008/04]
WO2006EP61925
Priority number, dateDE2005102042202.05.2005         Original published format: DE102005020422
DE2005102039602.05.2005         Original published format: DE102005020396
DE2006102004126.04.2006         Original published format: DE102006020041
[2008/04]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2006117343
Date:09.11.2006
Language:DE
[2006/45]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1879781
Date:23.01.2008
Language:DE
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 09.11.2006
[2008/04]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1879781
Date:29.12.2010
Language:DE
[2010/52]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP09.11.2006
ClassificationInternational:B62D7/14
[2008/04]
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   HU,   IT [2008/32]
Former [2008/04]AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  NL,  PL,  PT,  RO,  SE,  SI,  SK,  TR 
Extension statesALNot yet paid
BANot yet paid
HRNot yet paid
MKNot yet paid
YUNot yet paid
TitleGerman:LENKVORRICHTUNG, INSBESONDERE FÜR EINE HINTERRADLENKUNG[2008/04]
English:STEERING MECHANISM, ESPECIALLY FOR A REAR WHEEL STEERING MECHANISM[2008/04]
French:DISPOSITIF DE DIRECTION, CONÇU EN PARTICULIER POUR UNE DIRECTION DE ROUE ARRIERE[2008/04]
Entry into regional phase03.12.2007National basic fee paid 
03.12.2007Designation fee(s) paid 
03.12.2007Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure03.12.2007Examination requested  [2008/04]
22.02.2008Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
02.09.2008Reply to a communication from the examining division
14.10.2008Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
07.04.2009Reply to a communication from the examining division
24.09.2010Communication of intention to grant the patent
19.11.2010Fee for grant paid
19.11.2010Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  29.09.2011  06.10.2011  ADMISSIBLE
ZF Friedrichshafen AG
88038 Friedrichshafen / DE
 [N/P]
Former [2011/45]
Opponent(s)01  29.09.2011  06.10.2011  ADMISSIBLE
ZF Friedrichshafen AG
88038 Friedrichshafen / DE
deletedDeletion: Legal effect of rejection of opposition [ N /P ]
08.11.2011Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
14.03.2012Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
18.08.2015Communication of observations of patent proprietor (Time limit: M06)
22.02.2016Reply of parties involved to observations of patent proprietor
27.09.2017Date of oral proceedings
10.10.2017Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
10.10.2017Date of despatch of rejection of opposition
Appeal following opposition13.12.2017Appeal received No.  T2690/17
07.02.2018Statement of grounds filed
12.02.2020Date of oral proceedings
Fees paidRenewal fee
02.05.2008Renewal fee patent year 03
04.05.2009Renewal fee patent year 04
03.05.2010Renewal fee patent year 05
Lapses during opposition  TooltipHU29.12.2010
[2013/45]
Cited inInternational search[XY]EP0340823  (ALFA LANCIA IND [IT]) [X] 1-6,10-12,18-20 * column 1, line 49 - column 7, line 30; figures 1-4; claims 1-6 * [Y] 7-9;
 [XY]EP0323815  (FIAT AUTO SPA [IT]) [X] 1-3,19,20 * column 1, line 4 - column 4, line 51; figure -; claim - * [Y] 7-9;
 [XY]JPS6280173  ;
 [XY]JPS58214470  ;
 [DA]US5292149  (LUGER MARTIN [DE]) [DA] 1-20 * column 1, line 39 - column 3, line 35 * * column 4, line 12 - column 5, line 51; figure -; claim - *;
 [A]DE10064585  (WOELK ADALBERT [DE]) [A] 1-20 * paragraphs [0002] - [0008]; figure -; claim - *;
 [A]DE3827039  (BAYERISCHE MOTOREN WERKE AG [DE]) [A] 1-20 * column 1, line 3 - column 2, line 27; figure -; claim - *
 [XY]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19870911), vol. 011, no. 281, Database accession no. (M - 624), & JP62080173 A 19870413 (MAZDA MOTOR CORP) [X] 1-3,19,20 * abstract * [Y] 7-9
 [XY]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19840327), vol. 008, no. 064, Database accession no. (M - 285), & JP58214470 A 19831213 (NISSAN JIDOSHA KK) [X] 1-3,19,20 * abstract * [Y] 7-9
by applicantDE4020547