Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1904683

EP1904683 - METHOD AND ARRANGEMENT FOR RAIL TRACK FIXING [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  17.12.2010
Database last updated on 13.11.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip19.10.2012Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): TR
published on 21.11.2012  [2012/47]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Balfour Beatty PLC
130 Wilton Road
London SW1V 1LQ / GB
[2008/14]
Inventor(s)01 / PENNY, Charles
Balfour Beatty Rail Technologies Midland House, Nelson Street
Derby DE1 2SA / GB
 [2008/14]
Representative(s)Ertl, Nicholas Justin
Elkington and Fife LLP
Prospect House
8 Pembroke Road
Sevenoaks
Kent TN13 1XR / GB
[N/P]
Former [2008/14]Ertl, Nicholas Justin
Elkington and Fife LLP, Prospect House, 8 Pembroke Road Sevenoaks
Kent TN13 1XR / GB
Application number, filing date06755626.626.06.2006
[2008/14]
WO2006GB02340
Priority number, dateGB2005001478619.07.2005         Original published format: GB 0514786
[2008/14]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2007010180
Date:25.01.2007
Language:EN
[2007/04]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1904683
Date:02.04.2008
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 25.01.2007
[2008/14]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1904683
Date:10.02.2010
Language:EN
[2010/06]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP25.01.2007
ClassificationInternational:E01B9/62
[2008/14]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   NL,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2008/14]
Extension statesRSNot yet paid
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN UND ANORDNUNG ZUR BEFESTIGUNG VON SCHIENEN[2008/14]
English:METHOD AND ARRANGEMENT FOR RAIL TRACK FIXING[2008/14]
French:PROCÉDÉ ET SYSTÈME POUR LA FIXATION DE VOIE FERRÉE[2008/14]
Entry into regional phase06.02.2008National basic fee paid 
06.02.2008Designation fee(s) paid 
06.02.2008Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure06.02.2008Examination requested  [2008/14]
27.10.2008Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
11.02.2009Reply to a communication from the examining division
14.08.2009Communication of intention to grant the patent
23.12.2009Fee for grant paid
23.12.2009Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)11.11.2010No opposition filed within time limit [2011/03]
Fees paidRenewal fee
06.02.2008Renewal fee patent year 03
16.06.2009Renewal fee patent year 04
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT10.02.2010
BE10.02.2010
CY10.02.2010
CZ10.02.2010
DK10.02.2010
EE10.02.2010
FI10.02.2010
IT10.02.2010
LT10.02.2010
LV10.02.2010
NL10.02.2010
PL10.02.2010
RO10.02.2010
SE10.02.2010
SI10.02.2010
SK10.02.2010
TR10.02.2010
BG10.05.2010
GR11.05.2010
ES21.05.2010
IS10.06.2010
PT11.06.2010
IE26.06.2010
LU26.06.2010
MC30.06.2010
HU11.08.2010
[2012/47]
Former [2012/43]AT10.02.2010
BE10.02.2010
CY10.02.2010
CZ10.02.2010
DK10.02.2010
EE10.02.2010
FI10.02.2010
IT10.02.2010
LT10.02.2010
LV10.02.2010
NL10.02.2010
PL10.02.2010
RO10.02.2010
SE10.02.2010
SI10.02.2010
SK10.02.2010
BG10.05.2010
GR11.05.2010
ES21.05.2010
IS10.06.2010
PT11.06.2010
IE26.06.2010
LU26.06.2010
MC30.06.2010
HU11.08.2010
Former [2012/42]AT10.02.2010
BE10.02.2010
CY10.02.2010
CZ10.02.2010
DK10.02.2010
EE10.02.2010
FI10.02.2010
IT10.02.2010
LT10.02.2010
LV10.02.2010
NL10.02.2010
PL10.02.2010
RO10.02.2010
SE10.02.2010
SI10.02.2010
SK10.02.2010
BG10.05.2010
GR11.05.2010
ES21.05.2010
IS10.06.2010
PT11.06.2010
IE26.06.2010
MC30.06.2010
HU11.08.2010
Former [2011/19]AT10.02.2010
BE10.02.2010
CY10.02.2010
CZ10.02.2010
DK10.02.2010
EE10.02.2010
FI10.02.2010
IT10.02.2010
LT10.02.2010
LV10.02.2010
NL10.02.2010
PL10.02.2010
RO10.02.2010
SE10.02.2010
SI10.02.2010
SK10.02.2010
BG10.05.2010
GR11.05.2010
ES21.05.2010
IS10.06.2010
PT11.06.2010
IE26.06.2010
MC30.06.2010
Former [2011/18]AT10.02.2010
BE10.02.2010
CY10.02.2010
CZ10.02.2010
DK10.02.2010
EE10.02.2010
FI10.02.2010
IT10.02.2010
LT10.02.2010
LV10.02.2010
NL10.02.2010
PL10.02.2010
RO10.02.2010
SE10.02.2010
SI10.02.2010
SK10.02.2010
BG10.05.2010
GR11.05.2010
ES21.05.2010
IS10.06.2010
PT11.06.2010
MC30.06.2010
Former [2011/09]AT10.02.2010
BE10.02.2010
CY10.02.2010
CZ10.02.2010
DK10.02.2010
EE10.02.2010
FI10.02.2010
LT10.02.2010
LV10.02.2010
NL10.02.2010
PL10.02.2010
RO10.02.2010
SE10.02.2010
SI10.02.2010
SK10.02.2010
BG10.05.2010
GR11.05.2010
ES21.05.2010
IS10.06.2010
PT11.06.2010
MC30.06.2010
Former [2011/04]AT10.02.2010
BE10.02.2010
CY10.02.2010
CZ10.02.2010
EE10.02.2010
FI10.02.2010
LT10.02.2010
LV10.02.2010
NL10.02.2010
PL10.02.2010
RO10.02.2010
SE10.02.2010
SI10.02.2010
SK10.02.2010
BG10.05.2010
GR11.05.2010
ES21.05.2010
IS10.06.2010
PT11.06.2010
Former [2010/45]AT10.02.2010
FI10.02.2010
LT10.02.2010
LV10.02.2010
NL10.02.2010
PL10.02.2010
SI10.02.2010
ES21.05.2010
IS10.06.2010
PT11.06.2010
Former [2010/41]AT10.02.2010
FI10.02.2010
LT10.02.2010
LV10.02.2010
PL10.02.2010
SI10.02.2010
ES21.05.2010
IS10.06.2010
PT11.06.2010
Former [2010/33]ES21.05.2010
Cited inInternational search[A]WO03012203
 [A]WO03018912
 [AD]WO9963160
 [A]DE8711451U
by applicant WO03012203
  WO03018912