Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1901529

EP1901529 - TELEPHONE AND TELEPHONE CALL ARRIVAL SIGNALING METHOD [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  02.01.2015
Database last updated on 23.01.2020
Most recent event   Tooltip02.01.2015No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 04.02.2015  [2015/06]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
NEC Corporation
7-1, Shiba 5-chome Minato-ku
Tokyo 108-8001 / JP
[2014/09]
Former [2008/12]For all designated states
NEC Corporation
7-1 Shiba 5-chome Minato-ku
Tokyo 108-8001 / JP
Inventor(s)01 / YOMODA, Miyuki, c/o NEC Saitama, Ltd.
300-18, Aza Toyohara, Oaza Motohara, Kamikawamachi
Kodama-gun, Saitama 367-0297 / JP
 [2013/40]
Former [2008/12]01 / YOMODA, Miyuki NEC Saitama, Ltd.
300-18, Aza Toyohara, Oaza Motohara, Kamikawamachi
Kodama-gun, Saitama 367-0297 / JP
Representative(s)Glawe, Delfs, Moll
Partnerschaft mbB von
Patent- und Rechtsanwälten
Postfach 26 01 62
80058 München / DE
[2014/09]
Former [2009/26]Glawe, Delfs, Moll
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Postfach 26 01 62
80058 München / DE
Former [2008/12]Glawe, Delfs, Moll
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Postfach 26 01 62
D-80058 München / DE
Application number, filing date06757078.806.06.2006
[2008/12]
WO2006JP311340
Priority number, dateJP2005019679405.07.2005         Original published format: JP 2005196794
[2008/12]
Filing languageJA
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2007004382
Date:11.01.2007
Language:JA
[2007/02]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1901529
Date:19.03.2008
Language:EN
[2008/12]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1901529
Date:26.02.2014
Language:EN
[2014/09]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:JP11.01.2007
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP13.07.2011
ClassificationInternational:H04M19/04, H04M1/57
[2013/30]
Former International [2011/33]H04M1/00, H04W4/00
Former International [2008/12]H04M1/00, H04Q7/38
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB,   IT [2008/31]
Former [2008/12]AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  NL,  PL,  PT,  RO,  SE,  SI,  SK,  TR 
Extension statesRSNot yet paid
TitleGerman:TELEFON UND TELEFONANRUF-ANKUNFTSSIGNALISIERUNGSVERFAHREN[2008/12]
English:TELEPHONE AND TELEPHONE CALL ARRIVAL SIGNALING METHOD[2008/12]
French:TÉLÉPHONE ET PROCÉDÉ DE SIGNALEMENT D'ARRIVÉE D'APPEL TÉLÉPHONIQUE[2008/12]
Entry into regional phase02.01.2008Translation filed 
02.01.2008National basic fee paid 
02.01.2008Search fee paid 
02.01.2008Designation fee(s) paid 
02.01.2008Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure02.01.2008Examination requested  [2008/12]
06.02.2008Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s)
13.03.2008Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, GR, HU, IE, IS, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR
25.01.2012Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
27.04.2012Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
24.10.2012Reply to a communication from the examining division
05.09.2013Communication of intention to grant the patent
03.01.2014Fee for grant paid
03.01.2014Fee for publishing/printing paid
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  27.04.2012
Opposition(s)27.11.2014No opposition filed within time limit [2015/06]
Fees paidRenewal fee
24.06.2008Renewal fee patent year 03
24.06.2009Renewal fee patent year 04
23.03.2010Renewal fee patent year 05
23.06.2011Renewal fee patent year 06
31.03.2012Renewal fee patent year 07
21.06.2013Renewal fee patent year 08
Documents cited:Search[X]EP0869461  (CASIO COMPUTER CO LTD [JP]) [X] 1-12 * column 1, line 6 - line 14 * * column 3, line 32 - line 38 * * column 20, line 21 - line 55; figures 10,15a,15b,15c,15d *;
 [X]JPH11112624  (TOSHIBA CORP) [X] 1-12 * abstract * * paragraphs [0008] , [0009] , [0023] , [0032] - [0040] *;
 [A]US2002086712  (BAE JONG-CHEOL [KR] ET AL BAE JONG-CHEOL [GB] ET AL) [A] 1-12 * paragraph [0014] - paragraph [0020] *;
 [A]EP1505814  (MICROSOFT CORP [US]) [A] 1-12 * paragraphs [0038] , [0048] , [0052] *