blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

Deep link introduced in Malta Register

Click here for more information on the deep linking.

2019.01.28

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

All documents: EP1889311 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP1889311



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 212
14.03.2011 Communication regarding the expiry of opposition period Search / examination 1
09.04.2010 Decision to grant a European patent Search / examination 2
15.03.2010 Filing of the translations of the claims Search / examination 1
15.03.2010 French translation of claims Search / examination 5
15.03.2010 German translation of the claims Search / examination 5
25.11.2009 Bibliographic data of the European patent application Search / examination 3
25.11.2009 Communication about intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 4
25.11.2009 Intention to grant (signatures) Search / examination 1
25.11.2009 Text intended for grant Search / examination 33
16.09.2009 Claims Search / examination 4
16.09.2009 Description Search / examination 6
16.09.2009 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 8
19.05.2009 Annex to the communication Search / examination 5
19.05.2009 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
22.04.2009 Maintenance of the application Search / examination 1
12.02.2009 Invitation to declare maintenance of the application and to correct deficiencies in the Written Opinion/amend application Search / examination 1
26.01.2009 Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report Search / examination 1
26.01.2009 European search opinion Search / examination 5
26.01.2009 Supplementary European search report Search / examination 2
23.01.2008 Notification on forthcoming publication of bibliographic data Search / examination 1
14.01.2008 Communication regarding possible amendment of claims/payment of claims fees Search / examination 2
04.01.2008 Confirmation of receipt of (electronically) transmitted priority document Search / examination 1
20.11.2007 Copy of the international preliminary report on patentability Search / examination 4
16.11.2007 Annex Search / examination 36
16.11.2007 Request for entry into the European phase Search / examination 7
31.08.2007 Information on entry into European phase Search / examination 3
14.11.2006 Priority document (electronically transmitted) Search / examination 33
26.10.2006 Copy of the international search report Search / examination 2
26.10.2006 International publication of the A1 Pamphlet Search / examination 34