blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

Deep link introduced in Malta Register

Click here for more information on the deep linking.

2019.01.28

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

Event history: EP1889311


Date  Description European Patent Bulletin date, issue number
11.03.2011 No opposition filed within time limit published on  13.04.2011  [2011/15]
02.04.2010 (Expected) grant published on  05.05.2010  [2010/18]
26.03.2010 New entry: Renewal fee paid
23.03.2010 New entry: Payment of fee for grant
23.03.2010 New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing
12.11.2009 New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent
26.09.2009 New entry: Reply to examination report
15.05.2009 New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit
15.05.2009 First examination report
04.05.2009 New entry: Renewal fee paid
23.01.2009 Supplementary search report published on  25.02.2009  [2009/09]
20.06.2008 Change - designated states published on  23.07.2008  [2008/30]
20.06.2008 Change - extension states published on  23.07.2008  [2008/30]
08.04.2008 New entry: Renewal fee paid
18.01.2008 Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin published on  20.02.2008  [2008/08]
18.01.2008 Request for examination filed published on  20.02.2008  [2008/08]
16.01.2008 PCT data prior to European publication
29.12.2007 PCT data prior to European publication
27.11.2007 PCT data prior to European publication
10.11.2006 PCT data prior to European publication
02.11.2006 PCT data prior to European publication
19.08.2006 PCT data prior to European publication