blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

Deep link introduced in Malta Register

Click here for more information on the deep linking.

2019.01.28

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

Patent family: EP1889311
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
JP5148477BGlobal Dossier 20.02.2013B2
JP2008537293 11.09.2008A
Priority number Date
KR20050032433 19.04.2005
WO2006KR01451 19.04.2006
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
EP1889311Global Dossier 05.05.2010B1
EP1889311 25.02.2009A4
EP1889311 20.02.2008A1
Priority number Date
KR20050032433 19.04.2005
WO2006KR01451 19.04.2006
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
DE602006014138D 17.06.2010D1
Priority number Date
KR20050032433 19.04.2005
WO2006KR01451 19.04.2006
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
WO2006112658Global Dossier 26.10.2006A1
Priority number Date
KR20050032433 19.04.2005
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
US7910240Global Dossier 22.03.2011B2
US2006246354 02.11.2006A1
Priority number Date
KR20050032433 19.04.2005
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
KR100742957BGlobal Dossier 25.07.2007B1
KR20060110235 24.10.2006A
Priority number Date
KR20050032433 19.04.2005
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
CN100561776C 18.11.2009C
CN101164184 16.04.2008A
Priority number Date
KR20050032433 19.04.2005
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
RU2358358 10.06.2009C1
Priority number Date
KR20050032433 19.04.2005
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
TWI317752B 01.12.2009B
TW200702405 16.01.2007A
Priority number Date
KR20050032433 19.04.2005