blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

Deep link introduced in Malta Register

Click here for more information on the deep linking.

2019.01.28

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

Legal status: EP1889311

Designated contracting states DE 
 FI 
 FR 
 GB 
 SE 
Examination procedure15.03.2010Fee for publishing/printing paid
Entry into regional phase16.11.2007National basic fee paid 
16.11.2007Search fee paid 
16.11.2007Designation fee(s) paid 
16.11.2007Examination fee paid 
Fees paidRenewal fee
27.03.2008Renewal fee patent year 03
24.04.2009Renewal fee patent year 04
23.03.2010Renewal fee patent year 05
European patent granted05.05.2010
Opposition procedure08.02.2011No opposition filed within time limit published on 06.04.2011 
INPADOC data   TooltipThe EPO does not accept any responsibility for the accuracy of legal status data relating to the post-grant phase, including but not limited to their completeness and fitness for specific purposes, nor can it guarantee that such data are up to date. For authoritative information, please refer to the relevant national patent authority.
Event date:20.02.2008 
Event description:REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED
Effective DATE:20071116
 
Event date:20.02.2008 
Event description:DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES
Kind Code of Ref Document:A1
Designated State(s):DE FI FR GB SE
 
Event date:23.07.2008 
Event description:DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTED)
Designated State(s):DE FI FR GB SE
 
Event date:23.07.2008 
Event description:REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT (TO ANY COUNTRY) (DELETED)
 
Event date:25.02.2009 
Event description:SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT DRAWN UP AND DESPATCHED
Effective DATE:20090126
 
Event date:17.06.2009 
Event description:FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT DESPATCHED
Effective DATE:20090519
 
Event date:05.05.2010 
Event description:DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES
Kind Code of Ref Document:B1
Designated State(s):DE FI FR GB SE
 
Event date:05.05.2010 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG GB FG4D
Code Expl.:+EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED
 
Event date:17.06.2010 
Event description:CORRESPONDS TO:
Ref Document Number:602006014138
Country of Ref Document:DE
DATE OF REF DOCUMENT:20100617
Kind Code of Ref Document:P
 
Event date:29.06.2010 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG SE TRGR
Code Expl.:+TRANSLATION OF GRANTED EP PATENT
 
Event date:13.04.2011 
Event description:NO OPPOSITION FILED
Effective DATE:20110208
 
Event date:26.05.2011 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG DE R097 602006014138 DE
Code Expl.:+NO OPPOSITION FILED AGAINST GRANTED PATENT, OR EPO OPPOSITION PROCEEDINGS CONCLUDED WITHOUT DECISION
Effective DATE:20110207
 
Event date:24.03.2016 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG FR PLFP
Code Expl.:+FEE PAYMENT
Year of Fee Payment:11
 
Event date:23.03.2017 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG FR PLFP
Code Expl.:+FEE PAYMENT
Year of Fee Payment:12
 
Event date:22.03.2018 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG FR PLFP
Code Expl.:+FEE PAYMENT
Year of Fee Payment:13
 
Event date:30.04.2019 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:GB
Payment DATE:20190321
Year of Fee Payment:14
 
Event date:30.04.2019 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:FI
Payment DATE:20190320
Year of Fee Payment:14
 
Event date:30.04.2019 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:FR
Payment DATE:20190326
Year of Fee Payment:14
 
Event date:31.05.2019 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:SE
Payment DATE:20190321
Year of Fee Payment:14
 
Event date:31.07.2019 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:DE
Payment DATE:20190320
Year of Fee Payment:14