Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1889311

EP1889311 - SAFETY-IMPROVED ELECTRODE BY INTRODUCING CROSSLINKABLE POLYMER AND ELECTROCHEMICAL DEVICE COMPRISING THE SAME [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  11.03.2011
Database last updated on 23.09.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip11.03.2011No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 13.04.2011  [2011/15]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
LG Chem, Ltd.
20, Yoido-dong
Youngdungpo-gu, Seoul 150-721 / KR
For all designated states
KOREA RESEARCH INSTITUTE OF CHEMICAL TECHNOLOGY
No. 100, Jang-dong, Yuseong-gu
Daejeon 305-343 / KR
[N/P]
Former [2008/08]For all designated states
LG Chem, Ltd.
20, Yoido-dong
Youngdungpo-gu, Seoul 150-721 / KR
For all designated states
KOREA RESEARCH INSTITUTE OF CHEMICAL TECHNOLOGY
100, Jang-dong, Yuseong-gu
Daejeon 305-343 / KR
Inventor(s)01 / LEE, Sang-Young, 103-904, Expo Apartment
Jeonmin-dong, Yuseong-gu
Daejeon 305-761 / KR
02 / KIM, Seok-Koo
317-8, Jangdae-dong Yuseong-gu
Daejeon 305-308 / KR
03 / SUK, Jung-Don, LG Chem Research Park
Patent Management Team 104-1, Munji-dong
Yuseong-gu Daejeon 305-380 / KR
04 / YONG, Hyun-Hang LG Chem Research Park
Patent Management Team 104-1, Muji-dong
Yuseong-gu Daejeon 305-380 / KR
05 / HONG, Jang-Hyuk, 105-606, Gukhwa Apartment
991 Samcheon-dong, Seo-gu
Daejeon 302-782 / KR
06 / AHN, Soon-Ho
108-502, Daelim Dure Apt. Shinsung-dong
Yuseong-gu Daejeon 305-720 / KR
07 / KANG, Yong-Ku
109-701, Hanwool Apt. Shinsung-dong
Yuseong-gu Daejeon 305-345 / KR
08 / LEE, Chang-Jin
501-1103, Expo Apt. Jeonmin-dong
Yuseong-gu Daejeon 305-761 / KR
 [2008/08]
Representative(s)Hoffmann Eitle
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB
Arabellastrasse 30
81925 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2008/08]HOFFMANN EITLE
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Arabellastrasse 4
81925 München / DE
Application number, filing date06757502.719.04.2006
[2008/08]
WO2006KR01451
Priority number, dateKR2005003243319.04.2005         Original published format: KR 20050032433
[2008/08]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2006112658
Date:26.10.2006
Language:EN
[2006/43]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1889311
Date:20.02.2008
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 26.10.2006
[2008/08]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1889311
Date:05.05.2010
Language:EN
[2010/18]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:KR26.10.2006
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP26.01.2009
ClassificationInternational:H01M4/02
[2008/08]
Designated contracting statesDE,   FI,   FR,   GB,   SE [2008/30]
Former [2008/08]AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  NL,  PL,  PT,  RO,  SE,  SI,  SK,  TR 
Extension statesALNot yet paid
BANot yet paid
HRNot yet paid
MKNot yet paid
YUNot yet paid
TitleGerman:SICHERHEITSVERBESSERTE ELEKTRODE DURCH EINFÜHRUNG VON VERNETZBAREM POLYMER UND ELEKTROCHEMISCHE EINRICHTUNG DAMIT[2008/08]
English:SAFETY-IMPROVED ELECTRODE BY INTRODUCING CROSSLINKABLE POLYMER AND ELECTROCHEMICAL DEVICE COMPRISING THE SAME[2008/08]
French:ELECTRODE A SECURITE AMELIOREE OBTENUE PAR INTEGRATION D'UN POLYMERE RETICULABLE, ET DISPOSITIF ELECTROCHIMIQUE COMPRENANT L'ELECTRODE[2008/08]
Entry into regional phase16.11.2007National basic fee paid 
16.11.2007Search fee paid 
16.11.2007Designation fee(s) paid 
16.11.2007Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure16.11.2007Examination requested  [2008/08]
19.05.2009Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
16.09.2009Reply to a communication from the examining division
25.11.2009Communication of intention to grant the patent
15.03.2010Fee for grant paid
15.03.2010Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)08.02.2011No opposition filed within time limit [2011/15]
Fees paidRenewal fee
27.03.2008Renewal fee patent year 03
24.04.2009Renewal fee patent year 04
23.03.2010Renewal fee patent year 05
Documents cited:Search[PLX]WO2005045957  (LG CHEMICAL LTD [KR]; YONG HYUN-HANG [KR]; LEE SANG-YOUNG [KR]; KIM SE) [PLX] 1-3,5-13 * the whole document *;
 [X]US2005008938  (CHO CHUNG-KUN [KR] ET AL) [X] 1-13 * paragraphs [0011] - [0013] - [0038] - [0040] *;
 [X]US5643665  (SAIDI EILEEN S [US]) [X] 1-3,5-10 * column 3, line 4 - line 60 * * column 4, line 19 - line 32 * * column 5, line 19 - column 6, line 19 * * column 7, line 11 - line 62 *
International search[X]KR20020057571  (SAMSUNG SDI CO LTD [KR]);
 [X]KR20020057570  (SAMSUNG SDI CO LTD [KR]);
 [A]KR20010100242  (SAMSUNG SDI CO LTD [KR])
by applicantWO2005045957
 US2005008938
 US5643665