EP1869508 - OPTICAL BODIES INCLUDING ROUGH STRIPPABLE BOUNDARY LAYERS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 20.07.2012 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.07.2014 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 20.08.2014 [2014/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states 3M Innovative Properties Company 3M Center P.O. Box 33427 St. Paul, MN 55133-3427 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2008/31] | For all designated states 3M Innovative Properties Company 3M Center P.O.Box 33427 St. Paul MN 55133-3427 / US | ||
Former [2007/52] | For all designated states 3M Innovative Properties Company 3M Center, Post Office Box 33427 Saint Paul, MN 55133-3427 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
STOVER, Carl A. 3M Center Post Office Box 33427 Saint Paul, Minnesota 55133-3427 / US | 02 /
HEBRINK, Timothy J. 3M Center Post Office Box 33427 Saint Paul, Minnesota 55133-3427 / US | 03 /
DENKER, Martin E. 3M Center Post Office Box 33427 Saint Paul, Minnesota 55133-3427 / US | 04 /
JACKSON, Jeffery N. 3M Center Post Office Box 33427 Saint Paul, Minnesota 55133-3427 / US | 05 /
DERKS, Kristopher J. 3M Center Post Office Box 33427 Saint Paul, Minnesota 55133-3427 / US | 06 /
WEBER, Michael F. 3M Center Post Office Box 33427 Saint Paul, Minnesota 55133-3427 / US | 07 /
KOBILANSKY, Anna A. 3M Center Post Office Box 33427 Saint Paul, Minnesota 55133-3427 / US | 08 /
STROBEL, Joan M. 3M Center Post Office Box 33427 Saint Paul, Minnesota 55133-3427 / US | 09 /
ROSELL, Barry S. 3M Center Post Office Box 33427 Saint Paul, Minnesota 55133-3427 / US | 10 /
PURCELL, John P. 3M Center Post Office Box 33427 Saint Paul, Minnesota 55133-3427 / US | 11 /
HAMER, Kevin M. 3M Center Post Office Box 33427 Saint Paul, Minnesota 55133-3427 / US | 12 /
TAYLOR, Robert D. 3M Center Post Office Box 33427 Saint Paul, Minnesota 55133-3427 / US | 13 /
BLACK, William B. 3M Center Post Office Box 33427 Saint Paul, Minnesota 55133-3427 / US | 14 /
THOMPSON, Richard J. 3M Center Post Office Box 33427 Saint Paul, Minnesota 55133-3427 / US | 15 /
BLUEM, Gregory L. 3M Center Post Office Box 33427 Saint Paul, Minnesota 55133-3427 / US | [2011/37] |
Former [2007/52] | 01 /
STOVER, Carl A. 3M Center Post Office Box 33427 Saint Paul, Minnesota 55133-3427 / US | ||
02 /
HEBRINK, Timothy J. 3M Center Post Office Box 33427 Saint Paul, Minnesota 55133-3427 / US | |||
03 /
DENKER, Martin E. 3M Center Post Office Box 33427 Saint Paul, Minnesota 55133-3427 / US | |||
04 /
JACKSON, Jeffery N. 3M Center Post Office Box 33427 Saint Paul, Minnesota 55133-3427 / US | |||
05 /
DERKS, Kristopher J. 3M Center Post Office Box 33427 Saint Paul, Minnesota 55133-3427 / US | |||
06 /
WEBER, Michael F. 3M Center Post Office Box 33427 Saint Paul, Minnesota 55133-3427 / US | |||
07 /
KOBILANSKY, Anna A. 3M Center Post Office Box 33427 Saint Paul, Minnesota 55133-3427 / US | |||
08 /
STROBEL, Joan M. 3M Center Post Office Box 33427 Saint Paul, Minnesota 55133-3427 / US | |||
09 /
ROSELL, Barry S. 3M Center Post Office Box 33427 Saint Paul, Minnesota 55133-3427 / US | |||
10 /
PURCELL, John P. 3M Center Post Office Box 33427 Saint Paul, Minnesota 55133-3427 / US | |||
11 /
HAMER, Kevin M. 3M Center Post Office Box 33427 Saint Paul, Minnesota 55133-3427 / US | |||
12 /
TAYLOR, Robert D. 3M Center Post Office Box 33427 Saint Paul, Minnesota 55133-3427 / US | |||
13 /
BLACK, William B. 3M Center Post Office Box 33427 Saint Paul, Minnesota 55133-3427 / US | |||
14 /
THOMPSON, Richard J. 3M Center Post Office Box 33427 Saint Paul, Minnesota 55133-3427 / US | |||
15 /
BLUEM, Gregory L. 3M Center Post Office Box 33427 Saint Paul, Minnesota 55133-3427 / US | Representative(s) | Voortmans, Gilbert J.L. 3M Belgium B.V.B.A./S.P.R.L. Hermeslaan 7 1831 Diegem / BE | [N/P] |
Former [2011/37] | Voortmans, Gilbert J.L. 3M Europe S.A./N.V. Office of Intellectual Property Counsel Hermeslaan 7 1831 Diegem / BE | ||
Former [2009/50] | Voortmans, Gilbert J.L. 3M Europe S.A./N.V. OIPC Hermeslaan 7 1831 Diegem / BE | ||
Former [2007/52] | Voortmans, Gilbert J.L. 3M Europe s.a./n.v. Hermeslaan 7 1831 Diegem / BE | Application number, filing date | 06758267.6 | 05.04.2006 | [2007/52] | WO2006US12506 | Priority number, date | US20050100191 | 06.04.2005 Original published format: US 100191 | [2007/52] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2006110400 | Date: | 19.10.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/42] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1869508 | Date: | 26.12.2007 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 19.10.2006 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2007/52] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1869508 | Date: | 14.09.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/37] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 01.03.2007 | Classification | IPC: | G02B1/04 | [2007/52] | CPC: |
G02B1/04 (EP,KR,US);
B32B27/32 (US);
G02B1/00 (KR);
Y10T428/24372 (EP,US);
Y10T428/25 (EP,US);
Y10T428/31507 (EP,US);
Y10T428/31739 (EP,US);
Y10T428/31786 (EP,US);
Y10T428/31935 (EP,US);
Y10T428/31938 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2007/52] | Title | German: | OPTISCHE KÖRPER MIT RAUEN ABLÖSBAREN GRENZSCHICHTEN | [2007/52] | English: | OPTICAL BODIES INCLUDING ROUGH STRIPPABLE BOUNDARY LAYERS | [2007/52] | French: | CORPS OPTIQUES COMPRENANT DES COUCHES RUGUEUSES A BORDS SUSPCEPTIBLES DE FORMER DES BANDES | [2011/36] |
Former [2007/52] | CORPS OPTIQUES COMPRENANT DES COUCHES RUGUEUSES A BORDS SUSPCEPTIBLE DE FORMER DES BANDES | Entry into regional phase | 31.10.2007 | National basic fee paid | 31.10.2007 | Designation fee(s) paid | 31.10.2007 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 31.10.2007 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 31.10.2007 | Examination requested [2007/52] | 11.03.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 06.09.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.03.2011 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 22.07.2011 | Fee for grant paid | 22.07.2011 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | EP11175024.6 / EP2381277 | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 11.03.2010 | Opposition(s) | 15.06.2012 | No opposition filed within time limit [2012/34] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.04.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.04.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 12.04.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 05.04.2006 | AT | 14.09.2011 | BE | 14.09.2011 | CY | 14.09.2011 | CZ | 14.09.2011 | DK | 14.09.2011 | EE | 14.09.2011 | FI | 14.09.2011 | IT | 14.09.2011 | LT | 14.09.2011 | LV | 14.09.2011 | NL | 14.09.2011 | PL | 14.09.2011 | RO | 14.09.2011 | SE | 14.09.2011 | SI | 14.09.2011 | SK | 14.09.2011 | TR | 14.09.2011 | BG | 14.12.2011 | GR | 15.12.2011 | ES | 25.12.2011 | IS | 14.01.2012 | PT | 16.01.2012 | IE | 05.04.2012 | CH | 30.04.2012 | FR | 30.04.2012 | LI | 30.04.2012 | MC | 30.04.2012 | [2014/34] |
Former [2014/21] | AT | 14.09.2011 | |
BE | 14.09.2011 | ||
CY | 14.09.2011 | ||
CZ | 14.09.2011 | ||
DK | 14.09.2011 | ||
EE | 14.09.2011 | ||
FI | 14.09.2011 | ||
IT | 14.09.2011 | ||
LT | 14.09.2011 | ||
LV | 14.09.2011 | ||
NL | 14.09.2011 | ||
PL | 14.09.2011 | ||
RO | 14.09.2011 | ||
SE | 14.09.2011 | ||
SI | 14.09.2011 | ||
SK | 14.09.2011 | ||
TR | 14.09.2011 | ||
BG | 14.12.2011 | ||
GR | 15.12.2011 | ||
ES | 25.12.2011 | ||
IS | 14.01.2012 | ||
PT | 16.01.2012 | ||
IE | 05.04.2012 | ||
CH | 30.04.2012 | ||
FR | 30.04.2012 | ||
LI | 30.04.2012 | ||
MC | 30.04.2012 | ||
Former [2013/29] | AT | 14.09.2011 | |
BE | 14.09.2011 | ||
CY | 14.09.2011 | ||
CZ | 14.09.2011 | ||
DK | 14.09.2011 | ||
EE | 14.09.2011 | ||
FI | 14.09.2011 | ||
IT | 14.09.2011 | ||
LT | 14.09.2011 | ||
LV | 14.09.2011 | ||
NL | 14.09.2011 | ||
PL | 14.09.2011 | ||
RO | 14.09.2011 | ||
SE | 14.09.2011 | ||
SI | 14.09.2011 | ||
SK | 14.09.2011 | ||
BG | 14.12.2011 | ||
GR | 15.12.2011 | ||
ES | 25.12.2011 | ||
IS | 14.01.2012 | ||
PT | 16.01.2012 | ||
IE | 05.04.2012 | ||
CH | 30.04.2012 | ||
FR | 30.04.2012 | ||
LI | 30.04.2012 | ||
MC | 30.04.2012 | ||
Former [2013/22] | AT | 14.09.2011 | |
BE | 14.09.2011 | ||
CY | 14.09.2011 | ||
CZ | 14.09.2011 | ||
DK | 14.09.2011 | ||
EE | 14.09.2011 | ||
FI | 14.09.2011 | ||
IT | 14.09.2011 | ||
LT | 14.09.2011 | ||
LV | 14.09.2011 | ||
NL | 14.09.2011 | ||
PL | 14.09.2011 | ||
RO | 14.09.2011 | ||
SE | 14.09.2011 | ||
SI | 14.09.2011 | ||
SK | 14.09.2011 | ||
GR | 15.12.2011 | ||
ES | 25.12.2011 | ||
IS | 14.01.2012 | ||
PT | 16.01.2012 | ||
IE | 05.04.2012 | ||
CH | 30.04.2012 | ||
FR | 30.04.2012 | ||
LI | 30.04.2012 | ||
MC | 30.04.2012 | ||
Former [2013/13] | AT | 14.09.2011 | |
BE | 14.09.2011 | ||
CY | 14.09.2011 | ||
CZ | 14.09.2011 | ||
DK | 14.09.2011 | ||
EE | 14.09.2011 | ||
FI | 14.09.2011 | ||
IT | 14.09.2011 | ||
LT | 14.09.2011 | ||
LV | 14.09.2011 | ||
NL | 14.09.2011 | ||
PL | 14.09.2011 | ||
RO | 14.09.2011 | ||
SE | 14.09.2011 | ||
SI | 14.09.2011 | ||
SK | 14.09.2011 | ||
GR | 15.12.2011 | ||
IS | 14.01.2012 | ||
PT | 16.01.2012 | ||
IE | 05.04.2012 | ||
CH | 30.04.2012 | ||
FR | 30.04.2012 | ||
LI | 30.04.2012 | ||
MC | 30.04.2012 | ||
Former [2013/08] | AT | 14.09.2011 | |
BE | 14.09.2011 | ||
CY | 14.09.2011 | ||
CZ | 14.09.2011 | ||
DK | 14.09.2011 | ||
EE | 14.09.2011 | ||
FI | 14.09.2011 | ||
IT | 14.09.2011 | ||
LT | 14.09.2011 | ||
LV | 14.09.2011 | ||
NL | 14.09.2011 | ||
PL | 14.09.2011 | ||
RO | 14.09.2011 | ||
SE | 14.09.2011 | ||
SI | 14.09.2011 | ||
SK | 14.09.2011 | ||
GR | 15.12.2011 | ||
IS | 14.01.2012 | ||
PT | 16.01.2012 | ||
IE | 05.04.2012 | ||
CH | 30.04.2012 | ||
LI | 30.04.2012 | ||
MC | 30.04.2012 | ||
Former [2013/07] | AT | 14.09.2011 | |
BE | 14.09.2011 | ||
CY | 14.09.2011 | ||
CZ | 14.09.2011 | ||
DK | 14.09.2011 | ||
EE | 14.09.2011 | ||
FI | 14.09.2011 | ||
IT | 14.09.2011 | ||
LT | 14.09.2011 | ||
LV | 14.09.2011 | ||
NL | 14.09.2011 | ||
PL | 14.09.2011 | ||
RO | 14.09.2011 | ||
SE | 14.09.2011 | ||
SI | 14.09.2011 | ||
SK | 14.09.2011 | ||
GR | 15.12.2011 | ||
IS | 14.01.2012 | ||
PT | 16.01.2012 | ||
CH | 30.04.2012 | ||
LI | 30.04.2012 | ||
MC | 30.04.2012 | ||
Former [2012/50] | AT | 14.09.2011 | |
BE | 14.09.2011 | ||
CY | 14.09.2011 | ||
CZ | 14.09.2011 | ||
DK | 14.09.2011 | ||
EE | 14.09.2011 | ||
FI | 14.09.2011 | ||
IT | 14.09.2011 | ||
LT | 14.09.2011 | ||
LV | 14.09.2011 | ||
NL | 14.09.2011 | ||
PL | 14.09.2011 | ||
RO | 14.09.2011 | ||
SE | 14.09.2011 | ||
SI | 14.09.2011 | ||
SK | 14.09.2011 | ||
GR | 15.12.2011 | ||
IS | 14.01.2012 | ||
PT | 16.01.2012 | ||
MC | 30.04.2012 | ||
Former [2012/35] | AT | 14.09.2011 | |
BE | 14.09.2011 | ||
CY | 14.09.2011 | ||
CZ | 14.09.2011 | ||
DK | 14.09.2011 | ||
EE | 14.09.2011 | ||
FI | 14.09.2011 | ||
IT | 14.09.2011 | ||
LT | 14.09.2011 | ||
LV | 14.09.2011 | ||
NL | 14.09.2011 | ||
PL | 14.09.2011 | ||
RO | 14.09.2011 | ||
SE | 14.09.2011 | ||
SI | 14.09.2011 | ||
SK | 14.09.2011 | ||
GR | 15.12.2011 | ||
IS | 14.01.2012 | ||
PT | 16.01.2012 | ||
Former [2012/26] | AT | 14.09.2011 | |
BE | 14.09.2011 | ||
CY | 14.09.2011 | ||
CZ | 14.09.2011 | ||
EE | 14.09.2011 | ||
FI | 14.09.2011 | ||
IT | 14.09.2011 | ||
LT | 14.09.2011 | ||
LV | 14.09.2011 | ||
NL | 14.09.2011 | ||
PL | 14.09.2011 | ||
RO | 14.09.2011 | ||
SE | 14.09.2011 | ||
SI | 14.09.2011 | ||
SK | 14.09.2011 | ||
GR | 15.12.2011 | ||
IS | 14.01.2012 | ||
PT | 16.01.2012 | ||
Former [2012/23] | AT | 14.09.2011 | |
BE | 14.09.2011 | ||
CY | 14.09.2011 | ||
CZ | 14.09.2011 | ||
EE | 14.09.2011 | ||
FI | 14.09.2011 | ||
IT | 14.09.2011 | ||
LT | 14.09.2011 | ||
LV | 14.09.2011 | ||
NL | 14.09.2011 | ||
RO | 14.09.2011 | ||
SE | 14.09.2011 | ||
SI | 14.09.2011 | ||
SK | 14.09.2011 | ||
GR | 15.12.2011 | ||
IS | 14.01.2012 | ||
PT | 16.01.2012 | ||
Former [2012/21] | AT | 14.09.2011 | |
BE | 14.09.2011 | ||
CY | 14.09.2011 | ||
CZ | 14.09.2011 | ||
FI | 14.09.2011 | ||
LT | 14.09.2011 | ||
LV | 14.09.2011 | ||
SE | 14.09.2011 | ||
SI | 14.09.2011 | ||
GR | 15.12.2011 | ||
IS | 14.01.2012 | ||
Former [2012/18] | AT | 14.09.2011 | |
BE | 14.09.2011 | ||
CY | 14.09.2011 | ||
FI | 14.09.2011 | ||
LT | 14.09.2011 | ||
LV | 14.09.2011 | ||
SE | 14.09.2011 | ||
SI | 14.09.2011 | ||
GR | 15.12.2011 | ||
Former [2012/12] | AT | 14.09.2011 | |
CY | 14.09.2011 | ||
FI | 14.09.2011 | ||
LT | 14.09.2011 | ||
LV | 14.09.2011 | ||
SE | 14.09.2011 | ||
SI | 14.09.2011 | ||
GR | 15.12.2011 | ||
Former [2012/11] | AT | 14.09.2011 | |
FI | 14.09.2011 | ||
LT | 14.09.2011 | ||
LV | 14.09.2011 | ||
SE | 14.09.2011 | ||
SI | 14.09.2011 | ||
GR | 15.12.2011 | ||
Former [2012/10] | FI | 14.09.2011 | |
LT | 14.09.2011 | ||
SE | 14.09.2011 | ||
GR | 15.12.2011 | ||
Former [2012/09] | FI | 14.09.2011 | |
LT | 14.09.2011 | ||
Former [2012/08] | LT | 14.09.2011 | Cited in | International search | [X]JPH04140197 ; | [A]US2004219338 (HEBRINK TIMOTHY J [US], et al) [A] 1-30 * paragraph [0061]; claims 1,10-13 *; | [ED]WO2006049715 (3M INNOVATIVE PROPERTIES CO [US]) [ED] 1-5,7-13,16-23,25-27,29,30 * page 8, line 25 - page 9, line 4; figure 3; claims 19,41,77,96,105 * * examples prophetic,9 * | [X] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19920902), vol. 016, no. 414, Database accession no. (M - 1303), & JP04140197 A 19920514 (DAINIPPON PRINTING CO LTD; others: 01) [X] 1,2,4,7,16,18-20 * abstract * * figures 2,4; example - * |