Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1886370

EP1886370 - FUEL CELLS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  03.04.2009
Database last updated on 28.02.2020
Most recent event   Tooltip11.06.2010New entry: Additional fee for renewal fee: despatch of communication + time limit 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
The Gillette Company
Prudential Tower Building
Boston, Massachusetts 02190 / US
[2008/07]
Inventor(s)01 / BOFINGER, Anna, Maria
1020 Amble Road
Shoreview, MN / US
02 / GILICINSKI, Andrew, G.
548 Bourne Court
Danville, Ca / US
03 / DRAKE, Javit, A.
23 Walnut Street, Apt. 4A
Waltham, Massachusetts 02453 / US
04 / PINNELL, Leslie, J.
71 Overlook Drive West
Framingham, Massachusetts 01701 / US
05 / SPECHT, Steven, J.
18 Cove Street
Brookfield, Connecticut 06804 / US
 [2008/18]
Former [2008/07]01 / BOFINGER, Anna, Maria
17 Robert Drive
Nashua, New Hampshire 03063 / US
02 / GILICINSKI, Andrew, G.
10 Reed Avenue
Westborough, Massachusetts 01581 / US
03 / DRAKE, Javit, A.
23 Walnut Street, Apt. 4A
Waltham, Massachusetts 02453 / US
04 / PINNELL, Leslie, J.
71 Overlook Drive West
Framingham, Massachusetts 01701 / US
05 / SPECHT, Steven, J.
18 Cove Street
Brookfield, Connecticut 06804 / US
Representative(s)Rasser, Jacobus Cornelis
Howrey LLP
Rembrandt Tower, 31st Floor
Amstelplein 1
1096 HA Amsterdam / NL
[N/P]
Former [2008/07]Rasser, Jacobus Cornelis
Howrey LLP Rembrandt Tower, 31st Floor Amstelplein 1
1096 HA Amsterdam / NL
Application number, filing date06758637.026.04.2006
[2008/07]
WO2006US15886
Priority number, dateUS2005013784825.05.2005         Original published format: US 137848
[2008/07]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2  Application without search report
No.:WO2006127201
Date:30.11.2006
Language:EN
[2006/48]
Type: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1886370
Date:13.02.2008
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 30.11.2006
[2008/07]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP29.03.2007
ClassificationInternational:H01M8/04
[2008/07]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   NL,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2008/07]
Extension statesALNot yet paid
BANot yet paid
HRNot yet paid
MKNot yet paid
YUNot yet paid
TitleGerman:BRENNSTOFFZELLEN[2008/07]
English:FUEL CELLS[2008/07]
French:PILES A COMBUSTIBLE[2008/07]
Entry into regional phase08.11.2007National basic fee paid 
08.11.2007Designation fee(s) paid 
08.11.2007Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure08.11.2007Examination requested  [2008/07]
17.03.2008Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
30.09.2008Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2009/19]
04.11.2008Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time  [2009/19]
11.11.2008Request for decision received: Various
14.01.2009Result of request for decision (Various): Request rejected
Appeal following examination18.03.2009Appeal received No.  J0003/09
18.03.2009Statement of grounds filed
01.02.2010Date of oral proceedings
03.02.2010Minutes of oral proceedings despatched
Divisional application(s)EP08164537.6  / EP2003721
Fees paidRenewal fee
08.11.2007Renewal fee patent year 03
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
30.04.200904   M06   Not yet paid
30.04.201005   M06   Not yet paid
Cited inInternational search[X]US2002127141  (ACKER WILLIAM P [US] ACKER WILLIAM P [US] ET AL) [X] 1-4,8-15 * paragraphs [0012] - [0015] - [0033] - [0035] * * figure 2 *;
 [X]US2004161642  (HISANO KATSUMI [JP] ET AL) [X] 1,3-15 * paragraphs [0030] - [0036] - [0042] , [0043] , [0051] - [0054] * * figures 1,2,4,7,12 *;
 [X]US2005008908  (KAYE IAN W [US] ET AL) [X] 1-4,8-15 * paragraphs [0052] , [0053] , [0078] , [0079] * * figure 2C *;
 [PX]WO2005109558  (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD [JP]; IYODA MAKOTO; INOUE HIROTO; NAKAO) [PX] 1-4,8-15 * figure 8 *;
 [PX]WO2005076399  (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD [JP]; AKIYAMA TAKASHI; NIIKURA JUNJI; Y) [PX] 1-3,8-15 * figures 1-3 *;
 [A]EP1328033  (HEWLETT PACKARD CO [US]) [A] 1-15 * paragraphs [0010] - [0014] *;
 [X]US2003170522  (HIRSCH ROBERT S [US]) [X] 1,2,8-10 * paragraphs [0034] - [0038] *