Extract from the Register of European Patents

All documents: EP1886370 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP1886370



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 258
16.06.2010 Advice of delivery Appeal 2
16.06.2010 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
16.06.2010 Notice drawing attention to the payment of the renewal fee and additional fee Search / examination 2
16.06.2010 Notice drawing attention to the payment of the renewal fee and additional fee Search / examination 2
09.06.2010 F3032 Notification(s) of the decision Appeal 25
30.04.2010 F3022 Oral proceedings: change of board composition Appeal 1
26.04.2010 F3203 Composition of the Board (J) Appeal 1
03.02.2010 F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes Appeal 4
01.02.2010 F3203 Composition of the Board (J) Appeal 1
12.01.2010 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
24.12.2009 Advice of delivery Appeal 2
23.12.2009 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 1
23.12.2009 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 1
23.12.2009 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 2
17.12.2009 F3017 Oral Proceedings: Notification of cancellation/postponing Appeal 1
11.12.2009 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
04.12.2009 Advice of delivery Appeal 2
26.11.2009 F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons Appeal 9
20.11.2009 F3010 Oral proceedings: order for summons Appeal 1
11.05.2009 Refund of fees Search / examination 1
04.05.2009 F3203 Composition of the Board (J) Appeal 1
07.04.2009 F3204 Communication of the file number to the parties Appeal 1
31.03.2009 Closing of application Search / examination 1
31.03.2009 Processing of an appeal Appeal 2
18.03.2009 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 1
18.03.2009 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 1
18.03.2009 Notice of appeal Appeal 3
23.01.2009 Advice of delivery Search / examination 1
19.01.2009 Advice of delivery Search / examination 1
14.01.2009 Communication for party to proceedings/third party Search / examination 1
14.01.2009 Grounds for the decision (Annex) Search / examination 1
14.01.2009 Grounds for the decision (Annex) Search / examination 1
14.01.2009 Means of redress Search / examination 1
11.11.2008 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
11.11.2008 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
11.11.2008 Request for a decision Search / examination 1
04.11.2008 Application deemed to be withdrawn (no reply to communication from the Examining Division) Search / examination 1
03.11.2008 Communication for party to proceedings/third party Search / examination 1
25.09.2008 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
25.09.2008 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
25.09.2008 Letter concerning fees and payments Search / examination 2
16.07.2008 Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) Search / examination 1
10.07.2008 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
10.07.2008 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
10.07.2008 Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
19.03.2008 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
19.03.2008 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
19.03.2008 Letter concerning the inventor Search / examination 1
17.03.2008 Annex to the communication Search / examination 3
17.03.2008 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
11.03.2008 Invitation to indicate correct address of inventor Search / examination 1
11.03.2008 Invitation to indicate correct address of inventor Search / examination 1
01.02.2008 Letter which had not been notified Search / examination 2
29.01.2008 Letter which had not been notified Search / examination 2
16.01.2008 Communication regarding possible amendment of claims/payment of claims fees Search / examination 2
16.01.2008 Notification on forthcoming publication of bibliographic data Search / examination 1
20.12.2007 Copy of the international preliminary report on patentability Search / examination 10
08.11.2007 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
08.11.2007 Request for entry into the European phase Search / examination 3
08.10.2007 Information on entry into European phase Search / examination 3
29.03.2007 Copy of the international search report Search / examination 5
29.03.2007 International publication of the international search report Search / examination 1
18.12.2006 Priority document (electronically transmitted) Search / examination 48
30.11.2006 International publication of the A2 Pamphlet Search / examination 40
26.06.2006 Abstract International Searching Authority 1
26.06.2006 Claims International Searching Authority 6
26.06.2006 Description International Searching Authority 22
26.06.2006 Drawings International Searching Authority 11