Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1881839

EP1881839 - COMPOSITIONS OF BAKUCHIOL AND METHODS OF MAKING THE SAME [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  14.11.2014
Database last updated on 22.08.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip14.11.2014Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 17.12.2014  [2014/51]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Unigen, Inc.
2660 Willamette Drive, N.E.
Lacey, WA 98516 / US
[2011/14]
Former [2008/05]For all designated states
Unigen Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
2660 Willamette Drive, N.E.
Lacey, Washington 98516 / US
Inventor(s)01 / JIA, Qi
3443 32nd. Way Nw
Olympia, Washington 98502 / US
02 / HONG, Mei-Feng
1228 West 111th Ave
Northglenn, Colorado 80234 / US
 [2008/05]
Representative(s)Dörries, Hans Ulrich
df-mp Dörries Frank-Molnia & Pohlman
Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB
Theatinerstrasse 16
80333 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2008/47]Dörries, Hans Ulrich
df-mp Fünf Höfe Theatinerstrasse 16
80333 München / DE
Former [2008/05]Dörries, Hans Ulrich
df-mp Fünf Höfe Theatinerstrasse 16
D-80333 München / DE
Application number, filing date06759454.909.05.2006
[2008/05]
WO2006US18006
Priority number, dateUS20050679337P09.05.2005         Original published format: US 679337 P
[2008/05]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2  Application without search report
No.:WO2006122160
Date:16.11.2006
Language:EN
[2006/46]
Type: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1881839
Date:30.01.2008
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 16.11.2006
[2008/05]
International and Supplementary
search report(s)
International search report -
published on:
US08.02.2007
Supplementary European search report -
dispatched on:
EP21.04.2009
ClassificationInternational:A61K9/00, A61K31/05, A61K36/487
[2013/46]
Former International [2009/21]A61K36/00, A61K36/487, A61P17/00
Former International [2008/05]A61K36/00
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   NL,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2008/05]
Extension statesALNot yet paid
BANot yet paid
HRNot yet paid
MKNot yet paid
YUNot yet paid
TitleGerman:ZUSAMMENSETZUNGEN AUS BAKUCHIOL UND VERFAHREN ZU IHRER HERSTELLUNG[2008/05]
English:COMPOSITIONS OF BAKUCHIOL AND METHODS OF MAKING THE SAME[2008/05]
French:COMPOSITIONS DE BAKUCHIOL ET PROCEDE DE FABRICATION[2008/05]
Entry into regional phase31.10.2007National basic fee paid 
31.10.2007Search fee paid 
31.10.2007Designation fee(s) paid 
31.10.2007Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure31.10.2007Examination requested  [2008/05]
30.01.2008Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
24.07.2009Observations by third parties
29.07.2009Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
08.02.2010Reply to a communication from the examining division
11.03.2010Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
17.09.2010Reply to a communication from the examining division
01.02.2011Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M03)
10.05.2011Reply to a communication from the examining division
16.08.2011Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M05)
25.01.2012Reply to a communication from the examining division
22.05.2012Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M03)
21.08.2012Reply to a communication from the examining division
10.06.2013Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02)
20.08.2013Reply to a communication from the examining division
24.10.2013Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02)
03.01.2014Reply to a communication from the examining division
17.02.2014Communication of intention to grant the patent
28.06.2014Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2014/51]
01.08.2014Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time  [2014/51]
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  29.07.2009
Fees paidRenewal fee
28.03.2008Renewal fee patent year 03
12.05.2009Renewal fee patent year 04
31.03.2010Renewal fee patent year 05
25.05.2011Renewal fee patent year 06
25.05.2012Renewal fee patent year 07
28.05.2013Renewal fee patent year 08
27.05.2014Renewal fee patent year 09
Documents cited:Search[X]DE1900435  (FRANCO INDIAN PHARMACEUTICALS) [X] 1-10 * the whole document *;
 [Y]JP2000327581  ;
 [X]  - MEHTA G ET AL, "MERO TERPENOIDS PART 1 PSORALEA-CORYLIFOLIA 1 BAKUCHIOL A NOVEL MONO TERPENE PHENOL", TETRAHEDRON, ELSEVIER SCIENCE PUBLISHERS, AMSTERDAM, NL, (19730101), vol. 29, no. 8, ISSN 0040-4020, pages 1119 - 1125, XP009114734 [X] 1-10 * page 1122, column L *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0040-4020(73)80071-7
 [XY]  - RANGARI V D ET AL, "CHEMISTRY & PHARMACOLOGY OF PSORALEA CORYLIFOLIA", INDIAN DRUGS,, (19920101), vol. 29, no. 15, ISSN 0019-462X, pages 662 - 670, XP008052406 [X] 1-10 * page 662, column R, paragraph L - page 663, column L * * page 662, column L * [Y] 11-23
 [Y]  - FERRANDIZ M L ET AL, "EFFECT OF BAKUCHIOL ON LEUKOCYTE FUNCTIONS AND SOME INFLAMMATORY RESPONSES IN MICE", JOURNAL OF PHARMACY AND PHARMACOLOGY, PHARMACEUTICAL PRESS, (19960901), vol. 48, no. 9, ISSN 0022-3573, pages 975 - 980, XP001121598 [Y] 11-23 * the whole document *
 [Y]  - 0, vol. 2001, no. 20, Database accession no. 2001-194011, XP002522839 [Y] 11-23 * abstract *
 [Y]  - MURALI B ET AL, An HPLC method for simultaneous estimation of psoralen, bakuchicin and bakuchiol in Psoralea corylifolia, MEDICINAL & AROMATIC PLANTS ABSTRACTS, RESOURCES, NEW DELHI, ISSN 0250-4367, XP009114285 [Y] 11-23 * page 76 *
International search[X]US6350476
 [X]US5882672
 [X]US2004043089
by applicant   - H. HERMSDORF FETTE vol. 84, no. 3, 1982, pages 3 - 6
other   - MOHD. AZAM KHAN, "Zimaad-e-baabchi", KEY ATTRIBUTES OF TKDL MH3/278B, pages 1 - 2, XP003025325
    - MOHD. NAJMUL GHANI KHAN, "Baabchi", KEY ATTRIBUTES OF TKDL NA2/289, pages 1 - 3, XP003025326
    - KAIYADEVA, "Bakuci Phala", KEY ATTRIBRUTES OF TKDL RS6/257A, pages 1 - 2, XP003025327
    - LANKAPATIRAVANA, "Bakuci Arka Gunah", KEY ATTRIBRUTES OF TKDL AK14/54A, pages 1 - 3, XP003025328
    - ANONYMOUS, "Bakuci", KEY ATTRIBUTES OF TKDL RG/3515, pages 1 - 3, XP003025329
    - KAIYADEVA, "Bakuciphalagunah", KEY ATTRIBUTES OF TKDL RS/3125B, pages 1 - 2, XP003025330
    - MOHD. NAJMUL GHANI KHAN, "Kheesaanda baabchi Bara-e-Bars", KEY ATTRIBUTES OF TKDL NA2/289A, pages 1 - 3, XP003025331
    - MOHD. NAJMUL GHANI KHAN, "Dawa-e-Babchi-e-Bars", KEY ATTRIBUTES OF TKDL NA2/289R, pages 1 - 3, XP003025332
    - MOHD. AKMAL KHAN, "Zimaad Babchi Barae Baras", KEY ATTRIBUTES OF TKDL AH5/186C, pages 1 - 2, XP003025333
    - NITYANATHASIDDAH, "Bijapurakadi Varti", KEY ATTRIBUTES OF TKDL VK5/1388D, pages 1 - 3, XP003025334
    - VANGASENA, "Bijapuradi Yoga", KEY ATTRIBUTES OF TKDL AK11/2964, pages 1 - 3, XP003025335
    - NAGINADASA CHAGANALALA SAHA, "Babburadiprayogah", KEY ATTRIBUTES OF TKDL RD/360, pages 1 - 3, XP003025336
    - MOHD. NAJMUL GHANI KHAN, "Zimaad-e-mudammil", KEY ATTRIBUTES OF TKDL JA6/589Z30, pages 1 - 2, XP003025337
    - NAGINADASA CHAGANALALA SAHA, "Bakuciypgah", KEY ATTRIBUTES OF TKDL RD/516, pages 1 - 3, XP003025338
    - NAGINADASA CHAGANALALA, "Tamrayogah", KEY ATTRIBUTES OF TKDL BP/1500, pages 1 - 2, XP003025339
    - ANONYMOUS, "Silasindura Vati", KEY ATTRIBUTES OF TKDL RS22/739, pages 1 - 3, XP003025340
    - ANOYMOUS, "Arugamver Thailam", KEY ATTRIBUTES OF TKDL GD02/85, pages 1 - 3, XP003025341
    - NAGINDASA CHAGANALALA SAHA, "Vyosadyagutikagugguluh", KEY ATTRIBUTES OF TKDL RS/1714, pages 1 - 4, XP003025342
    - ANONYMOUS, "Pancnimba Curna", KEY ATTRIBUTES OF TKDL RS22/750, pages 1 - 4, XP003025343
    - GOVINDA DASA, "Kamalantakalauham", KEY ATTRIBUTES OF TKDL AK/1080, pages 1 - 5, XP003025344
    - ABDULLA SAHIB, "Raasavallaathi", KEY ATTRIBUTES OF TKDL KS01/121, pages 1 - 5, XP003025345