EP1884126 - METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR REPORTING EVOLVED UTRAN CAPABILITIES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2008/06] | METHOD AND SYSTEM FOR REPORTING EVOLVED UTRAN CAPABILITIES | ||
[2015/52] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 03.03.2017 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.08.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): BG | published on 19.09.2018 [2018/38] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states InterDigital Technology Corporation 200 Bellevue Parkway Suite 300 Wilmington, DE 19809 / US | [2013/15] |
Former [2008/06] | For all designated states INTERDIGITAL TECHNOLOGY CORPORATION 3411 Silverside Road, Concord Plaza Suite 105 Hagley Building Wilmington, DE 19810 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SHAHEEN, Kamel, M. 429 Ashton Drive King Of Prussia, Pennsylvania 19406 / US | [2008/06] | Representative(s) | AWA Sweden AB Box 45086 104 30 Stockholm / SE | [N/P] |
Former [2016/17] | Awapatent AB P.O. Box 45086 104 30 Stockholm / SE | ||
Former [2008/06] | Engdahl, Stefan AWAPATENT AB P.O. Box 45086 104 30 Stockholm / SE | Application number, filing date | 06759894.6 | 16.05.2006 | [2008/06] | WO2006US18834 | Priority number, date | US20050682634P | 19.05.2005 Original published format: US 682634 P | US20060432781 | 11.05.2006 Original published format: US 432781 | [2008/06] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2006124840 | Date: | 23.11.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/47] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1884126 | Date: | 06.02.2008 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 23.11.2006 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2008/06] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1884126 | Date: | 27.04.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/17] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 23.11.2006 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.04.2012 | Classification | IPC: | H04W8/24, // H04W8/22, H04W8/18, H04W88/06 | [2015/52] | CPC: |
H04W8/24 (EP,KR,NO,US);
H04W88/14 (BR);
H04W24/10 (BR);
H04W8/18 (EP,KR,NO,US);
H04W8/22 (EP,KR,NO,US);
H04W88/06 (EP,KR,NO,US);
H04B2201/70724 (KR)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2008/06] | H04Q7/20 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2016/17] |
Former [2008/06] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUM MELDEN EVOLVIERTER UTRAN-FÄHIGKEITEN | [2015/52] | English: | METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR REPORTING EVOLVED UTRAN CAPABILITIES | [2015/52] | French: | PROCEDE ET APPAREIL POUR L'ETABLISSEMENT DE RAPPORT DE CAPACITES EVOLUEES DE RESEAU D'ACCES TERRESTRE DE SYSTEMES UNIVERSELS DE TELECOMMUNICATIONS MOBILES | [2015/52] |
Former [2008/06] | VERFAHREN UND SYSTEM ZUM MELDEN EVOLVIERTER UTRAN-FÄHIGKEITEN | ||
Former [2008/06] | METHOD AND SYSTEM FOR REPORTING EVOLVED UTRAN CAPABILITIES | ||
Former [2008/06] | PROCEDE ET SYSTEME POUR L'ETABLISSEMENT DE RAPPORT DE CAPACITES EVOLUEES DE RESEAU D'ACCES TERRESTRE DE SYSTEMES UNIVERSELS DE TELECOMMUNICATIONS MOBILES | Entry into regional phase | 07.12.2007 | National basic fee paid | 07.12.2007 | Search fee paid | 07.12.2007 | Designation fee(s) paid | 07.12.2007 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 04.01.2007 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 07.12.2007 | Examination requested [2008/06] | 15.11.2012 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 25.03.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 02.08.2013 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.07.2014 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 09.01.2015 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.04.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 11.08.2015 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.12.2015 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 09.03.2016 | Fee for grant paid | 09.03.2016 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 09.03.2016 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 25.03.2013 | Opposition(s) | 30.01.2017 | No opposition filed within time limit [2017/14] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.05.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 11.05.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 29.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 10.05.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 16.05.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 28.05.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 10 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 16.05.2006 | AT | 27.04.2016 | BE | 27.04.2016 | BG | 27.04.2016 | CY | 27.04.2016 | CZ | 27.04.2016 | DK | 27.04.2016 | EE | 27.04.2016 | ES | 27.04.2016 | FI | 27.04.2016 | IS | 27.04.2016 | IT | 27.04.2016 | LT | 27.04.2016 | LV | 27.04.2016 | MC | 27.04.2016 | PL | 27.04.2016 | RO | 27.04.2016 | SE | 27.04.2016 | SI | 27.04.2016 | SK | 27.04.2016 | TR | 27.04.2016 | IE | 16.05.2016 | LU | 16.05.2016 | CH | 31.05.2016 | LI | 31.05.2016 | GR | 28.07.2016 | PT | 29.08.2016 | [2018/38] |
Former [2018/32] | HU | 16.05.2006 | |
AT | 27.04.2016 | ||
BE | 27.04.2016 | ||
CY | 27.04.2016 | ||
CZ | 27.04.2016 | ||
DK | 27.04.2016 | ||
EE | 27.04.2016 | ||
ES | 27.04.2016 | ||
FI | 27.04.2016 | ||
IS | 27.04.2016 | ||
IT | 27.04.2016 | ||
LT | 27.04.2016 | ||
LV | 27.04.2016 | ||
MC | 27.04.2016 | ||
PL | 27.04.2016 | ||
RO | 27.04.2016 | ||
SE | 27.04.2016 | ||
SI | 27.04.2016 | ||
SK | 27.04.2016 | ||
TR | 27.04.2016 | ||
IE | 16.05.2016 | ||
LU | 16.05.2016 | ||
CH | 31.05.2016 | ||
LI | 31.05.2016 | ||
GR | 28.07.2016 | ||
PT | 29.08.2016 | ||
Former [2018/29] | HU | 16.05.2006 | |
AT | 27.04.2016 | ||
BE | 27.04.2016 | ||
CY | 27.04.2016 | ||
CZ | 27.04.2016 | ||
DK | 27.04.2016 | ||
EE | 27.04.2016 | ||
ES | 27.04.2016 | ||
FI | 27.04.2016 | ||
IT | 27.04.2016 | ||
LT | 27.04.2016 | ||
LV | 27.04.2016 | ||
MC | 27.04.2016 | ||
PL | 27.04.2016 | ||
RO | 27.04.2016 | ||
SE | 27.04.2016 | ||
SI | 27.04.2016 | ||
SK | 27.04.2016 | ||
TR | 27.04.2016 | ||
IE | 16.05.2016 | ||
LU | 16.05.2016 | ||
CH | 31.05.2016 | ||
LI | 31.05.2016 | ||
GR | 28.07.2016 | ||
PT | 29.08.2016 | ||
Former [2018/28] | HU | 16.05.2006 | |
AT | 27.04.2016 | ||
BE | 27.04.2016 | ||
CY | 27.04.2016 | ||
CZ | 27.04.2016 | ||
DK | 27.04.2016 | ||
EE | 27.04.2016 | ||
ES | 27.04.2016 | ||
FI | 27.04.2016 | ||
IT | 27.04.2016 | ||
LT | 27.04.2016 | ||
LV | 27.04.2016 | ||
MC | 27.04.2016 | ||
PL | 27.04.2016 | ||
RO | 27.04.2016 | ||
SE | 27.04.2016 | ||
SI | 27.04.2016 | ||
SK | 27.04.2016 | ||
IE | 16.05.2016 | ||
CH | 31.05.2016 | ||
LI | 31.05.2016 | ||
GR | 28.07.2016 | ||
PT | 29.08.2016 | ||
Former [2017/37] | AT | 27.04.2016 | |
BE | 27.04.2016 | ||
CZ | 27.04.2016 | ||
DK | 27.04.2016 | ||
EE | 27.04.2016 | ||
ES | 27.04.2016 | ||
FI | 27.04.2016 | ||
IT | 27.04.2016 | ||
LT | 27.04.2016 | ||
LV | 27.04.2016 | ||
MC | 27.04.2016 | ||
PL | 27.04.2016 | ||
RO | 27.04.2016 | ||
SE | 27.04.2016 | ||
SI | 27.04.2016 | ||
SK | 27.04.2016 | ||
IE | 16.05.2016 | ||
CH | 31.05.2016 | ||
LI | 31.05.2016 | ||
GR | 28.07.2016 | ||
PT | 29.08.2016 | ||
Former [2017/10] | AT | 27.04.2016 | |
BE | 27.04.2016 | ||
CZ | 27.04.2016 | ||
DK | 27.04.2016 | ||
EE | 27.04.2016 | ||
ES | 27.04.2016 | ||
FI | 27.04.2016 | ||
IT | 27.04.2016 | ||
LT | 27.04.2016 | ||
LV | 27.04.2016 | ||
MC | 27.04.2016 | ||
PL | 27.04.2016 | ||
RO | 27.04.2016 | ||
SE | 27.04.2016 | ||
SK | 27.04.2016 | ||
CH | 31.05.2016 | ||
LI | 31.05.2016 | ||
GR | 28.07.2016 | ||
PT | 29.08.2016 | ||
Former [2017/09] | AT | 27.04.2016 | |
BE | 27.04.2016 | ||
CZ | 27.04.2016 | ||
DK | 27.04.2016 | ||
EE | 27.04.2016 | ||
ES | 27.04.2016 | ||
FI | 27.04.2016 | ||
IT | 27.04.2016 | ||
LT | 27.04.2016 | ||
LV | 27.04.2016 | ||
MC | 27.04.2016 | ||
PL | 27.04.2016 | ||
RO | 27.04.2016 | ||
SE | 27.04.2016 | ||
CH | 31.05.2016 | ||
LI | 31.05.2016 | ||
GR | 28.07.2016 | ||
PT | 29.08.2016 | ||
Former [2017/07] | AT | 27.04.2016 | |
BE | 27.04.2016 | ||
DK | 27.04.2016 | ||
ES | 27.04.2016 | ||
FI | 27.04.2016 | ||
IT | 27.04.2016 | ||
LT | 27.04.2016 | ||
LV | 27.04.2016 | ||
MC | 27.04.2016 | ||
PL | 27.04.2016 | ||
SE | 27.04.2016 | ||
CH | 31.05.2016 | ||
LI | 31.05.2016 | ||
GR | 28.07.2016 | ||
PT | 29.08.2016 | ||
Former [2017/03] | AT | 27.04.2016 | |
BE | 27.04.2016 | ||
ES | 27.04.2016 | ||
FI | 27.04.2016 | ||
IT | 27.04.2016 | ||
LT | 27.04.2016 | ||
LV | 27.04.2016 | ||
PL | 27.04.2016 | ||
SE | 27.04.2016 | ||
GR | 28.07.2016 | ||
PT | 29.08.2016 | ||
Former [2016/52] | AT | 27.04.2016 | |
ES | 27.04.2016 | ||
FI | 27.04.2016 | ||
LT | 27.04.2016 | ||
LV | 27.04.2016 | ||
PL | 27.04.2016 | ||
SE | 27.04.2016 | ||
BE | 31.05.2016 | ||
GR | 28.07.2016 | ||
PT | 29.08.2016 | ||
Former [2016/51] | AT | 27.04.2016 | |
ES | 27.04.2016 | ||
FI | 27.04.2016 | ||
LT | 27.04.2016 | ||
LV | 27.04.2016 | ||
PL | 27.04.2016 | ||
BE | 31.05.2016 | ||
GR | 28.07.2016 | ||
PT | 29.08.2016 | ||
Former [2016/50] | AT | 27.04.2016 | |
ES | 27.04.2016 | ||
FI | 27.04.2016 | ||
LT | 27.04.2016 | ||
LV | 27.04.2016 | ||
PL | 27.04.2016 | ||
BE | 31.05.2016 | ||
Former [2016/49] | FI | 27.04.2016 | |
LT | 27.04.2016 | ||
PL | 27.04.2016 | ||
BE | 31.05.2016 | ||
Former [2016/46] | LT | 27.04.2016 | |
BE | 31.05.2016 | ||
Former [2016/37] | BE | 31.05.2016 | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US5862480 (WILD JOHANNA ALEXANDRA [US], et al) [Y] 12-16,28-32 * column 10, line 18 - line 67 * * figure 12 *; | [A]US2004106430 (SCHWARZ UWE [FI], et al) [A] 1-32 * paragraph [0006] - paragraph [0007] * * paragraph [0019] - paragraph [0021] *; | [I]US6771964 (EINOLA HEIKKI [FI], et al) [I] 1-7,17-23 * column 5, line 21 - column 6, line 41 * * figure 2 *; | [A]US2005073977 (VANGHI VIERI [US], et al) [A] 1-32 * paragraph [0040] - paragraph [0044] * * paragraph [0060] *; | [IY]WO2005039201 (INTERDIGITAL TECH CORP [US], et al) [I] 1-11,17-27 * paragraph [0006] - paragraph [0009] * * paragraph [0019] - paragraph [0042] * * figures 1-3 * [Y] 12-16,28-32; | [A] - NTT DOCOMO ET AL, "Proposed Study Item on Evolved UTRA and UTRAN", 3GPP DRAFT; RP-040461 PROPOSED SID ON EVOLVED UTRA AND UTRAN, 3RD GENERATION PARTNERSHIP PROJECT (3GPP), MOBILE COMPETENCE CENTRE ; 650, ROUTE DES LUCIOLES ; F-06921 SOPHIA-ANTIPOLIS CEDEX ; FRANCE, (20041207), vol. TSG SA, no. Athens, Greece; 20041207, XP050203764 [A] 1-32 * the whole document * | International search | [X]US5862480 (WILD JOHANNA ALEXANDRA [US], et al); | [YP]US2005288016 (KUCHIBHOTLA RAVI [US], et al) |