Extract from the Register of European Patents

All documents: EP1915599 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP1915599



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 210
27.09.2017 Communication regarding the expiry of opposition period Search / examination 1
23.11.2016 Transmission of the certificate Search / examination 1
27.10.2016 Decision to grant a European patent Search / examination 2
12.10.2016 English translation of the claims Search / examination 2
12.10.2016 Filing of the translations of the claims Search / examination 1
12.10.2016 French translation of claims Search / examination 2
12.10.2016 Payment of fees and costs Search / examination 1
10.10.2016 English translation of the claims Search / examination 2
10.10.2016 Filing of the translations of the claims Search / examination 1
10.10.2016 French translation of claims Search / examination 2
10.10.2016 Payment of fees and costs Search / examination 1
10.10.2016 Payment of fees and costs Search / examination 1
16.06.2016 Bibliographic data of the European patent application Search / examination 2
16.06.2016 Communication about intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 5
16.06.2016 Intention to grant (signatures) Search / examination 1
16.06.2016 Text intended for grant Search / examination 18
16.06.2016 Text intended for grant (clean copy) Search / examination 18
19.02.2016 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 4
19.02.2016 Claims Search / examination 4
19.02.2016 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 3
17.02.2016 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 4
17.02.2016 Claims Search / examination 4
17.02.2016 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 3
17.12.2015 Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) Search / examination 1
17.12.2015 Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
14.12.2015 Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
31.08.2015 Annex to the communication Search / examination 3
31.08.2015 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
02.04.2015 Communication of amended entries concerning the representative Search / examination 1
25.03.2015 Request for change of applicant's representative Search / examination 1
05.07.2011 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 3
05.07.2011 Claims Search / examination 3
05.07.2011 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
01.07.2011 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 3
01.07.2011 Claims Search / examination 3
01.07.2011 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
20.04.2011 Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) Search / examination 1
18.04.2011 Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
15.04.2011 Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
22.12.2010 Annex to the communication Search / examination 2
22.12.2010 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
12.08.2010 CDS Clean up - amended data concerning the representative for the applicant Search / examination 1
31.07.2008 Final instructions (loss of partial rights) Search / examination 2
25.04.2008 Invitation to indicate correct address of inventor Search / examination 1
21.04.2008 Designation deemed to be withdrawn (loss of partial rights) Search / examination 2
17.04.2008 Letter which had not been notified Search / examination 2
02.04.2008 Notification on forthcoming publication of bibliographic data Search / examination 1
01.04.2008 Communication regarding possible amendment of claims/payment of claims fees Search / examination 3
03.03.2008 Copy of the international preliminary report on patentability Search / examination 6
24.01.2008 Request for entry into the European phase Search / examination 7
02.01.2008 Information on entry into European phase Search / examination 3
12.03.2007 Priority document (electronically transmitted) Search / examination 23
22.02.2007 Copy of the international search report Search / examination 3
22.02.2007 Copy of the international search report Search / examination 3
22.02.2007 International publication of the A1 Pamphlet Search / examination 19
08.08.2006 Abstract International Searching Authority 1
08.08.2006 Claims International Searching Authority 3
08.08.2006 Description International Searching Authority 13
08.08.2006 Drawings International Searching Authority 1