Extract from the Register of European Patents

Event history: EP1915599


Date  Description European Patent Bulletin date, issue number
28.06.2019 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  31.07.2019  [2019/31]
29.09.2017 No opposition filed within time limit published on  01.11.2017  [2017/44]
15.09.2017 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  18.10.2017  [2017/42]
18.08.2017 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  20.09.2017  [2017/38]
30.06.2017 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  02.08.2017  [2017/31]
21.10.2016 (Expected) grant published on  23.11.2016  [2016/47]
14.10.2016 New entry: Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
14.10.2016 New entry: Payment of fee for grant
14.10.2016 New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing
30.06.2016 New entry: Renewal fee paid
15.06.2016 New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent
19.02.2016 New entry: Reply to examination report
14.12.2015 Change: Despatch of examination report + time limit
09.09.2015 New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit
29.06.2015 New entry: Renewal fee paid
31.03.2015 Change - representative
02.07.2014 New entry: Renewal fee paid
04.07.2013 New entry: Renewal fee paid
04.07.2012 New entry: Renewal fee paid
22.06.2012 Change - extension states published on  25.07.2012  [2012/30]
04.07.2011 New entry: Reply to examination report
29.06.2011 New entry: Renewal fee paid
15.04.2011 Change: Despatch of examination report + time limit
24.12.2010 First examination report
17.12.2010 New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit
30.06.2010 New entry: Renewal fee paid
07.07.2009 New entry: Renewal fee paid
01.08.2008 New entry: Loss of particular rights: legal effect
01.08.2008 Change - designated states published on  03.09.2008  [2008/36]
03.07.2008 New entry: Renewal fee paid
15.04.2008 New entry: Loss of particular rights: despatch of communication + time limit
28.03.2008 Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin published on  30.04.2008  [2008/18]
28.03.2008 Request for examination filed published on  30.04.2008  [2008/18]
20.03.2008 PCT data prior to European publication
12.02.2008 PCT data prior to European publication
28.03.2007 PCT data prior to European publication
16.03.2007 PCT data prior to European publication
21.09.2006 PCT data prior to European publication