Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1915599

EP1915599 - SENSOR ARRANGEMENT FOR TEMPERATURE MEASUREMENT [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  29.09.2017
Database last updated on 26.02.2020
Most recent event   Tooltip28.06.2019Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): HU
published on 31.07.2019  [2019/31]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Sitronic Ges. für elektrotechnische Ausrüstung mbH & Co. KG
Robert-Bosch-Strasse 9
71116 Gärtringen / DE
[2016/47]
Former [2008/18]For all designated states
Sitronic Ges. Für Elektrotechnische Ausrüstung Mbh & Co. Kg
Robert-Bosch-Strasse 9
71116 Gärtringen / DE
Inventor(s)01 / MAU, Gert
Keplerstrasse 26
71134 Aidlingen / DE
02 / RAAB, Christoph
Böhmisreuteweg 7
70199 Stuttgart / DE
03 / STAUSS, Gerold
Schillerstrasse 50
71083 Herrenberg / DE
 [2008/18]
Representative(s)Kohler Schmid Möbus Patentanwälte
Partnerschaftsgesellschaft mbB
Gropiusplatz 10
70563 Stuttgart / DE
[N/P]
Former [2016/47]Kohler Schmid Möbus Patentanwälte
Partnerschaftsgesellschaft mbB
Ruppmannstraße 27
70565 Stuttgart / DE
Former [2008/18]Bäcker, Rüdiger
Kohler Schmid Möbus Patentanwälte Ruppmannstrasse 27
70565 Stuttgart / DE
Application number, filing date06761725.829.06.2006
[2008/18]
WO2006DE01121
Priority number, dateDE2005103846613.08.2005         Original published format: DE102005038466
[2008/18]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2007019817
Date:22.02.2007
Language:DE
[2007/08]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1915599
Date:30.04.2008
Language:DE
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 22.02.2007
[2008/18]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1915599
Date:23.11.2016
Language:DE
[2016/47]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP22.02.2007
ClassificationInternational:G01K1/14, B60H1/00
[2008/18]
Designated contracting statesCZ,   ES,   FR,   HU,   IT,   SE [2016/47]
Former [2008/36]CZ,  ES,  FR,  HU,  IT,  SE 
Former [2008/18]AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  NL,  PL,  PT,  RO,  SE,  SI,  SK,  TR 
Extension statesALNot yet paid
BANot yet paid
HRNot yet paid
MKNot yet paid
RSNot yet paid
TitleGerman:SENSORANORDNUNG ZUR TEMPERATURMESSUNG[2008/18]
English:SENSOR ARRANGEMENT FOR TEMPERATURE MEASUREMENT[2008/18]
French:DISPOSITIF DE DETECTION POUR MESURER LA TEMPERATURE[2008/18]
Entry into regional phase13.03.2008National basic fee paid 
13.03.2008Designation fee(s) paid 
13.03.2008Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure13.03.2008Examination requested  [2008/18]
14.03.2008Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s)
21.04.2008Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, DE, DK, EE, FI, GB, GR, IE, IS, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SI, SK, TR
22.12.2010Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
01.07.2011Reply to a communication from the examining division
31.08.2015Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
17.02.2016Reply to a communication from the examining division
16.06.2016Communication of intention to grant the patent
10.10.2016Fee for grant paid
10.10.2016Fee for publishing/printing paid
10.10.2016Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  22.12.2010
Opposition(s)24.08.2017No opposition filed within time limit [2017/44]
Fees paidRenewal fee
21.06.2008Renewal fee patent year 03
30.06.2009Renewal fee patent year 04
22.06.2010Renewal fee patent year 05
21.06.2011Renewal fee patent year 06
27.06.2012Renewal fee patent year 07
25.06.2013Renewal fee patent year 08
26.06.2014Renewal fee patent year 09
25.06.2015Renewal fee patent year 10
23.06.2016Renewal fee patent year 11
Lapses during opposition  TooltipHU29.06.2006
CZ23.11.2016
ES23.11.2016
SE23.11.2016
[2019/31]
Former [2017/38]CZ23.11.2016
ES23.11.2016
SE23.11.2016
Former [2017/31]ES23.11.2016
SE23.11.2016
Cited inInternational search[X]DE10214368  (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT [DE]) [X] 1-10 * paragraphs [0003] - [0007] *;
 [PX]US2005178200  (STAUSS GEROLD [DE] ET AL) [PX] 1,3,5,7,8,10 * paragraph [0045] - paragraph [0048]; figures 3a,3b *;
 [E]WO2006108367  (CO KG SITRONIC GES FUER ELEKTR [DE]; MAU GERT [DE]; RAAB CHRISTOPH [DE) [E] 1,8-10 * the whole document *;
 [DA]DE69907493T  (CLAUD S GORDON CO [US]) [DA] 1,3-5,7 * the whole document *;
 [A]EP1380481  (E & E ELEKTRONIK GMBH [AT]) [A] 1,8-10 * paragraphs [0025] , [0032]; figure - *