Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1891327

EP1891327 - WIND TURBINE COMPRISING A ROTOR BLADE BEARING ARRANGEMENT, AND METHOD FOR OPERATING A WIND TURBINE [Right-click to bookmark this link]
Former [2008/09]BEARING UNIT FOR A LONG ROTOR BLADE OF A WIND POWER INSTALLATION, WIND POWER INSTALLATION COMPRISING ONE SUCH ROTOR BLADE BEARING ARRANGEMENT, AND METHOD FOR OPERATING ONE SUCH WIND POWER INSTALLATION
[2012/43]
StatusThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  15.03.2013
Database last updated on 07.12.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip25.10.2019Change - representative 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
IMO Holding GmbH
Imostrasse 1
91350 Gremsdorf / DE
[2008/09]
Inventor(s)01 / RUSS, Erich
Poppenwind 21
91350 Gremsdorf / DE
02 / SCHRÖPPEL, Werner
Schulstrasse 28a
98530 Wendelstein / DE
 [2008/09]
Representative(s)Schmidt, Steffen J. , et al
Wuesthoff & Wuesthoff
Patentanwälte PartG mbB
Schweigerstrasse 2
81541 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2013/16]Küchler, Stefan
Patentanwalt Färberstrasse 20
90402 Nürnberg / DE
Former [2008/09]Küchler, Stefan
Färberstraße 20
90402 Nürnberg / DE
Application number, filing date06761975.906.06.2006
[2008/09]
WO2006EP05362
Priority number, dateDE2005102614106.06.2005         Original published format: DE102005026141
[2008/09]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A2  Application without search report
No.:WO2006131301
Date:14.12.2006
Language:DE
[2006/50]
Type: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1891327
Date:27.02.2008
Language:DE
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 14.12.2006
[2008/09]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1891327
Date:17.04.2013
Language:DE
[2013/16]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP05.04.2007
ClassificationInternational:F03D11/00, F03D1/06, F03D7/02
[2008/09]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   NL,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2008/09]
TitleGerman:WINDKRAFTANLAGE MIT EINER ROTORBLATTLAGERUNG SOWIE VERFAHREN ZUM BETRIEB EINER DERARTIGEN WINDKRAFTANLAGE[2012/43]
English:WIND TURBINE COMPRISING A ROTOR BLADE BEARING ARRANGEMENT, AND METHOD FOR OPERATING A WIND TURBINE[2012/43]
French:EOLIENNE POURVUE D'UN SUPPORT DE PALE, ET PROCEDE POUR FAIRE FONCTIONNER CETTE EOLIENNE[2012/43]
Former [2008/09]LAGEREINHEIT FÜR EIN LANGGESTRECKTES ROTORBLATT EINER WINDKRAFTANLAGE, MIT EINER SOLCHEN ROTORBLATTLAGERUNG AUSGESTATTETE WINDKRAFTANLAGE SOWIE VERFAHREN ZUM BETRIEB EINER DERARTIGEN WINDKRAFTANLAGE
Former [2008/09]BEARING UNIT FOR A LONG ROTOR BLADE OF A WIND POWER INSTALLATION, WIND POWER INSTALLATION COMPRISING ONE SUCH ROTOR BLADE BEARING ARRANGEMENT, AND METHOD FOR OPERATING ONE SUCH WIND POWER INSTALLATION
Former [2008/09]UNITE DE SUPPORT CONÇUE POUR UNE PALE DE ROTOR ALLONGEE D'UNE INSTALLATION A ENERGIE EOLIENNE, INSTALLATION A ENERGIE EOLIENNE POURVUE DE CETTE UNITE DE SUPPORT DE PALE DE ROTOR, ET PROCEDE POUR FAIRE FONCTIONNER CETTE INSTALLATION A ENERGIE EOLIENNE
Entry into regional phase04.01.2008National basic fee paid 
04.01.2008Designation fee(s) paid 
04.01.2008Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure05.04.2007Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
04.01.2008Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
04.01.2008Examination requested  [2008/09]
16.08.2010Observations by third parties
31.10.2012Communication of intention to grant the patent
28.02.2013Fee for grant paid
28.02.2013Fee for publishing/printing paid
13.06.2016Observations by third parties
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  31.10.2012
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  17.01.2014  18.02.2014  ADMISSIBLE
ThyssenKrupp Rothe Erde GmbH
Tremoniastraße 5-11
44137 Dortmund / DE
Opponent's representative
Loock, Jan Pieter
Kutzenberger Wolff & Partner
Waidmarkt 11
50676 Köln / DE
 [N/P]
Former [2016/41]
Opponent(s)01  17.01.2014  18.02.2014  ADMISSIBLE
ThyssenKrupp Rothe Erde GmbH
Tremoniastraße 5-11
44137 Dortmund / DE
Opponent's representative
Loock, Jan Pieter
Kutzenberger Wolff & Partner
Theodor-Heuss-Ring 23
50668 Köln / DE
Former [2016/37]
Opponent(s)01  17.01.2014  18.02.2014  ADMISSIBLE
ThyssenKrupp Rothe Erde GmbH
Tremoniastraße 5-11
44137 Dortmund / DE
Opponent's representative
Glawe, Delfs, Moll
Partnerschaft mbB von
Patent- und Rechtsanwälten
Rothenbaumchaussee 58
20148 Hamburg / DE
Former [2014/09]
Opponent(s)01  17.01.2014   
ThyssenKrupp Rothe Erde GmbH
Tremoniastraße 5-11
44137 Dortmund / DE
Opponent's representative
Loock, Jan Pieter
Kutzenberger Wolff & Partner
Theodor-Heuss-Ring 23
50668 Köln / DE
25.02.2014Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
05.09.2014Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
05.01.2016Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 30.06.2016
30.06.2016Date of oral proceedings
06.10.2016Date of oral proceedings
21.10.2016Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
14.11.2016Despatch of interlocutory decision in opposition
Appeal following opposition11.01.2017Appeal received No.  T0074/17
21.03.2017Statement of grounds filed
18.01.2017Appeal received No.  T0074/17
20.03.2017Statement of grounds filed
Fees paidRenewal fee
24.06.2008Renewal fee patent year 03
29.06.2009Renewal fee patent year 04
29.06.2010Renewal fee patent year 05
30.06.2011Renewal fee patent year 06
02.07.2012Renewal fee patent year 07
Lapses during opposition  TooltipHU06.06.2006
CY17.04.2013
CZ17.04.2013
EE17.04.2013
FI17.04.2013
LT17.04.2013
LV17.04.2013
MC17.04.2013
PL17.04.2013
RO17.04.2013
SI17.04.2013
SK17.04.2013
TR17.04.2013
AT06.06.2013
LU06.06.2013
CH30.06.2013
LI30.06.2013
BG17.07.2013
GR18.07.2013
IS17.08.2013
PT19.08.2013
[2015/34]
Former [2015/32]CY17.04.2013
CZ17.04.2013
EE17.04.2013
FI17.04.2013
LT17.04.2013
LV17.04.2013
MC17.04.2013
PL17.04.2013
RO17.04.2013
SI17.04.2013
SK17.04.2013
TR17.04.2013
AT06.06.2013
CH30.06.2013
LI30.06.2013
BG17.07.2013
GR18.07.2013
IS17.08.2013
PT19.08.2013
Former [2014/51]CY17.04.2013
CZ17.04.2013
EE17.04.2013
FI17.04.2013
LT17.04.2013
LV17.04.2013
MC17.04.2013
PL17.04.2013
RO17.04.2013
SI17.04.2013
SK17.04.2013
AT06.06.2013
CH30.06.2013
LI30.06.2013
BG17.07.2013
GR18.07.2013
IS17.08.2013
PT19.08.2013
Former [2014/20]CY17.04.2013
CZ17.04.2013
EE17.04.2013
FI17.04.2013
LT17.04.2013
LV17.04.2013
MC17.04.2013
PL17.04.2013
RO17.04.2013
SI17.04.2013
SK17.04.2013
CH30.06.2013
LI30.06.2013
BG17.07.2013
GR18.07.2013
IS17.08.2013
PT19.08.2013
Former [2014/11]CY17.04.2013
CZ17.04.2013
EE17.04.2013
FI17.04.2013
LT17.04.2013
LV17.04.2013
MC17.04.2013
PL17.04.2013
RO17.04.2013
SI17.04.2013
SK17.04.2013
BG17.07.2013
GR18.07.2013
IS17.08.2013
PT19.08.2013
Former [2014/10]CY17.04.2013
CZ17.04.2013
EE17.04.2013
FI17.04.2013
LT17.04.2013
LV17.04.2013
MC17.04.2013
PL17.04.2013
SI17.04.2013
SK17.04.2013
BG17.07.2013
GR18.07.2013
IS17.08.2013
PT19.08.2013
Former [2014/09]CY17.04.2013
EE17.04.2013
FI17.04.2013
LT17.04.2013
LV17.04.2013
MC17.04.2013
PL17.04.2013
SI17.04.2013
BG17.07.2013
GR18.07.2013
IS17.08.2013
PT19.08.2013
Former [2014/08]CY17.04.2013
FI17.04.2013
LT17.04.2013
LV17.04.2013
MC17.04.2013
PL17.04.2013
SI17.04.2013
BG17.07.2013
GR18.07.2013
IS17.08.2013
PT19.08.2013
Former [2013/52]CY17.04.2013
FI17.04.2013
LT17.04.2013
LV17.04.2013
PL17.04.2013
SI17.04.2013
BG17.07.2013
GR18.07.2013
IS17.08.2013
PT19.08.2013
Former [2013/50]FI17.04.2013
LT17.04.2013
LV17.04.2013
PL17.04.2013
SI17.04.2013
BG17.07.2013
GR18.07.2013
IS17.08.2013
PT19.08.2013
Former [2013/49]FI17.04.2013
LT17.04.2013
SI17.04.2013
GR18.07.2013
IS17.08.2013
PT19.08.2013
Former [2013/48]LT17.04.2013
IS17.08.2013
PT19.08.2013
Former [2013/47]LT17.04.2013
PT19.08.2013
Cited inInternational search[XY]US3652141  (WERNER HUSTEN ET AL) [X] 1-27,30 * column 1, line 58 - column 2, line 14 * * abstract * [Y] 31-38;
 [XA]EP1259741  (INA-SCHAEFFLER KG) [X] 1-5,7-17,26,27 * paragraph [0001] * * paragraph [0015] - paragraph [0018] * * figure - * [A] 21;
 [XA]DE2011141  (JAEGER GMBH G & J) [X] 1-5,7-17,28 * page 1 - page 3 * * figure - * [A] 30;
 [X]DE2648144  (INDUSTRIEWERK SCHAEFFLER OHG; INA WAELZLAGER SCHAEFFLER KG, 8522 HERZO) [X] 1-13,15,17,26,28-30 * page 2 * * page 4 * * figure - *;
 [X]EP0238725  (HOESCH AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT) [X] 1,4-8,27,30 * column 1, line 1 - line 10 * * column 2, line 24 - line 41 * * abstract *;
 [X]CA2536058  (MITSUBISHI HEAVY INDUSTRIES LTD) [X] 1-5,7-13,15,17,28-30 * page 37 - page 41 * * figure 12 *;
 [Y]EP1286048  (GE WIND ENERGY GMBH [DE]) [Y] 31-38 * paragraph [0027] - paragraph [0028] * * paragraph [0032] - paragraph [0036] * * paragraph [0045] * * abstract *;
 [A]DE19739164  (INST SOLARE ENERGIEVERSORGUNGS [DE]) [A] 30-38 * page 2, line 48 - page 3, line 26 * * abstract *
Examination   - "Blattanschluss zur Rotornabe", Hau, E., Windkraftanlagen, Berlin, Springer-Verlag, (19960101), pages 206 - 209, ISBN 3-540-57430-1, XP007921063
    - Hau, E, Windturbines, Berlin, Springer-Verlag, (20000101), pages 228 - 230, XP007921062
otherDE19739164
 EP1286048
    - "pages 486-487, 492-493", Tony Burton et al, Wind Energy Handbook, John Wiley & Sons Ltd, (20010000), pages 1-9,417 - 421, XP055284733
    - BRÄNDLEIN et al., Die Wälzlagerpraxis, Vereinigte Fachverlage, (20020000), pages 1 - 29, XP055284776
    - Rothe Erde, Rothe Erde Großwälzlager Katalog, Thyssenkrupp, (20030000), vol. 7, pages 155 - 167, XP055285051
    - SKF, Große Lager Katalog 4003T, (19930000), pages 677 - 733, XP055285063
    - "pages 486-487, 492-493", Burton T. et al, Wind Energy Handbook, John Wiley, (20010000), pages 1-9,417 - 421, XP055286508

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/0470846062.ch1
    - BRÄNDLEIN et al., Die Wälzlagerpraxis. HANDBUCH FÜR DIE BERECHNUNG UND GESTALTUNG VON·LAGERUNGEN, (20020000), pages 1 - 29, XP055284776
    - Rothe Erde, "Rothe Erde Großwälzlager Katalog", Thyssenkrupp, pages 155 - 167, XP055285051
    - SKF, Große Lager Katalog 40003T, (19930000), pages 677 - 733, XP055285063
    - W. Beitz, K.H. Grote, Dubbel Taschenbuch für den Maschinenbau , Zwanzigste Auflage, Springer, (20010000), pages u38 - u43, ISBN 3-540-67777-1, XP055286860
 DE3009922
 EP1283048
    - ERICH HAU, Windturbines Fundamentals, technologies, application and economics, SPRINGER, (2000), pages 1,2,138 - 139, ISBN 3-540-57064-0, XP003027241 * Pages 228-234, 330, 457-459 *