blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

European Patent Register Assistant updated

In order to offer you the best possible learning experience we have launched an updated version of the European Patent Register Assistant online tutorial to include recent changes in the Register.

2019.08.29

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

All documents: EP1907634 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP1907634



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 1797
21.08.2019 Communication to the parties concerning the termination of the opposition proceedings (opponent) Opposition 1
21.08.2019 Communication to the parties concerning the termination of the opposition proceedings (proprietor) Opposition 1
16.08.2019 Termination of the opposition proceedings with revocation of patent Opposition 1
23.05.2019 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
20.05.2019 Advice of delivery Opposition 2
09.05.2019 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
08.05.2019 Advice of delivery Opposition 2
06.05.2019 Acknowledgement of a document Search / examination 1
06.05.2019 Acknowledgement of a document Search / examination 1
06.05.2019 Decision revoking the European patent Opposition 2
06.05.2019 Decision revoking the European patent Opposition 2
03.05.2019 Notification concerning the date of oral proceedings Opposition 1
03.05.2019 Notification concerning the date of oral proceedings Opposition 1
29.04.2019 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
29.04.2019 Communication of amended entries concerning the representative Opposition 1
23.04.2019 (Electronic) Receipt Opposition 1
23.04.2019 Authorisation of representative Opposition 1
23.04.2019 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Opposition 1
23.04.2019 Request for revocation of patent Opposition 2
28.01.2019 Advice of delivery Opposition 2
24.01.2019 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
21.01.2019 Advice of delivery Opposition 2
21.01.2019 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
16.01.2019 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
16.01.2019 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
16.01.2019 Annex to the communication - opposition Opposition 11
16.01.2019 Information concerning oral proceedings Opposition 3
16.01.2019 Summons to attend oral proceedings Opposition 1
16.01.2019 Summons to attend oral proceedings Opposition 1
09.01.2019 Information about the result of oral proceedings Opposition 1
18.06.2018 Communication from the Legal Division Search / examination 2
01.06.2018 Communication from the Legal Division Opposition 2
27.02.2018 Communication from the Legal Division Search / examination 4
27.02.2018 Communication from the Legal Division Search / examination 4
27.02.2018 Communication from the Legal Division Search / examination 3
27.02.2018 Communication from the Legal Division Search / examination 4
27.02.2018 Communication from the Legal Division Search / examination 4
14.01.2016 Letter to the Legal Division Opposition 28
26.11.2015 Letter relating to the automatic debiting procedure Opposition 1
16.11.2015 Communication from the Legal Division Opposition 2
16.11.2015 Communication from the Legal Division Opposition 2
28.09.2015 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
25.09.2015 Advice of delivery Appeal 2
25.09.2015 Advice of delivery Appeal 2
24.09.2015 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
24.09.2015 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
23.09.2015 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
23.09.2015 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
22.09.2015 Decision of the Board of Appeal Appeal 23
22.09.2015 F3032 Notification(s) of the decision Appeal 1
22.09.2015 F3032 Notification(s) of the decision Appeal 1
18.09.2015 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
17.09.2015 Decision of the Board of Appeal Appeal 23
17.09.2015 F3032 Notification(s) of the decision Appeal 1
17.09.2015 F3032 Notification(s) of the decision Appeal 1
17.07.2015 F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes Appeal 14
12.06.2015 F3004 Communication of the Registry Appeal 3
11.06.2015 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 2
10.06.2015 F3004 Communication of the Registry Appeal 2
09.06.2015 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 75
09.04.2015 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
08.04.2015 Advice of delivery Appeal 2
08.04.2015 Advice of delivery Appeal 2
07.04.2015 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
31.03.2015 F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons Appeal 2
31.03.2015 F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons Appeal 2
27.03.2015 F3010 Oral proceedings: order for summons Appeal 1
12.03.2015 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
09.03.2015 Reply to appeal Appeal 25
28.10.2014 F3344 Setting time limit for reply/ file observations to appeal (inter partes) Appeal 1
23.10.2014 F3203 Composition of the Board (J) Appeal 1
15.10.2014 F3204 Communication of the file number to the parties Appeal 1
15.10.2014 F3204 Communication of the file number to the parties Appeal 1
25.09.2014 Statement of grounds of appeal Appeal 26
08.09.2014 Statement of grounds of appeal Appeal 26
08.09.2014 Statement of grounds of appeal Appeal 26
08.07.2014 Letter concerning fees and payments Appeal 1
08.07.2014 Notice of appeal Appeal 4
28.04.2014 Annex Opposition 14
28.04.2014 Annex Opposition 14
28.04.2014 Communication from the Legal Division Opposition 13
28.04.2014 Communication from the Legal Division Opposition 13
17.12.2013 Matter concerning the application Opposition 1
19.11.2013 Document concerning representation Search / examination 1
08.07.2013 Communication from the Legal Division Opposition 6
08.07.2013 Communication from the Legal Division Opposition 6
14.08.2012 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
07.08.2012 Reply of the patent proprietor to the notice(s) of opposition Opposition 16
06.08.2012 Reply of the patent proprietor to the notice(s) of opposition Opposition 16
03.08.2012 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
03.08.2012 Grant of extension of time limit (opposition procedure) Opposition 1
30.07.2012 Request for extension of time limit Opposition 1
24.07.2012 Letter to the Legal Division Opposition 365
24.07.2012 Letter to the Legal Division Opposition 365
14.05.2012 Communication from the Legal Division Opposition 2
20.03.2012 Communication of a notice of opposition and request to file observations Opposition 1
20.03.2012 Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) Opposition 1
23.02.2012 Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor Opposition 1
17.02.2012 Letter to the Legal Division Opposition 2
17.02.2012 Letter to the Legal Division Opposition 2
17.02.2012 Letter to the Legal Division Opposition 2
13.02.2012 Brief communication to third party Opposition 1
10.02.2012 (Electronic) Receipt Opposition 2
10.02.2012 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 7
10.02.2012 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 9
10.02.2012 Notice of opposition Opposition 26
10.02.2012 Notice of opposition Opposition 6
10.02.2012 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 12
10.02.2012 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 7
10.02.2012 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 4
10.02.2012 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 4
10.02.2012 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 4
10.02.2012 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 6
10.02.2012 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 4
10.02.2012 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 8
10.02.2012 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 3
10.02.2012 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 4
10.02.2012 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 10
10.02.2012 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 7
06.02.2012 Letter to the Legal Division Opposition 3
05.02.2012 Letter to the Legal Division Opposition 3
06.12.2011 Annex Opposition 2
06.12.2011 Communication from the Legal Division Opposition 2
06.12.2011 Communication from the Legal Division Opposition 2
01.12.2011 Letter to the Legal Division Opposition 1
01.12.2011 Letter to the Legal Division Opposition 4
18.11.2011 Letter to the Legal Division Opposition 9
17.11.2011 Letter to the Legal Division Opposition 27
10.11.2011 Communication from the Legal Division Opposition 2
02.11.2011 Communication from the Legal Division Opposition 1
02.11.2011 Communication from the Legal Division Opposition 1
21.10.2011 Letter to the Legal Division Opposition 29
19.09.2011 Brief communication to applicant Opposition 1
19.09.2011 Communication from the Legal Division Opposition 2
19.08.2011 Letter to the Legal Division Opposition 102
14.04.2011 Decision to grant a European patent Search / examination 2
04.04.2011 English translation of the claims Search / examination 4
04.04.2011 Filing of the translations of the claims Search / examination 2
04.04.2011 French translation of claims Search / examination 5
25.03.2011 English translation of the claims Search / examination 4
25.03.2011 Filing of the translations of the claims Search / examination 2
25.03.2011 French translation of claims Search / examination 5
25.03.2011 Payment of fees and costs Search / examination 1
31.01.2011 Letter concerning fees and payments Search / examination 1
15.11.2010 Bibliographic data of the European patent application Search / examination 2
15.11.2010 Communication about intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 4
15.11.2010 Intention to grant (signatures) Search / examination 1
15.11.2010 Text intended for grant Search / examination 29
03.09.2010 Notice drawing attention to the payment of the renewal fee and additional fee Search / examination 2
26.07.2010 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 1
26.07.2010 Claims Search / examination 1
26.07.2010 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 9
29.06.2010 Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address Search / examination 1
23.06.2010 Request for transfer of rights - applicant Search / examination 9
23.06.2010 Request for transfer of rights - applicant Search / examination 9
05.05.2010 Document concerning representation Search / examination 1
14.01.2010 Annex to the communication Search / examination 2
14.01.2010 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
31.07.2009 Letter concerning fees and payments Search / examination 1
03.09.2008 Notice drawing attention to the payment of the renewal fee and additional fee Search / examination 1
13.05.2008 Document concerning representation Search / examination 1
12.03.2008 Notification on forthcoming publication of bibliographic data Search / examination 1
11.03.2008 Communication regarding possible amendment of claims/payment of claims fees Search / examination 2
01.02.2008 Request for entry into the European phase Search / examination 6
29.01.2008 Copy of the international preliminary report on patentability Search / examination 5
04.12.2007 Letter which had not been notified Search / examination 4
23.11.2007 Information on entry into European phase Search / examination 3
19.04.2007 Copy of the international search report Search / examination 3
19.04.2007 Copy of the international search report Search / examination 3
19.04.2007 International publication of the international search report Search / examination 2
05.02.2007 Priority document (electronically transmitted) Search / examination 32
05.02.2007 Priority document (electronically transmitted) Search / examination 31
18.01.2007 International publication of the A2 Pamphlet Search / examination 30
12.07.2006 Abstract PCT receiving Office 1
12.07.2006 Claims PCT receiving Office 4
12.07.2006 Description PCT receiving Office 18
12.07.2006 Drawings PCT receiving Office 6