blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

European Patent Register Assistant updated

In order to offer you the best possible learning experience we have launched an updated version of the European Patent Register Assistant online tutorial to include recent changes in the Register.

2019.08.29

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

Event history: EP1907634


Date  Description European Patent Bulletin date, issue number
23.08.2019 Revocation of patent published on  25.09.2019 [2019/39]
05.05.2019 New entry: Despatch of communication that patent is revoked
26.04.2019 New entry: Date of cancellation oral proceedings
24.04.2019 Change - representative
15.01.2019 New entry: Date of oral proceedings
10.01.2019 Deletion: Date of oral proceedings
10.01.2019 Deletion: Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
25.06.2018 Change - representative
01.06.2018 Change - applicant published on  04.07.2018  [2018/27]
02.03.2018 Resumption published on  04.04.2018  [2018/14]
20.05.2016 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  22.06.2016  [2016/25]
06.05.2016 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  08.06.2016  [2016/23]
11.03.2016 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  13.04.2016  [2016/15]
13.11.2015 Stay published on  16.12.2015  [2015/51]
06.11.2015 Change - representative
06.11.2015 Change - applicant published on  09.12.2015  [2015/50]
16.07.2015 New entry: Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
10.07.2015 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  12.08.2015  [2015/33]
31.03.2015 New entry: Date of oral proceedings
11.10.2014 Change: Appeal number
10.10.2014 New entry: Appeal number
10.10.2014 Deletion: Appeal number
04.10.2013 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  06.11.2013  [2013/45]
27.09.2013 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  30.10.2013  [2013/44]
28.06.2013 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  31.07.2013  [2013/31]
14.06.2013 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  17.07.2013  [2013/29]
10.08.2012 New entry: Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
31.07.2012 Change: Communication of a notice of opposition and request to file observations + time limit
13.03.2012 New entry: Communication of a notice of opposition and request to file observations + time limit
24.02.2012 Opposition filed published on  28.03.2012  [2012/13]
10.02.2012 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  14.03.2012  [2012/11]
03.02.2012 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  07.03.2012  [2012/10]
27.01.2012 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  29.02.2012  [2012/09]
20.01.2012 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  22.02.2012  [2012/08]
23.12.2011 Change - applicant published on  25.01.2012  [2012/04]
23.12.2011 Change - representative published on  25.01.2012  [2012/04]
09.12.2011 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  11.01.2012  [2012/02]
02.12.2011 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  04.01.2012  [2012/01]
25.11.2011 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  28.12.2011  [2011/52]
18.11.2011 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  21.12.2011  [2011/51]
11.11.2011 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  14.12.2011  [2011/50]
04.11.2011 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  07.12.2011  [2011/49]
28.10.2011 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  30.11.2011  [2011/48]
21.10.2011 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  23.11.2011  [2011/47]
08.04.2011 (Expected) grant published on  11.05.2011  [2011/19]
08.04.2011 Deletion: Payment of fee for grant
08.04.2011 Deletion: Payment of fee for publishing/printing
08.04.2011 New entry: Payment of fee for grant
08.04.2011 New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing
01.04.2011 New entry: Payment of fee for grant
01.04.2011 New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing
08.02.2011 New entry: Additional fee for renewal fee: payment of fee
08.02.2011 New entry: Renewal fee paid
05.11.2010 Change - extension states published on  08.12.2010  [2010/49]
02.11.2010 New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent
31.08.2010 New entry: Additional fee for renewal fee: despatch of communication + time limit
29.07.2010 New entry: Reply to examination report
25.06.2010 Change - applicant published on  28.07.2010  [2010/30]
15.01.2010 First examination report
12.01.2010 New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit
07.08.2009 New entry: Renewal fee paid
10.02.2009 New entry: Additional fee for renewal fee: payment of fee
10.02.2009 New entry: Renewal fee paid
30.08.2008 New entry: Additional fee for renewal fee: despatch of communication + time limit
07.03.2008 Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin published on  09.04.2008  [2008/15]
07.03.2008 Request for examination filed published on  09.04.2008  [2008/15]
22.02.2008 PCT data prior to European publication
10.05.2007 PCT data prior to European publication
17.03.2007 PCT data prior to European publication
20.01.2007 PCT data prior to European publication
21.09.2006 PCT data prior to European publication