blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

European Patent Register Assistant updated

In order to offer you the best possible learning experience we have launched an updated version of the European Patent Register Assistant online tutorial to include recent changes in the Register.

2019.08.29

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

Patent family: EP1907634
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
US7566190Global Dossier 28.07.2009B2
US2008175674 24.07.2008A1
Priority number Date
DE102005037027 05.08.2005
DE102005032443 12.07.2005
WO2006EP06827 12.07.2006
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
EP1907634Global Dossier 11.05.2011B1
EP1907634 09.04.2008A2
Priority number Date
DE102005037027 05.08.2005
DE102005032443 12.07.2005
WO2006EP06827 12.07.2006
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
AT509161T 15.05.2011T
Priority number Date
DE102005037027 05.08.2005
DE102005032443 12.07.2005
WO2006EP06827 12.07.2006
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
DE202006020139U 18.10.2007U1
Priority number Date
DE102005037027 05.08.2005
DE202006020139 12.07.2006
DE102005032443 12.07.2005
WO2006EP06827 12.07.2006
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
DE202006021136U 06.12.2012U1
Priority number Date
DE102005037027 05.08.2005
DE102005032443 12.07.2005
DE202006021136 12.07.2006
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
EA012831 30.12.2009B1
EA200800288 30.06.2008A1
Priority number Date
DE102005037027 05.08.2005
DE102005032443 12.07.2005
WO2006EP06827 12.07.2006
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
WO2007006567Global Dossier 19.04.2007A3
WO2007006567 18.01.2007A2
Priority number Date
DE102005037027 05.08.2005
DE102005032443 12.07.2005
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
DE102005037027 25.01.2007A1
Priority number Date
DE102005037027 05.08.2005
DE102005032443 12.07.2005
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
DE202005021372U 22.11.2007U1
Priority number Date
DE102005037027 05.08.2005
DE102005032443 12.07.2005