blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

European Patent Register Assistant updated

In order to offer you the best possible learning experience we have launched an updated version of the European Patent Register Assistant online tutorial to include recent changes in the Register.

2019.08.29

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

Legal status: EP1907634

Designated contracting states ATLapse: 12.07.2012
 BELapse: 31.07.2012
 BGLapse: 11.08.2011
 CHLapse: 31.07.2012
CYLapse: 11.05.2011
 CZLapse: 11.05.2011
 DE 
 DKLapse: 11.05.2011
 EELapse: 11.05.2011
 ESLapse: 22.08.2011
 FILapse: 11.05.2011
 FRLapse: 31.07.2015
 GBLapse: 12.07.2015
 GRLapse: 12.08.2011
 HULapse: 11.05.2011
 IELapse: 11.05.2011
 ISLapse: 11.09.2011
 ITLapse: 11.05.2011
 LILapse: 31.07.2012
 LTLapse: 11.05.2011
 LULapse: 12.07.2015
LVLapse: 11.05.2011
 MCLapse: 31.07.2012
 NLLapse: 01.02.2013
 PLLapse: 11.05.2011
 PTLapse: 12.09.2011
 ROLapse: 11.05.2011
 SELapse: 11.05.2011
 SILapse: 11.05.2011
 SKLapse: 11.05.2011
 TRLapse: 11.05.2011
Examination procedure25.03.2011Fee for publishing/printing paid
Entry into regional phase11.02.2008National basic fee paid 
11.02.2008Designation fee(s) paid 
11.02.2008Examination fee paid 
Fees paidRenewal fee
30.01.2009Renewal fee patent year 03
31.07.2009Renewal fee patent year 04
31.01.2011Renewal fee patent year 05
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.07.200803   M06   Fee paid on   30.01.2009
31.07.201005   M06   Fee paid on   31.01.2011
European patent granted11.05.2011
Opposition procedure23.10.2019Date of oral proceedings 
Appeal following opposition08.07.2014APPEAL FILED
08.09.2014APPEAL STATEMENT OF GROUNDS FILED
INPADOC data   TooltipThe EPO does not accept any responsibility for the accuracy of legal status data relating to the post-grant phase, including but not limited to their completeness and fitness for specific purposes, nor can it guarantee that such data are up to date. For authoritative information, please refer to the relevant national patent authority.
Event date:09.04.2008 
Event description:REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED
Effective DATE:20080211
 
Event date:09.04.2008 
Event description:DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES
Kind Code of Ref Document:A2
Designated State(s):AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR
 
Event date:17.02.2010 
Event description:FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT DESPATCHED
Effective DATE:20100114
 
Event date:28.07.2010 
Event description:RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION TRANSFERRED
Owner Name:CONTEXO AG
 
Event date:08.12.2010 
Event description:REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT (TO ANY COUNTRY) (DELETED)
 
Event date:11.05.2011 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG GB FG4D
Code Expl.:+EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED
Free Format Text:NOT ENGLISH
 
Event date:11.05.2011 
Event description:DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES
Kind Code of Ref Document:B1
Designated State(s):AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR
 
Event date:13.05.2011 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG CH EP
Code Expl.:+EUROPEAN PATENT TAKES EFFECT AS A NATIONAL PATENT IN CH/LI
 
Event date:08.06.2011 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG IE FG4D
Code Expl.:+EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND
 
Event date:22.06.2011 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG DE R096 502006009488 DE
Code Expl.:+DPMA PUBLICATION OF MENTIONED EP PATENT GRANT
Effective DATE:20110622
 
Event date:07.09.2011 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG NL VDEP
Code Expl.:-INVALID IN THE NETHERLANDS AS NO TRANSLATION HAS BEEN FILED
Effective DATE:20110511
 
Event date:14.09.2011 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG NL BK
Code Expl.: ERRATUM
Free Format Text:ONTERECHT VERVALLEN OP 01.03.2011 WEGENS NIET BETALEN JAARTAKSPUBLICATIE VERVAL I.E. 2011/11 UITGEGEVEN 16.03.2011
 
Event date:14.09.2011 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG NL T3
Code Expl.:+TRANSLATION FILES FOR AN EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED FOR NL, CONFIRMING ART. 52 PAR. 1 OR 6 OF THE PATENTS ACT 1995
 
Event date:31.10.2011 
Event description:LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:PT
Free Format Text:LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT
Effective DATE:20110912
 
Event date:31.10.2011 
Event description:LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:SE
Free Format Text:LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT
Effective DATE:20110511
 
Event date:31.10.2011 
Event description:LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:LT
Free Format Text:LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT
Effective DATE:20110511
 
Event date:30.11.2011 
Event description:LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:FI
Free Format Text:LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT
Effective DATE:20110511
 
Event date:30.11.2011 
Event description:LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:LV
Free Format Text:LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT
Effective DATE:20110511
 
Event date:30.11.2011 
Event description:LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:SI
Free Format Text:LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT
Effective DATE:20110511
 
Event date:30.11.2011 
Event description:LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:CY
Free Format Text:LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT
Effective DATE:20110511
 
Event date:30.11.2011 
Event description:LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:ES
Free Format Text:LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT
Effective DATE:20110822
 
Event date:30.11.2011 
Event description:LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:GR
Free Format Text:LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT
Effective DATE:20110812
 
Event date:30.11.2011 
Event description:LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:IS
Free Format Text:LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT
Effective DATE:20110911
 
Event date:30.11.2011 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:ES
Payment DATE:20110729
Year of Fee Payment:06
 
Event date:07.12.2011 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG IE FD4D
Code Expl.:-EUROPEAN PATENTS DESIGNATING IRELAND TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID
 
Event date:30.12.2011 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:NL
Payment DATE:20110801
Year of Fee Payment:06
 
Event date:25.01.2012 
Event description:RIGHTS OF A PATENT TRANSFERRED
Owner Name:PILEPRO LLC
 
Event date:31.01.2012 
Event description:LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:EE
Free Format Text:LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT
Effective DATE:20110511
 
Event date:31.01.2012 
Event description:LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:IE
Free Format Text:LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT
Effective DATE:20110511
 
Event date:31.01.2012 
Event description:LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:CZ
Free Format Text:LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT
Effective DATE:20110511
 
Event date:29.02.2012 
Event description:LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:DK
Free Format Text:LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT
Effective DATE:20110511
 
Event date:29.02.2012 
Event description:LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:SK
Free Format Text:LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT
Effective DATE:20110511
 
Event date:29.02.2012 
Event description:LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:PL
Free Format Text:LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT
Effective DATE:20110511
 
Event date:29.02.2012 
Event description:LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:RO
Free Format Text:LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT
Effective DATE:20110511
 
Event date:28.03.2012 
Event description:OPPOSITION FILED
Opponent Name:ARCELORMITTAL BELVAL & DIFFERDANGE S.A.
Effective DATE:20120210
 
Event date:30.04.2012 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:CH
Payment DATE:20120110
Year of Fee Payment:06
 
Event date:30.04.2012 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:MC
Payment DATE:20120112
Year of Fee Payment:07
 
Event date:16.05.2012 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG DE R026 502006009488 DE
Code Expl.:-OPPOSITION FILED AGAINST PATENT
Effective DATE:20120210
 
Event date:31.05.2012 
Event description:LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:IT
Free Format Text:LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT
Effective DATE:20110511
 
Event date:29.06.2012 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:BE
Payment DATE:20120118
Year of Fee Payment:06
 
Event date:31.01.2013 
Event description:BE: LAPSED
Owner Name:CONTEXO A.G.
Effective DATE:20120731
 
Event date:13.02.2013 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG NL V1
Code Expl.:-LAPSED BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE
Effective DATE:20130201
 
Event date:28.02.2013 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG CH PL
Code Expl.:-PATENT CEASED
 
Event date:15.03.2013 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG AT MM01 509161 AT T
Code Expl.:-LAPSE BECAUSE OF NOT PAYING ANNUAL FEES
Effective DATE:20120712
 
Event date:29.03.2013 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:AT
Payment DATE:20120126
Year of Fee Payment:06
 
Event date:30.04.2013 
Event description:LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:LI
Free Format Text:LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES
Effective DATE:20120731
 
Event date:30.04.2013 
Event description:LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:CH
Free Format Text:LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES
Effective DATE:20120731
 
Event date:30.04.2013 
Event description:LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:NL
Free Format Text:LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT
Effective DATE:20130201
 
Event date:31.05.2013 
Event description:LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:BE
Free Format Text:LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES
Effective DATE:20120731
 
Event date:28.06.2013 
Event description:LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:BG
Free Format Text:LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT
Effective DATE:20110811
 
Event date:28.06.2013 
Event description:LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:AT
Free Format Text:LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES
Effective DATE:20120712
 
Event date:30.09.2013 
Event description:LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:TR
Free Format Text:LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT
Effective DATE:20110511
 
Event date:31.10.2013 
Event description:LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:HU
Free Format Text:LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT
Effective DATE:20110511
 
Event date:29.08.2014 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:LU
Payment DATE:20140722
Year of Fee Payment:09
 
Event date:28.11.2014 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:FR
Payment DATE:20140724
Year of Fee Payment:09
 
Event date:28.11.2014 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:GB
Payment DATE:20140721
Year of Fee Payment:09
 
Event date:09.12.2015 
Event description:RIGHTS OF A PATENT TRANSFERRED
Owner Name:CONTEXO AG
 
Event date:16.12.2015 
Event description:PROCEEDINGS STAYED AFTER GRANT
Effective DATE:20150615
 
Event date:23.03.2016 
Event description:GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE
Effective DATE:20150712
 
Event date:31.03.2016 
Event description:LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:LU
Free Format Text:LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES
Effective DATE:20150712
 
Event date:29.04.2016 
Event description:LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:GB
Free Format Text:LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES
Effective DATE:20150712
 
Event date:29.04.2016 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG FR ST
Code Expl.:-NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE
Effective DATE:20160331
 
Event date:31.05.2016 
Event description:LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:FR
Free Format Text:LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES
Effective DATE:20150731
 
Event date:10.01.2017 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG DE R082 502006009488 DE
Code Expl.: CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE
Representatives Name:WEIGEL & KOLLEGEN PATENTANWAELTE, DE
 
Event date:10.01.2017 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG DE R082 502006009488 DE
Code Expl.: CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE
Representatives Name:KRIEGER MES & GRAF V. DER GROEBEN, DE
 
Event date:10.01.2017 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG DE R082 502006009488 DE
Code Expl.: CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE
Representatives Name:GIHSKE GROSSE KLUEPPEL KROSS BUEROGEMEINSCHAFT, DE
 
Event date:24.10.2017 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG DE R082 502006009488 DE
Code Expl.: CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE
Representatives Name:KRIEGER MES & GRAF V. DER GROEBEN, DE
 
Event date:24.10.2017 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG DE R081 502006009488 DE
Code Expl.: CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE
Owner Name:STEELWALL ISH GMBH, DE
Free Format Text:FORMER OWNER: CONTEXO AG, ROTKREUZ-ZUG, CH
 
Event date:24.10.2017 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG DE R082 502006009488 DE
Code Expl.: CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE
Representatives Name:GIHSKE GROSSE KLUEPPEL KROSS BUEROGEMEINSCHAFT, DE
 
Event date:04.04.2018 
Event description:PROCEEDINGS RESUMED AFTER GRANT [AFTER STAY OF PROCEEDINGS ACCORDING TO RULE 14 EPC]
Effective DATE:20180502
 
Event date:24.05.2018 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG DE R082 502006009488 DE
Code Expl.: CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE
Representatives Name:GIHSKE GROSSE KLUEPPEL KROSS BUEROGEMEINSCHAFT, DE
 
Event date:04.07.2018 
Event description:RIGHTS OF A PATENT TRANSFERRED
Owner Name:STEELWALL ISH GMBH
 
Event date:31.10.2018 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:DE
Payment DATE:20180723
Year of Fee Payment:13
 
Event date:16.05.2019 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG DE R103 502006009488 DE
Code Expl.:-PATENT REVOKED BY EPO
 
Event date:16.05.2019 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG DE R064 502006009488 DE
Code Expl.:-EPO'S REVOCATION DECISION NOW FINAL