Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1907634

EP1907634 - CONNECTING PROFILED ELEMENT FOR CONNECTING SHEET PILES TO CARRIER ELEMENTS, AND COMBINED-BULK HEAD COMPRISING SAID TYPE OF CONNECTING PROFILED ELEMENT [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusPatent revoked
Status updated on  23.08.2019
Database last updated on 24.08.2019
FormerThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  05.05.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip23.08.2019Revocation of patentpublished on 25.09.2019 [2019/39]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
SteelWall ISH GmbH
Tassilostrasse 21
82166 Gräfelfing / DE
[2018/27]
Former [2015/50]For all designated states
Contexo AG
Birkenmatt 1
6343 Rotkreuz-Zug / CH
Former [2012/04]For all designated states
PilePro LLC
1601 Mount Rushmore Road, Suite 3-263
Rapid City, SD 57701 / US
Former [2010/30]For all designated states
Contexo AG
Birkenmatt 1
6343 Rotkreuz-Zug / CH
Former [2008/15]For all designated states
PilePro LLC
1601 Mount Rushmore Road, Suite 3-263
Rapid City, SD 57701 / US
Inventor(s)01 / HEINDL, Richard
Wotanstrasse 109
80639 München / DE
 [2008/15]
Representative(s)Klüppel, Walter , et al
Gihske Große Klüppel Kross
Bürogemeinschaft von Patentanwälten
Hammerstraße 3
57072 Siegen / DE
[N/P]
Former [2012/04]Eisenführ, Speiser & Partner , et al
Johannes-Brahms-Platz 1
20355 Hamburg / DE
Former [2008/15]Weigel, Matthias , et al
Patentanwalt Heimeranstrasse 35
80339 München / DE
Application number, filing date06762559.012.07.2006
[2008/15]
WO2006EP06827
Priority number, dateDE2005103244312.07.2005         Original published format: DE102005032443
DE2005103702705.08.2005         Original published format: DE102005037027
[2008/15]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A2  Application without search report
No.:WO2007006567
Date:18.01.2007
Language:DE
[2007/03]
Type: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1907634
Date:09.04.2008
Language:DE
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 18.01.2007
[2008/15]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1907634
Date:11.05.2011
Language:DE
[2011/19]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP19.04.2007
ClassificationInternational:E02D5/08
[2008/15]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   NL,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2008/15]
Extension statesALNot yet paid
BANot yet paid
HRNot yet paid
MKNot yet paid
RSNot yet paid
TitleGerman:VERBINDUNGSPROFIL ZUM ANSCHLIEßEN VON SPUNDBOHLEN AN TRÄGERELEMENTE SOWIE KOMBI-SPUNDWAND MIT EINEM DERARTIGEN VERBINDUNGSPROFIL[2008/15]
English:CONNECTING PROFILED ELEMENT FOR CONNECTING SHEET PILES TO CARRIER ELEMENTS, AND COMBINED-BULK HEAD COMPRISING SAID TYPE OF CONNECTING PROFILED ELEMENT[2008/15]
French:PROFILE DE LIAISON SERVANT A FIXER DES PALPLANCHES SUR DES ELEMENTS DE SUPPORT, ET CLOISON DE PALPLANCHES COMBINEE EQUIPEE DE CE PROFILE DE LIAISON[2008/15]
Entry into regional phase11.02.2008National basic fee paid 
11.02.2008Designation fee(s) paid 
11.02.2008Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure11.02.2008Examination requested  [2008/15]
14.01.2010Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
26.07.2010Reply to a communication from the examining division
15.11.2010Communication of intention to grant the patent
25.03.2011Fee for grant paid
25.03.2011Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  10.02.2012  20.02.2012  ADMISSIBLE
ArcelorMittal Belval & Differdange S.A.
Research Centre- Industrial Property Department 66, rue de Luxembourg
4221 Esch-sur-Alzette / LU
Opponent's representative
Pronovem, et al
Pronovem Luxembourg
12, avenue du Rock n' Roll
BP 327
4004 Esch sur Alzette / LU
 [N/P]
Former [2012/13]
Opponent(s)01  10.02.2012  20.02.2012  ADMISSIBLE
ArcelorMittal Belval & Differdange S.A.
Research Centre- Industrial Property Department 66, rue de Luxembourg
4221 Esch-sur-Alzette / LU
Opponent's representative
pronovem, et al
Meyers & Van Malderen 261, route d'Arlon B.P. 111
8002 Strassen / LU
20.03.2012Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
06.08.2012Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
23.04.2019Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 23.10.2019
06.05.2019Despatch of communication that the patent will be revoked
16.05.2019Legal effect of revocation of patent [2019/39]
23.10.2019Date of oral proceedings
Appeal following opposition08.07.2014Appeal received No.  J0018/14
08.09.2014Statement of grounds filed
15.06.2015Date of oral proceedings
17.07.2015Minutes of the oral proceedings despatched
Fees paidRenewal fee
30.01.2009Renewal fee patent year 03
31.07.2009Renewal fee patent year 04
31.01.2011Renewal fee patent year 05
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.07.200803   M06   Fee paid on   30.01.2009
31.07.201005   M06   Fee paid on   31.01.2011
Stay/Interruption15.06.2015Stay of proceedings[2015/51]
15.06.2015Stay of proceedings[2018/14]
02.05.2018Resumption of proceedings[2018/14]
Lapses during opposition  TooltipCY11.05.2011
CZ11.05.2011
DK11.05.2011
EE11.05.2011
FI11.05.2011
HU11.05.2011
IE11.05.2011
IT11.05.2011
LT11.05.2011
LV11.05.2011
PL11.05.2011
RO11.05.2011
SE11.05.2011
SI11.05.2011
SK11.05.2011
TR11.05.2011
BG11.08.2011
GR12.08.2011
ES22.08.2011
IS11.09.2011
PT12.09.2011
AT12.07.2012
BE31.07.2012
CH31.07.2012
LI31.07.2012
MC31.07.2012
NL01.02.2013
GB12.07.2015
LU12.07.2015
FR31.07.2015
[2016/25]
Former [2016/23]CY11.05.2011
CZ11.05.2011
DK11.05.2011
EE11.05.2011
FI11.05.2011
HU11.05.2011
IE11.05.2011
IT11.05.2011
LT11.05.2011
LV11.05.2011
PL11.05.2011
RO11.05.2011
SE11.05.2011
SI11.05.2011
SK11.05.2011
TR11.05.2011
BG11.08.2011
GR12.08.2011
ES22.08.2011
IS11.09.2011
PT12.09.2011
AT12.07.2012
BE31.07.2012
CH31.07.2012
LI31.07.2012
MC31.07.2012
NL01.02.2013
GB12.07.2015
LU12.07.2015
Former [2016/15]CY11.05.2011
CZ11.05.2011
DK11.05.2011
EE11.05.2011
FI11.05.2011
HU11.05.2011
IE11.05.2011
IT11.05.2011
LT11.05.2011
LV11.05.2011
PL11.05.2011
RO11.05.2011
SE11.05.2011
SI11.05.2011
SK11.05.2011
TR11.05.2011
BG11.08.2011
GR12.08.2011
ES22.08.2011
IS11.09.2011
PT12.09.2011
AT12.07.2012
BE31.07.2012
CH31.07.2012
LI31.07.2012
MC31.07.2012
NL01.02.2013
LU12.07.2015
Former [2013/45]CY11.05.2011
CZ11.05.2011
DK11.05.2011
EE11.05.2011
FI11.05.2011
HU11.05.2011
IE11.05.2011
IT11.05.2011
LT11.05.2011
LV11.05.2011
PL11.05.2011
RO11.05.2011
SE11.05.2011
SI11.05.2011
SK11.05.2011
TR11.05.2011
BG11.08.2011
GR12.08.2011
ES22.08.2011
IS11.09.2011
PT12.09.2011
AT12.07.2012
BE31.07.2012
CH31.07.2012
LI31.07.2012
MC31.07.2012
NL01.02.2013
Former [2013/44]CY11.05.2011
CZ11.05.2011
DK11.05.2011
EE11.05.2011
FI11.05.2011
IE11.05.2011
IT11.05.2011
LT11.05.2011
LV11.05.2011
PL11.05.2011
RO11.05.2011
SE11.05.2011
SI11.05.2011
SK11.05.2011
TR11.05.2011
BG11.08.2011
GR12.08.2011
ES22.08.2011
IS11.09.2011
PT12.09.2011
AT12.07.2012
BE31.07.2012
CH31.07.2012
LI31.07.2012
MC31.07.2012
NL01.02.2013
Former [2013/31]CY11.05.2011
CZ11.05.2011
DK11.05.2011
EE11.05.2011
FI11.05.2011
IE11.05.2011
IT11.05.2011
LT11.05.2011
LV11.05.2011
PL11.05.2011
RO11.05.2011
SE11.05.2011
SI11.05.2011
SK11.05.2011
BG11.08.2011
GR12.08.2011
ES22.08.2011
IS11.09.2011
PT12.09.2011
AT12.07.2012
BE31.07.2012
CH31.07.2012
LI31.07.2012
MC31.07.2012
NL01.02.2013
Former [2013/29]CY11.05.2011
CZ11.05.2011
DK11.05.2011
EE11.05.2011
FI11.05.2011
IE11.05.2011
IT11.05.2011
LT11.05.2011
LV11.05.2011
PL11.05.2011
RO11.05.2011
SE11.05.2011
SI11.05.2011
SK11.05.2011
BG11.08.2011
GR12.08.2011
ES22.08.2011
IS11.09.2011
PT12.09.2011
BE31.07.2012
CH31.07.2012
LI31.07.2012
MC31.07.2012
NL01.02.2013
Former [2012/11]CY11.05.2011
CZ11.05.2011
DK11.05.2011
EE11.05.2011
FI11.05.2011
IE11.05.2011
LT11.05.2011
LV11.05.2011
NL11.05.2011
PL11.05.2011
RO11.05.2011
SE11.05.2011
SI11.05.2011
SK11.05.2011
GR12.08.2011
ES22.08.2011
IS11.09.2011
PT12.09.2011
Former [2012/10]CY11.05.2011
CZ11.05.2011
DK11.05.2011
EE11.05.2011
FI11.05.2011
IE11.05.2011
LT11.05.2011
LV11.05.2011
NL11.05.2011
RO11.05.2011
SE11.05.2011
SI11.05.2011
SK11.05.2011
GR12.08.2011
ES22.08.2011
IS11.09.2011
PT12.09.2011
Former [2012/09]CY11.05.2011
CZ11.05.2011
EE11.05.2011
FI11.05.2011
IE11.05.2011
LT11.05.2011
LV11.05.2011
NL11.05.2011
SE11.05.2011
SI11.05.2011
GR12.08.2011
ES22.08.2011
IS11.09.2011
PT12.09.2011
PL26.09.2011
Former [2012/08]CY11.05.2011
EE11.05.2011
FI11.05.2011
IE11.05.2011
LT11.05.2011
LV11.05.2011
NL11.05.2011
SE11.05.2011
SI11.05.2011
GR12.08.2011
ES22.08.2011
IS11.09.2011
PT12.09.2011
PL26.09.2011
Former [2012/01]CY11.05.2011
FI11.05.2011
LT11.05.2011
LV11.05.2011
NL11.05.2011
SE11.05.2011
SI11.05.2011
GR12.08.2011
ES22.08.2011
IS11.09.2011
PT12.09.2011
PL26.09.2011
Former [2011/50]CY11.05.2011
FI11.05.2011
LT11.05.2011
LV11.05.2011
SE11.05.2011
SI11.05.2011
GR12.08.2011
ES22.08.2011
IS11.09.2011
PT12.09.2011
PL26.09.2011
Former [2011/49]CY11.05.2011
FI11.05.2011
LT11.05.2011
SE11.05.2011
GR12.08.2011
ES22.08.2011
PT12.09.2011
Former [2011/48]LT11.05.2011
SE11.05.2011
PT12.09.2011
Former [2011/47]LT11.05.2011
PT12.09.2011
Cited inInternational search[X]DE19851877  (WALL GEORG [DE]) [X] 1,2,4,8,13-15 * column 4, line 10 - column 6, line 21; figure 2 *;
 [A]WO0235010  (ISPC SARL [LU]; REINARD CHARLES [LU]; MASCARIN MARCO [CH]) [A] 1-18 * page 6, paragraph 2 - page 9, paragraph 5; figures 1,2 *;
 [A]GB1174430  (CT DE RECH S DE PONT A MOUSSON [FR]) [A] 1-18 * the whole document *;
 [X]DE29718052U  (KRUPP AG HOESCH KRUPP [DE]; PREUSSAG STAHL AG [DE]) [X] 1,16 * figure 1 *