EP2024992 - METHOD FOR SMOOTHING III-N SUBSTRATES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 05.01.2018 Database last updated on 28.03.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 27.01.2017 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 02.11.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.01.2018 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 07.02.2018 [2018/06] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Freiberger Compound Materials GmbH Am Junger Löwe Schacht 5 09599 Freiberg / DE | [2009/08] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HÖLZIG, Stefan Friedmar-Brendel-Weg 19 09599 Freiberg / DE | 02 /
LEIBIGER, Gunnar Dr.-Külz-Str. 7 09599 Freiberg / DE | [2009/08] | Representative(s) | Prüfer & Partner mbB Patentanwälte · Rechtsanwälte Sohnckestraße 12 81479 München / DE | [2017/09] |
Former [2009/08] | Prüfer & Partner GbR European Patent Attorneys Sohnckestraße 12 81479 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 06762845.3 | 26.07.2006 | [2009/08] | WO2006EP07413 | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2008011897 | Date: | 31.01.2008 | Language: | DE | [2008/05] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2024992 | Date: | 18.02.2009 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 31.01.2008 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2009/08] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2024992 | Date: | 01.03.2017 | Language: | DE | [2017/09] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 31.01.2008 | Classification | IPC: | H01L21/304, H01L21/306, C09G1/02, C09K3/14 | [2016/47] | CPC: |
C09G1/02 (EP);
C30B33/00 (KR);
C09K3/1409 (EP);
C30B29/38 (KR);
H01L21/02024 (EP);
H01L21/304 (KR);
H01L21/30625 (EP)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2009/08] | H01L21/304, H01L21/306, C30B33/00 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, PL [2017/09] |
Former [2009/35] | DE, FR, GB, PL | ||
Former [2009/08] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUM GLÄTTEN VON III-N-SUBSTRATEN | [2009/08] | English: | METHOD FOR SMOOTHING III-N SUBSTRATES | [2009/08] | French: | PROCEDE DE LISSAGE DE SUBSTRATS III-N | [2016/47] |
Former [2009/08] | PROCEDE DE LISSAGE DE III-N-SUBSTRATS | Entry into regional phase | 09.12.2008 | National basic fee paid | 09.12.2008 | Designation fee(s) paid | 09.12.2008 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 09.12.2008 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 09.12.2008 | Examination requested [2009/08] | 27.02.2009 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 07.04.2009 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | 05.04.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 03.08.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.10.2016 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 16.11.2016 | 03.11.2016 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 16.11.2016 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | 12.01.2017 | Fee for grant paid | 12.01.2017 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 12.01.2017 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | EP16201978.0 / EP3157045 | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 05.04.2011 | Opposition(s) | 04.12.2017 | No opposition filed within time limit [2018/06] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 09.12.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.07.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.07.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 28.07.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 31.07.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 31.07.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 30.07.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 30.07.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 29.07.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 11 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]WO2006075527 (SUMITOMO ELECTRIC INDUSTRIES [JP], et al) [X] 1,3-9,12-19 * paragraphs [0025] , [0031] , [0036] , [0038] , [0046] , [0058] , [0062] *; | [E]US2006283840 (MATSUMOTO NAOKI [JP]) [E] 1,3,13,19 * the whole document *; | [X]JP2006060074 (SUMITOMO ELECTRIC INDUSTRIES) [X] 1-9,12-19 * paragraphs [0008] - [0014] - [0018] - [0048]; claims 1,4; table 4 *; | [DXA]US2002185054 (XU XUEPING [US], et al) [DX] 13,15,17-19 * paragraphs [0009] - [0012] - [0018] , [0019] , [0066] - [0074] * [A] 1,10,11; | [X]EP1431426 (NGK INSULATORS LTD [JP]) [X] 14,16-19 * paragraphs [0019] - [0036] * | [DX] - WEYHER J L ET AL, "Chemical polishing of bulk and epitaxial GaN", JOURNAL OF CRYSTAL GROWTH, ELSEVIER, AMSTERDAM, NL, (199712), vol. 182, no. 1-2, ISSN 0022-0248, pages 17 - 22, XP004100368 [DX] 13-19 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0022-0248(97)00320-5 | Examination | - MISKYS C R ET AL, "MOCVD-EPITAXY ON FREE-STANDING HVPE-GAN SUBSTRATES", PHYSICA STATUS SOLIDI (A). APPLIED RESEARCH, BERLIN, DE, (19990704), vol. 176, no. 1, doi:10.1002/(SICI)1521-396X(199911)176:1<443::AID-PSSA443>3.0.CO;2-Q, ISSN 0031-8965, pages 443 - 446, XP009049524 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/(SICI)1521-396X(199911)176:1<443::AID-PSSA443>3.0.CO;2-Q | by applicant | JP2003100373 |