Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2025201

EP2025201 - HEARING AID AND METHOD FOR OPERATING A HEARING AID [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  21.12.2012
Database last updated on 16.01.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip21.12.2012Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 23.01.2013  [2013/04]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Phonak AG
Laubisrütistrasse 28
8712 Stäfa / CH
[2009/08]
Inventor(s)01 / HASLER, Ivo
Gebhartstrasse 18c
CH-8404 Winterthur / CH
02 / AEBERSOLD, Felix
Humrigenstrasse 55
CH-8704 Herrliberg / CH
 [2009/08]
Representative(s)Werner, André
Troesch Scheidegger Werner AG
Schwäntenmos 14
8126 Zumikon / CH
[N/P]
Former [2009/08]Werner, André
Troesch Scheidegger Werner AG, Schwäntenmos 14
8126 Zumikon / CH
Application number, filing date06763219.022.05.2006
[2009/08]
WO2006EP62496
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A2  Application without search report
No.:WO2006114449
Date:02.11.2006
Language:DE
[2006/44]
Type: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP2025201
Date:18.02.2009
Language:DE
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 02.11.2006
[2009/08]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP19.04.2007
ClassificationInternational:H04R25/00
[2009/08]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   NL,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2009/08]
TitleGerman:HÖRGERÄT UND VERFAHREN ZUM BETRIEB EINES HÖRGERÄTES[2009/08]
English:HEARING AID AND METHOD FOR OPERATING A HEARING AID[2009/08]
French:APPAREIL AUDITIF ET PROCEDE D'UTILISATION[2009/08]
Entry into regional phase18.09.2008National basic fee paid 
18.09.2008Designation fee(s) paid 
18.09.2008Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure18.09.2008Examination requested  [2009/08]
27.03.2012Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
07.08.2012Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2013/04]
12.09.2012Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time  [2013/04]
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  27.03.2012
Fees paidRenewal fee
18.09.2008Renewal fee patent year 03
01.04.2009Renewal fee patent year 04
21.04.2010Renewal fee patent year 05
11.05.2011Renewal fee patent year 06
30.03.2012Renewal fee patent year 07
Cited inInternational search[XD]EP1545153
 [A]EP1628503
 [A]EP1414271