Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1891088

EP1891088 - PROCESS FOR THE PURIFICATION OF IL-18 BINDING PROTEIN [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  24.08.2012
Database last updated on 15.06.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip24.08.2012No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 26.09.2012  [2012/39]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
ARES TRADING S.A.
Zone Industrielle de l'Ouriettaz
1170 Aubonne / CH
[2011/40]
Former [2008/09]For all designated states
ARES TRADING S.A.
Zone Industrielle de l'Ouriettaz
1170 Aubonne / CH
For all designated states
Kornmann, Henri
Chemin des Graviers, 2A
1290 Versoix / CH
Inventor(s)01 / LE STRAT, Claire
Chemin de l'Hautigny 5
CH-1808 Les Monts De Corsier / CH
02 / MEUWLY, Frederic
Avenue Juste Olivier 15
CH-1006 Lausanne / CH
03 / WENGER, Pierre
144, Ch. de Bellevue
F-01220 Grilly / FR
04 / VALAX, Pascal
Route de Fontanivent 34
CH-1822 Chernex / CH
05 / BAER, Gianni
274 route de Chailly
CH-1814 La Tour-de-Peilz / CH
06 / KORNMANN, Henri
Chemin des Graviers, 2A
1290 Versoix / CH
 [2008/21]
Former [2008/09]01 / LE STRAT, Claire
Chemin de l'Hautigny 5
CH-1808 Les Monts De Corsier / CH
02 / MEUWLY, Frederic
Rue du Centre 9
CH-1800 Vevey / CH
03 / WENGER, Pierre
144, Ch. de Bellevue
F-01220 Grilly / FR
04 / VALAX, Pascal
Route de Fontanivent 34
CH-1822 Chernex / CH
05 / BAER, Gianni
90 avenue de Sully
CH-1814 La Tour-de-peilz / CH
06 / KORNMANN, Henri
Chemin des Graviers, 2A
1290 Versoix / CH
Representative(s)Weiss, Wolfgang , et al
Weickmann & Weickmann
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB
Postfach 860 820
81635 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2011/40]Weiss, Wolfgang , et al
Weickmann & Weickmann Patentanwälte Postfach 86 08 20
81635 München / DE
Former [2008/09]Retzler, Charlotte
Merck Serono International S.A. Intellectual Property Department 9, chemin des Mines
1202 Geneva / CH
Application number, filing date06763598.708.06.2006
[2008/09]
WO2006EP63029
Priority number, dateEP2005010512410.06.2005         Original published format: EP 05105124
US20050690414P14.06.2005         Original published format: US 690414 P
[2008/09]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2006131550
Date:14.12.2006
Language:EN
[2006/50]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1891088
Date:27.02.2008
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 14.12.2006
[2008/09]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1891088
Date:19.10.2011
Language:EN
[2011/42]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP14.12.2006
ClassificationInternational:C07K1/22
[2008/09]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   NL,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2008/09]
Extension statesAL30.11.2007
BA30.11.2007
HR30.11.2007
MK30.11.2007
RS30.11.2007
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN ZUR REINIGUNG EINES IL-18-BINDENDEN PROTEINS[2008/09]
English:PROCESS FOR THE PURIFICATION OF IL-18 BINDING PROTEIN[2008/09]
French:PROCEDE POUR LA PURIFICATION DE LA PROTEINE LIANTE DE IL-18[2008/09]
Entry into regional phase30.11.2007National basic fee paid 
30.11.2007Designation fee(s) paid 
30.11.2007Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure30.11.2007Examination requested  [2008/09]
11.05.2010Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
06.09.2010Reply to a communication from the examining division
12.04.2011Communication of intention to grant the patent
05.08.2011Fee for grant paid
05.08.2011Fee for publishing/printing paid
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  11.05.2010
Opposition(s)20.07.2012No opposition filed within time limit [2012/39]
Fees paidRenewal fee
30.11.2007Renewal fee patent year 03
16.06.2009Renewal fee patent year 04
11.06.2010Renewal fee patent year 05
13.06.2011Renewal fee patent year 06
Cited inInternational search[A]US6605280
 [DA]WO9909063