Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2022937

EP2022937 - SUPPORT ARRANGEMENT [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  17.01.2014
Database last updated on 19.02.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip17.01.2014Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 19.02.2014  [2014/08]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Petrucco, S.A.
Azufre 8 Torrejón de Ardoz
28850 Madrid / ES
[2009/07]
Inventor(s)01 / STEFANUTTI, Rino
Azufre 8 Torrejón de Ardoz
Madrid 28850 / ES
 [2009/07]
Representative(s)Elzaburu Marquez, Alberto
Elzaburu S.L.P.
Miguel Angel, 21
28010 Madrid / ES
[N/P]
Former [2009/52]Elzaburu Marquez, Alberto
Elzaburu S.L.P. Miguel Angel 21
28010 Madrid / ES
Former [2009/07]Elzaburu Marquez, Alberto
Elzaburu S.A., Miguel Angel, 21
28010 Madrid / ES
Application number, filing date06764376.729.05.2006
[2009/07]
WO2006ES70073
Filing languageES
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2007138123
Date:06.12.2007
Language:ES
[2007/49]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2022937
Date:11.02.2009
Language:EN
[2009/07]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:ES06.12.2007
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP12.05.2009
ClassificationInternational:E21D9/00
[2009/07]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   NL,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2009/07]
TitleGerman:STÜTZANORDNUNG[2009/07]
English:SUPPORT ARRANGEMENT[2009/07]
French:DISPOSITIF SUPPORT[2009/07]
Entry into regional phase17.10.2008Translation filed 
17.10.2008National basic fee paid 
17.10.2008Search fee paid 
17.10.2008Designation fee(s) paid 
17.10.2008Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure17.10.2008Examination requested  [2009/07]
03.09.2009Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
06.04.2010Reply to a communication from the examining division
02.08.2010Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination {1}
06.12.2010Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
19.04.2011Reply to a communication from the examining division
05.03.2013Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
17.09.2013Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2014/08]
15.10.2013Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time  [2014/08]
Appeal following examination28.09.2010Appeal received
29.09.2010Statement of grounds filed
18.11.2010Interlocutory revision of appeal
Divisional application(s)EP10184200.3  / EP2282007
The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  03.09.2009
Request for further processing for:The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report
06.04.2010Request for further processing filed
06.04.2010Full payment received (date of receipt of payment)
Fees paidRenewal fee
17.10.2008Renewal fee patent year 03
29.07.2009Renewal fee patent year 04
18.05.2010Renewal fee patent year 05
19.05.2011Renewal fee patent year 06
19.04.2012Renewal fee patent year 07
08.05.2013Renewal fee patent year 08
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.05.200904   M06   Fee paid on   29.07.2009
Cited inInternational search[A]ES2048465T
 [A]EP0245155
 [A]DE2148366
 [A]EP0431909
 [A]DE3027086
by applicant EP1621671
  DE1205575
  ES2151364