EP1933746 - ELECTRICAL CONNECTOR FOR ELECTRO-SURGICAL INSTRUMENT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 21.01.2011 Database last updated on 19.04.2025 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.10.2012 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 21.11.2012 [2012/47] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Brooke, Gerard Prima Medical Limited Unit 21, Daniels Industrial Estate Bath Road Stroud, Gloucestershire GL5 3TJ / GB | [2008/26] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2008/26] | Representative(s) | Newell, William Joseph Wynne-Jones, Lainé & James LLP Essex Place 22 Rodney Road Cheltenham Gloucestershire GL50 1JJ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2008/36] | Newell, William Joseph Wynne-Jones, Lainé & James LLP Essex Place 22 Rodney Road Cheltenham Gloucestershire GL50 1JJ / GB | ||
Former [2008/26] | Newell, William Joseph Wynne-Jones, Lainé & James LLP Essex Place 22 Rodney Road Cheltenham Gloucestershire GL50 1JJ / GB | Application number, filing date | 06765091.1 | 24.07.2006 | [2008/26] | WO2006GB02765 | Priority number, date | GB20050015050 | 22.07.2005 Original published format: GB 0515050 | [2008/26] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2007010292 | Date: | 25.01.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/04] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1933746 | Date: | 25.06.2008 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 25.01.2007 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2008/26] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1933746 | Date: | 17.03.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/11] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 25.01.2007 | Classification | IPC: | A61B18/14 | [2008/26] | CPC: |
A61B18/14 (EP);
H01R13/35 (EP);
H01R24/20 (EP);
A61B2018/00178 (EP);
H01R2103/00 (EP);
H01R2201/12 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2008/26] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ELEKTRISCHES VERBINDUNGSGLIED FÜR EIN ELEKTROCHIRURGISCHES INSTRUMENT | [2008/26] | English: | ELECTRICAL CONNECTOR FOR ELECTRO-SURGICAL INSTRUMENT | [2008/26] | French: | CONNECTEUR ÉLECTRIQUE POUR INSTRUMENT ÉLECTRO-CHIRURGICAL | [2008/26] | Entry into regional phase | 20.02.2008 | National basic fee paid | 20.02.2008 | Designation fee(s) paid | 20.02.2008 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 20.02.2008 | Examination requested [2008/26] | 09.06.2009 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 23.11.2009 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time | 01.02.2010 | Fee for grant paid | 01.02.2010 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 20.12.2010 | No opposition filed within time limit [2011/08] | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to fulfill actions required for granting the patent | 01.02.2010 | Request for further processing filed | 01.02.2010 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 12.02.2010 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.07.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.07.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 17.03.2010 | BE | 17.03.2010 | CY | 17.03.2010 | CZ | 17.03.2010 | DK | 17.03.2010 | EE | 17.03.2010 | FI | 17.03.2010 | IT | 17.03.2010 | LT | 17.03.2010 | LV | 17.03.2010 | NL | 17.03.2010 | PL | 17.03.2010 | RO | 17.03.2010 | SE | 17.03.2010 | SI | 17.03.2010 | SK | 17.03.2010 | TR | 17.03.2010 | BG | 17.06.2010 | GR | 18.06.2010 | ES | 28.06.2010 | IS | 17.07.2010 | PT | 19.07.2010 | IE | 24.07.2010 | LU | 24.07.2010 | CH | 31.07.2010 | LI | 31.07.2010 | MC | 31.07.2010 | HU | 18.09.2010 | [2012/47] |
Former [2012/44] | AT | 17.03.2010 | |
BE | 17.03.2010 | ||
CY | 17.03.2010 | ||
CZ | 17.03.2010 | ||
DK | 17.03.2010 | ||
EE | 17.03.2010 | ||
FI | 17.03.2010 | ||
IT | 17.03.2010 | ||
LT | 17.03.2010 | ||
LV | 17.03.2010 | ||
NL | 17.03.2010 | ||
PL | 17.03.2010 | ||
RO | 17.03.2010 | ||
SE | 17.03.2010 | ||
SI | 17.03.2010 | ||
SK | 17.03.2010 | ||
BG | 17.06.2010 | ||
GR | 18.06.2010 | ||
ES | 28.06.2010 | ||
IS | 17.07.2010 | ||
PT | 19.07.2010 | ||
IE | 24.07.2010 | ||
LU | 24.07.2010 | ||
CH | 31.07.2010 | ||
LI | 31.07.2010 | ||
MC | 31.07.2010 | ||
HU | 18.09.2010 | ||
Former [2012/42] | AT | 17.03.2010 | |
BE | 17.03.2010 | ||
CY | 17.03.2010 | ||
CZ | 17.03.2010 | ||
DK | 17.03.2010 | ||
EE | 17.03.2010 | ||
FI | 17.03.2010 | ||
IT | 17.03.2010 | ||
LT | 17.03.2010 | ||
LV | 17.03.2010 | ||
NL | 17.03.2010 | ||
PL | 17.03.2010 | ||
RO | 17.03.2010 | ||
SE | 17.03.2010 | ||
SI | 17.03.2010 | ||
SK | 17.03.2010 | ||
BG | 17.06.2010 | ||
GR | 18.06.2010 | ||
ES | 28.06.2010 | ||
IS | 17.07.2010 | ||
PT | 19.07.2010 | ||
IE | 24.07.2010 | ||
CH | 31.07.2010 | ||
LI | 31.07.2010 | ||
MC | 31.07.2010 | ||
HU | 18.09.2010 | ||
Former [2011/36] | AT | 17.03.2010 | |
BE | 17.03.2010 | ||
CY | 17.03.2010 | ||
CZ | 17.03.2010 | ||
DK | 17.03.2010 | ||
EE | 17.03.2010 | ||
FI | 17.03.2010 | ||
IT | 17.03.2010 | ||
LT | 17.03.2010 | ||
LV | 17.03.2010 | ||
NL | 17.03.2010 | ||
PL | 17.03.2010 | ||
RO | 17.03.2010 | ||
SE | 17.03.2010 | ||
SI | 17.03.2010 | ||
SK | 17.03.2010 | ||
BG | 17.06.2010 | ||
GR | 18.06.2010 | ||
ES | 28.06.2010 | ||
IS | 17.07.2010 | ||
PT | 19.07.2010 | ||
IE | 24.07.2010 | ||
CH | 31.07.2010 | ||
LI | 31.07.2010 | ||
MC | 31.07.2010 | ||
Former [2011/20] | AT | 17.03.2010 | |
BE | 17.03.2010 | ||
CY | 17.03.2010 | ||
CZ | 17.03.2010 | ||
DK | 17.03.2010 | ||
EE | 17.03.2010 | ||
FI | 17.03.2010 | ||
IT | 17.03.2010 | ||
LT | 17.03.2010 | ||
LV | 17.03.2010 | ||
NL | 17.03.2010 | ||
PL | 17.03.2010 | ||
RO | 17.03.2010 | ||
SE | 17.03.2010 | ||
SI | 17.03.2010 | ||
SK | 17.03.2010 | ||
BG | 17.06.2010 | ||
GR | 18.06.2010 | ||
ES | 28.06.2010 | ||
IS | 17.07.2010 | ||
PT | 19.07.2010 | ||
CH | 31.07.2010 | ||
LI | 31.07.2010 | ||
MC | 31.07.2010 | ||
Former [2011/18] | AT | 17.03.2010 | |
BE | 17.03.2010 | ||
CY | 17.03.2010 | ||
CZ | 17.03.2010 | ||
DK | 17.03.2010 | ||
EE | 17.03.2010 | ||
FI | 17.03.2010 | ||
IT | 17.03.2010 | ||
LT | 17.03.2010 | ||
LV | 17.03.2010 | ||
NL | 17.03.2010 | ||
PL | 17.03.2010 | ||
RO | 17.03.2010 | ||
SE | 17.03.2010 | ||
SI | 17.03.2010 | ||
SK | 17.03.2010 | ||
BG | 17.06.2010 | ||
GR | 18.06.2010 | ||
ES | 28.06.2010 | ||
IS | 17.07.2010 | ||
PT | 19.07.2010 | ||
MC | 31.07.2010 | ||
Former [2011/09] | AT | 17.03.2010 | |
BE | 17.03.2010 | ||
CY | 17.03.2010 | ||
CZ | 17.03.2010 | ||
DK | 17.03.2010 | ||
EE | 17.03.2010 | ||
FI | 17.03.2010 | ||
LT | 17.03.2010 | ||
LV | 17.03.2010 | ||
NL | 17.03.2010 | ||
PL | 17.03.2010 | ||
RO | 17.03.2010 | ||
SE | 17.03.2010 | ||
SI | 17.03.2010 | ||
SK | 17.03.2010 | ||
BG | 17.06.2010 | ||
GR | 18.06.2010 | ||
ES | 28.06.2010 | ||
IS | 17.07.2010 | ||
PT | 19.07.2010 | ||
Former [2011/05] | AT | 17.03.2010 | |
BE | 17.03.2010 | ||
CY | 17.03.2010 | ||
CZ | 17.03.2010 | ||
EE | 17.03.2010 | ||
FI | 17.03.2010 | ||
LT | 17.03.2010 | ||
LV | 17.03.2010 | ||
NL | 17.03.2010 | ||
PL | 17.03.2010 | ||
RO | 17.03.2010 | ||
SE | 17.03.2010 | ||
SI | 17.03.2010 | ||
SK | 17.03.2010 | ||
BG | 17.06.2010 | ||
GR | 18.06.2010 | ||
ES | 28.06.2010 | ||
IS | 17.07.2010 | ||
Former [2010/45] | AT | 17.03.2010 | |
FI | 17.03.2010 | ||
LT | 17.03.2010 | ||
LV | 17.03.2010 | ||
NL | 17.03.2010 | ||
PL | 17.03.2010 | ||
SI | 17.03.2010 | ||
Former [2010/42] | AT | 17.03.2010 | |
FI | 17.03.2010 | ||
LT | 17.03.2010 | ||
LV | 17.03.2010 | ||
PL | 17.03.2010 | ||
SI | 17.03.2010 | Cited in | International search | [A]DE19513588 (SIEMENS AG [DE]) [A] 1-9 * abstract * * column 1, line 1 - column 4, line 5 * * column 5, line 45 - line 61 *; | [A]US5780993 (TSANG JOHN MOONG HUNG [US]) [A] 1-9 * abstract ** column 3, line 66 - column 4, line 13 *; | [A]US6105581 (EGGERS PHILIP E [US], et al) [A] 1-9 * abstract * * column 3, line 20 - column 7, line 32 * * column 24, line 3 - line 18 *; | [A]US6475040 (MYER JOHN MARK [US], et al) [A] 1-9 * abstract * * column 1, line 45 - column 2, line 10 * * column 2, line 66 - column 7, line 50 * |